United States v. $130,464 (One Hundred Thirty Thousand Four Hundred Sixty-Four Dollars) in United States Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00303

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2019 at 2:54 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE OF ALL DEFENDANTS - It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: 1. All right, title, and interest in the defendant property is CONDEMNED and FORFEITED to the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 88l(a)(6) because the defendant property represents property furnished or intended to be furnished by any person in exchange for a controlled substance, represents proceeds traceable to such an exchange, or was used or intended to be used to facilitate any violation of 21 U.S.C. § 841 or a conspiracy to commit such offense in violation of21 U.S.C. § 846; 2. All right, title, and interest in the defendant property is vested in the United States, and no right, title , or interest shall exist in any other person or entity; 3. The United States or an authorized agent thereof shall dispose of the defendant property in accordance with the law; 4. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Order; and 5. This case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/6/2018. (srb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Application to enter Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Service by Publication
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Warrant Issued
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Order to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 11/30/17. (kma) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2017: # 1 Motion to Unseal Case) (kma).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?