Spritzer-Satomi v. State of California, Department of Transp
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG16825731

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 29, 2017 at 1:11 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Spritzer-satomi, Ariel, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo City Of Oakland, Defendant
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Fieber, Julie L., Attorney
No Logo Holden, Nathan J., Attorney
No Logo Parker, Barbara J., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Auto Tort
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Notice of Reassignment Of Judge For All Purposes Filed (7 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Answer to Complaint Filed for State of California, Department of Transportation (5 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Order re Case Management Filed (6 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Case Management Conference 12/13/2016 03:00 PM D- 30 (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 10 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Initial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 15 date: 12/15/2016 time: 09:15 AM
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland (9 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Initial Case Management Conference 12/15/2016 09:15 AM D- 15 (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ariel Spritzer-Satomi (3 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Complaint - Auto Tort Filed (13 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?