Rutherford v. Dimas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-04313

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2020 at 11:30 AM EDT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice Rule 56 entered
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Notice Rule 56 entered
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion/Petition
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Scheduling Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service/Counsel
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None HIPAA Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MERIT REVIEW OPINION Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 2/5/2018. See written Order.The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Dimas, Coleman, Scott, Goorley, Lucas, Hankins, and Cobb. The clerk is directed to attempt service on the remaining defendants pursuant to the standard procedures.Pursuant to this order, plaintiffs complaint states a claim for federal relief; therefore, the court grants plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 6 . Plaintiffs motion for clarification 10 is moot. (ED, ilcd)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Writ Issued
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None NOTICE OF CASE OPENING
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?