Statoil USA E&P Inc. v. United States Department of Interior
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-03664

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 23, 2020 at 12:57 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Statoil USA E&P Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEVERIDE & DIAMOND, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Jason Moore +1 512 391 8030 +1 512 391 8099 bmoore@bdlaw.com
Space Peter J. Schaumberg +1 202 789 6000 pschaumberg@bdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Beveridge & Diamond, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Auslander +1 202 789 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Edward F Fernandes +1 512 542 5010 +1 512 542 5049 efernandes@hunton.com
v.
No Logo Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , Erin Langenwalter +1 505 224 1471 erin.langenwalter@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Reuben S Schifman +1 202 305 4224 +1 202 305 0506 reuben.schifman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jody Helen Schwarz +1 202 305 0245 +1 202 305 0267 jody.schwarz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Nicholas Vassallo +1 307 772 2124 +1 307 772 2123 nick.vassallo@usdoj.gov
No Logo Secretary Gregory Gould, Defendant
No Logo Secretary Ryan Zinke, Defendant
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Department of Interior"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Raymond Hamilton +1 505 450 1032 raymondhamiltonlawoffice@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rose Michele Weckenmann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Rose Michele Weckenmann +1 916 208 4956 +1 916 520 3586 rmw@weckenmannlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, Ty Bair +1 202 307 3316 tyler.bair@usdoj.gov
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Kathryn Brinkman +1 202 305 0476 +1 202 305 0267 joanna.brinkman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lori Caramanian +1 303 844 1499 +1 303 844 1350 lori.caramanian@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Sara E. Costello +1 202 305 0466 +1 202 305 0267 Sara.Costello@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Dean Dunsmore +1 907 271 5452 +1 907 271 5827 dean.dunsmore@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Meredith L Flax +1 202 305 0404 meredith.flax@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James David Gette +1 202 305 1461 +1 202 305 0274 james.gette@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Michele S. Greif +1 202 353 2492 +1 202 616 4473 michele.greif@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer +1 202 305 0217 +1 202 305 0275 Lesley.Lawrence-Hammer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Anthony Maysonett +1 202 305 0216 +1 202 305 0275 James.A.Maysonett@usdoj.gov
, , , Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Guillermo A. Montero +1 202 305 0443 guillermo.montero@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary A. Moore +1 251 441 5845 +1 251 441 5051 gary.moore2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Tanya Camille Nesbitt +1 202 305 0457 +1 202 305 0506 tanya.nesbitt2@usdoj.gov
Space Charles Michael O'Connor +1 415 436 7180 +1 415 436 6748 Charles.OConnor@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel K. Roberts +1 206 220 4199 +1 206 220 4077 rachel.roberts@usdoj.gov
, , E. Kathleen Shahan +1 202 307 0249 +1 202 307 0494 kathie.shahan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charles Ray Shockey +1 916 930 2203 +1 916 930 2210 charles.shockey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010, TERMINATED: 02/05/2010 Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Carol A Statkus +1 307 772 2124 +1 307 772 2123 carol.statkus@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kristofor Ross Swanson +1 202 305 0248 +1 202 305 0267 kristofor.swanson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael D. Thorp +1 202 305 0456 michael.thorp@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James D. Todd +1 202 514 3378 +1 202 616 8470 james.todd@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED: 12/11/2015, TERMINATED Justin A. Torres +1 202 305 0874 +1 202 305 0506 justin.torres@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , John P Tustin +1 202 305 3022 +1 202 305 0506 john.tustin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Nicholas Vassallo +1 307 772 2124 +1 307 772 2123 nick.vassallo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Joseph N. Watson +1 202 305 0467 joseph.watson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013, TERMINATED: 01/04/2013 Tyler Guy Welti +1 202 305 0481 tyler.welti@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 30 U.S.C. § 1276
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal (FORM,noticing) - Civil
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request (DKT-13)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/1/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None order on motion to reset
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Reset
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Surreply to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Minute Entry/Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Entry Of Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F. Fernandes on behalf of Statoil USA E&P Inc., filed. (Fernandes, Edward)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Statoil USA E&P Inc., filed.(Moore, Bryan)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER for James M. Auslander Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER for Peter J. Schaumberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/19/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Peter J. Schaumberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Statoil USA E&P Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2017. (Moore, Bryan)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION for James M. Auslander to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Statoil USA E&P Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2017. (Moore, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Related Case by Statoil USA E&P Inc., filed. (Moore, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Moore, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19279221) filed by Statoil USA E&P Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?