HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02570

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2021 at 6:47 PM DT (2.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Louis Braga +1 617 304 7124 slbraga@msn.com
, , , , , , , , , Arthur B. Spitzer +1 202 457 0805 artspitzer@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ky Elaine Kirby +1 202 373 6795 +1 202 373 6434 ky.kirby@morganlewis.com
, Hannah Mary Margaret Connor +1 202 676 2354 hconnor@humanesociety.org
, Hallie Templeton +1 202 676 2335 +1 202 676 2357 htempleton@humanesociety.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Balber, Pickard, Battistoni, Maldonado, & Van Der Tuin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Bruce Andrew Wagman +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 BWagman@schiffhardin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher James Carney +1 202 373 6729 +1 202 295 8478 cj.carney@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Collette L. Adkins +1 651 955 3821
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Howard M. Crystal +1 202 253 5108 hcrystal@biologicaldiversity.org

Toggle Switch Represented by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, George Andreas Kimbrell +1 415 826 2770 +1 415 826 0507 gkimbrell@centerforfoodsafety.org
, , Paige Michele Tomaselli +1 415 826 2770 +1 415 826 0507 ptomaselli@centerforfoodsafety.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Ann Van Gelder +1 202 463 2516 bvangelder@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Humane Society Of The United States,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Peter Alfred Brandt +1 240 388 5023 +1 202 778 6132 pbrandt@hsus.org
, , , Anna Elizabeth Frostic +1 202 676 2333 +1 202 778 6126 afrostic@humanesociety.org
, Aaron D. Green +1 202 676 2234 +1 202 676 2357 agreen@humanesociety.org
, , , , , , , Ralph E. Henry, Jr. +1 202 676 2324 +1 202 676 2357 rhenry@hsus.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jonathan Russell Lovvorn +1 202 955 3669 +1 202 778 6132 jlovvorn@humanesociety.org
, , , , , Matthew Eric Penzer +1 240 271 6144 +1 202 676 2357 mpenzer@humanesociety.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Koehn +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 mark.koehn@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF CHARLES M. TEBBUTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Daniel C Snyder +1 541 344 3505 +1 541 344 3516

Toggle Switch Represented by Meyer Glitzenstein & Crystal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , William Stewart Eubanks, II +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 beubanks@meyerglitz.com
, , Katherine A. Meyer +1 202 588 5206 +1 202 588 5049 kmeyer@meyerglitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Christian J Mixter +1 202 736 5008 cmixter@morganlewis.com
Space WILLIAM BRADLEY NES +1 202 739 5779 bnes@morganlewis.com
Space Graham B. Rollins +1 202 739 3000 graham.rollins@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morningside Heights Legal Services Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Susan J. Kraham +1 212 854 4291 +1 212 854 3554 skraha@law.columbia.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by PAUL HASTINGS JANOFSKY & WALKER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher F. Dugan +1 202 551 1723 +1 202 551 0123 chrisdugan@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David F. Klein +1 202 663 9207 +1 202 339 8500 david.klein@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Swidler Berlin Shereff & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John R. Ferguson +1 202 424 7505 +1 202 424 7643 jrferguson@swidlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Cullen Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel Eric Cohen +1 202 298 4776 +1 202 944 8611 dec@cullenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Humane Society of the United States

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anna Elizabeth Frostic +1 202 676 2333 +1 202 778 6126 afrostic@humanesociety.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ralph E. Henry, Jr. +1 202 676 2324 +1 202 676 2357 rhenry@hsus.org
Space Daniel H. Lutz +1 202 676 2386 dlutz@humanesociety.org
, Kimberly Denise Ockene +1 202 285 1388 +1 202 778 6132 kockene@humanesociety.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Laura Nachowitz Steel +1 202 626 7681 +1 202 628 3606 steell@wemed.com
v.
No Logo FARM SERVICE AGENCY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Lila C. Jones +1 202 514 9859 +1 202 514 8865 lila.jones@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Peter J. Phipps +1 202 616 8482 +1 202 616 8470 peter.phipps@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Agriculture United States Department of Agriculture, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jason T. Cohen +1 202 305 0207 +1 202 305 0275 jason.cohen@usdoj.gov
, Claire M. Whitaker +1 202 514 7137 +1 202 514 8780 claire.whitaker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jill Z. Julian +1 317 229 2417 +1 317 226 6125 jill.julian@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E. Broomhead +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 timothy.broomhead@usdoj.gov
Space Laura Emily Jennings +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 laura.jennings2@usdoj.gov
, Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Space Kevin Michael Laden +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 514 8780 kladen@usa.doj.gov
, , Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
Space Laurie J. Weinstein +1 202 252 2527 +1 202 514 8780 Laurie.Weinstein2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , IRENE E. DOWDY +1 856 757 5139 +1 856 757 5416 irene.dowdy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Hector G. Bladuell +1 202 616 2706 +1 202 616 2547 hector.bladuell2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kari E. D'Ottavio +1 202 305 0568 +1 202 616 8470 kari.e.d'ottavio@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
, , , Timothy Andrew Johnson +1 202 514 1359 +1 202 616 8470 timothy.johnson4@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Lila C. Jones +1 202 514 9859 +1 202 514 8865 lila.jones@usdoj.gov
, , , Matthew Allan Josephson +1 912 652 4422 +1 912 652 4991 matthew.josephson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/27/2017, TERMINATED: 01/27/2017 Matthew J.B. Lawrence +1 202 305 0747 +1 202 616 8202 Matthew.J.Lawrence@usdoj.gov
, , , Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Lisa Ann Olson +1 202 514 5633 +1 202 616 8470 lisa.olson@usdoj.gov
, , , Peter J. Phipps +1 202 616 8482 +1 202 616 8470 peter.phipps@usdoj.gov
, Julie Shana Saltman +1 202 532 4252 +1 202 616 8470 julie.saltman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Barclay Thomas Samford +1 303 844 1475 +1 303 844 1350 Clay.Samford@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Toth +1 202 305 0639 +1 202 305 0506 brian.toth@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAM R. COWDEN, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Rakestraw Cowden +1 202 642 0209 +1 202 232 7566 wcowden@cowdenllc.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Modify
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Lutz, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against FARM SERVICE AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5228052) filed by HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Agency - USDA, # 3 Summons Agency - FSA, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons US Attorney for DC)(Lutz, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?