Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. et al v. Aventura Holdings, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:07-cv-60816-CMA
District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 2, 2017 at 12:30 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Dealer Enterprise Group, L.L.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas J. Helling +1 813 228 7411 +1 813 229 8313 douglas.helling@fowlerwhite.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiand Guerra King PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter B. King +1 813 347 5100 +1 813 347 5199 pking@wiandlaw.com
No Logo Horvath Holdings, L.L.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter B. King +1 813 347 5100 +1 813 347 5199 pking@wiandlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas J. Helling +1 813 228 7411 +1 813 229 8313 douglas.helling@fowlerwhite.com
No Logo Aventura Holdings, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Adam Shafir +1 561 886 6400 mshafir@tlecorp.com
No Logo Craig A. Waltzer, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Adam Shafir +1 561 886 6400 mshafir@tlecorp.com
v.
No Logo Aventura Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Antonio Loredo +1 305 530 0050 +5300 530 530 0055 jloredo@cfjblaw.com
Space Michael Adam Shafir +1 561 886 6400 mshafir@tlecorp.com
No Logo Craig A. Waltzer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Adam Shafir +1 561 886 6400 mshafir@tlecorp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Antonio Loredo +1 305 530 0050 +5300 530 530 0055 jloredo@cfjblaw.com
No Logo American Dealer Enterprise Group, L.L.C., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Horvath Holdings, L.L.C., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Allan Apple, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiand Guerra King PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter B. King +1 813 347 5100 +1 813 347 5199 pking@wiandlaw.com
No Logo Foss, Donald A., ThirdParty Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Foss"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiand Guerra King PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter B. King +1 813 347 5100 +1 813 347 5199 pking@wiandlaw.com
No Logo John S. Freud, Mediator
Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 6/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Broward (Office
Terminated 12/14/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,MEDIATION,REF_DISCOV,WCT
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re [58] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. Each party to bear his or its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/2/08.(lk)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and Proposed Order by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Administrative OrderCourt Filing
      Order Administratively Closing Case.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 14, 2007.(ps1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER ON MEDIATION RESULTS; the parties are to submit a report of the December 6, 2007 mediation conference by December 21, 2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on December 14, 2007.(ps1)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
          ORDER denying as moot [34] and [36] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, granting [51] Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 17, 2007. (ps1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 54 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2007 re [51] Amended MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs. The parties were heard, and the Court granted Plaintiffs' Motion. The Court also denied Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss [34, 36] as moot. Order forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina- phone number 305-523-5518 (lc1)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Notice re HearingCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/17/2007 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Please see notice for instructions to join conference.(ps1)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 MEMORANDUM
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW In Support of Amended Motion to file Second Amended Complaint by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 10/17/2007 motion for leave to file
                  Amended MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 part A# (2) Exhibit 1 part B# (3) Exhibit 1 part C# (4) Exhibit 2)(King, Peter)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [48] Motion Denying Without Prejudice for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on October 11, 2007. (ps1)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 MEMORANDUM
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007, Terminated: 10/11/2007 motion for leave to file
                      MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 part A# (2) Exhibit 1 part B# (3) Exhibit 1 part C# (4) Exhibit 2)(King, Peter)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Reply to Response to motion
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [36] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amended filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(King, Peter)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Reply to Response to motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [36] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(King, Peter)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Notice of Striking
                            NOTICE of Striking [44] Reply to Response to Motion filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C., by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. (King, Peter)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Reply to Response to motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [36] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(King, Peter)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Memorandum in opposition
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [36] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, [34] MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, [35] Memorandum in Support filed by Aventura Holdings, Inc., Aventura Holdings, Inc.. (Shafir, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part [38] Motion for Extension of Time to file Response re [34] MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings: Responses due by 9/24/2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on September 17, 2007. (ps1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Reply to Response to motion
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [38] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [34] MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer, Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer. (Shafir, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 response in opposition to motion
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [38] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [34] MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                        ORDER taking under advisement [38] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and requiring expedited memorandum in opposition. Plaintiff is advised to file its memorandum explaining its opposition to the requested extension by Friday, September 14, 2007. (CMA)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007, Terminated: 9/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [34] MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer, Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Shafir, Michael)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
                                            Notice of Docket Correction: Multiple reliefs filed as one; originally filed as [34] MOTION to Dismiss; docketed second requested relief as [36] MOTION for Partial Judgment. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future select all requested reliefs. (de)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                              MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. (originally filed as [34]) (de)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Memorandum In Support
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [34] MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 10/17/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Counterclaim and for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. Responses due by 9/13/2007 (King, Peter)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [32] Motion for Extension of Time to Response; plaintiffs have until September 4, 2007 to file a response to the counterclaim.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on August 28, 2007. (ps1)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 8/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                      Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [29] Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Counterclaim. Plaintiffs have until 8/27/07.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on August 16, 2007. (ps1)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                          ORDER Scheduling Mediation before John S. Freud: Mediation Hearing set for 12/6/2007 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on August 16, 2007.(ps1)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                            Reset Answer Due Deadline: Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. counterclaim answer due 8/27/2007; American Dealer Enterprise Group, L.L.C. answer due 8/27/2007. (dm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007, Terminated: 8/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
                                                                Notice of Docket Correction: Incorrect event selected; originally filed as [26] Notice (Other); redocketed correctly as [27] Notice of Mediation Hearing. Notice of Instruction to Filer: In the future select Notice of Mediation Hearing found under Mediation Documents. (de)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Notice of Mediation Hearing
                                                                  Notice of Mediation Hearing: Mediation Hearing set for 12/6/2007 09:00 AM John S. Freud added as Mediator. (originally filed as [26]) (de)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Notice - other
                                                                    NOTICE by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. of Mediator Selection and Scheduling of Mediation (King, Peter)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                      Reset Answer Due Deadline: Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. answer to counterclaim due 8/16/2007. (dm) Modified answer due date on 8/6/2007 (dm).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 8/4/2007, Entered: 8/4/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                        ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaim. The response is due August 16, 2007. (CMA)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Summons issued
                                                                          Summons Issued as to Allan Apple. (tb)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Summons issued
                                                                            Summons Issued as to Donald Foss. (tb)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007, Terminated: 8/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [18] Answer to Amended Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim,,, Respond to Counterclaim by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                Reset Answer Due Deadline: Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. answer due 8/16/2007. (dm)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Notice of Striking
                                                                                  NOTICE of Striking [20] Notice of Instruction to Filer, [19] SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f) Docket Entry Number 19 by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C. (Helling, Douglas)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                    Notice of Instruction to Filer: Blank document filed as [19] SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). Filer is instructed to: 1) File a Notice of Striking Docket Entry, and 2) Refile document correctly. (de)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                      SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (King, Peter)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Aventura Holdings, Inc. against Allan Apple, Donald Foss, COUNTERCLAIM by Aventura Holdings, Inc. against Horvath Holdings, L.L.C., American Dealer Enterprise Group, L.L.C. by Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer.(Shafir, Michael)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2007, Entered: 7/15/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer. (Shafir, Michael)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/15/2007, Entered: 7/15/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer. (Shafir, Michael)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff for Discovery, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Jury Trial set for 7/21/2008 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 7/15/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 07/11/2007.(bs)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for defendants' failure to file certificates of interested parties; Show Cause Response due by 7/20/2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on July 11, 2007.(ps1)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (King, Peter)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                      SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (King, Peter)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint, filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A - L)(King, Peter)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/18/07 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina 213 pages.. (pc)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements, due by 7/10/2007.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/19/07.(lh)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying [2] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction.Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 18, 2007. (ps1)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2007 re [2]MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. The parties were heard, and the Court denied Plaintiffs' Motion. Order forthcoming. Court Reporter: Barbara Medina (lc1)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Antonio Loredo on behalf of Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer (Loredo, Jose)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2007 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Plaintiff shall served defendants by June 15, 2007. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on June 13, 2007.(ps1)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Summons issued
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Aventura Holdings, Inc., Craig A. Waltzer. (el)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007, Terminated: 6/19/2007 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C.. Responses due by 6/27/2007 (el)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                          EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filing fee $ 350. Receipt#: 961456, filed by Horvath Holdings, L.L.C., American Dealer Enterprise Group, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B)(el)
                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?