Barnard v. Corepower Yoga LLC
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG16814083

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 29, 2017 at 12:42 AM ST (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barnard , Shauna, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Corepower Yoga, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Emge Esq, Derek J., Attorney
No Logo Hawkes, David C, Attorney
No Logo Orr, Cheryl D., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Compliance Hearing 11/30/2016 08:45 AM D- 21
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of Removal Filed for Corepower Yoga LLC (111 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Answer to Complaint Filed for Corepower Yoga LLC (8 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Motion Granted (5 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed (3 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/26/2016 08:30 AM D- 21 (3 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 06/28/2016 09:00 AM D- 21 (3 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Association of Attorneys Filed (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          First Amended Complaint Filed (28 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case Management Conference 07/26/2016 03:00 PM D- 30 (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Complex Determination Hearing 06/28/2016 03:00 PM D- 30
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Complex Designation Requested
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Complaint - Other Employment Filed (22 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shauna Barnard (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace

                                        Space Space

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?