F&H Construction v. State of California, Department of Tran
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG16832782

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 29, 2017 at 1:30 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo F&h Construction, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Obaid, Sammy T., Attorney
No Logo Ryan, Joseph D., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof of Service Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed (8 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Answer to Complaint Filed for State of California, Department of Transportation (5 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Initial Case Management Conference 02/09/2017 03:00 PM D- 16 (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Related Case(s) Filed (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (4 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for F&H Construction (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?