Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 07-30419-KKS

Tags
Last Updated December 2, 2017 at 4:26 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM KENT THAMES, II +1 850 433 5461 +1 850 432 0166 wkthames@florida-law.com
No Logo United States Trustee, Trustee
Office Pensacola
Filed 05/04/2007
County Santa Rosa-FL
Terminated 09/28/2012
Fee Paid
Debtor discharged
Origin 0
Reopened
Previous term
Converted
Debtor dismissed
Joint n
Confirmation hearing
Current chapter 7
Debtor disposition Discharge Not Applicable
Nature of debt business
Related adversary proceedings 07-03015-MAM, 07-03016-MAM, 07-03018-MAM, 07-03019-MAM, 08-03002-MAM, 08-03003-MAM, 08-03008-MAM
Pending status Awaiting Involuntary Answer ,Case Closed
Flags Repeat, MDSM, DEFER, ADV, CLAIMS, CLOSED
  Entries (556) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 9/30/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 546 Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee & Closing Case.) Notice Date 09/30/2012. (Admin.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 547 Filed: 9/29/2012, Entered: 9/29/2012 Terminate Party
    Trustee Terminated. (ADIapps)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee & Closing Case
      Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case signed on 9/28/2012. (Davis, Lisa)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: 9/6/2012 Trustees Final Account
        Final Account by Trustee. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application for Discharge of the Trustee in accordance with the standards set forth in the MOU dated January 1, 1999 and has no objections to the trustee's certification that the estate has been fully administered and is ready to close. (United States Trustee)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Specie
          Case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Specie in accordance with 11th Circuit Order of Appointment to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Northern District of Florida. Please ensure that all pleadings and documents submitted in this case reflect the correct initials in the case number (-KKS) and that all proposed orders contain a signature space for Judge Specie. (admin)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Notice of Final Dividends
            Notice of Final Dividends to Creditors filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 6/5/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 542 Order on TFR Application for Compensation). Service Date 06/05/2011. (Admin.)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Order on TFR Application for Compensation
                Order Granting Trustee's Application for Compensation (Re: 541) for Sherry Chancellor, fees awarded: $, expenses awarded: $264.85 (Davis, Lisa)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011, Terminated: 6/3/2011 Trustees Application for Compensation
                  Application for Compensation of Trustee and Notice of Trustee's Final Report for Sherry Chancellor, Trustee Chapter 7, Fee: $0.00, Expenses: $264.85. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter Trustee's Final Report filed by Michelle Brooks [UST]. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Trustee's Application) (Brooks, Michelle)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/12/2011 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 539 Order on Motion for Authorization to Return or Destroy Records). Service Date 02/11/2011. (Admin.)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Order on Motion for Authorization to Return or Destroy Records
                      Order Granting Motion to Return or Destroy Records (Re: 538) (Davis, Lisa)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011, Terminated: 2/9/2011 Motion for Authorization to Return or Destroy Records
                        Motion for Authorization to Return or Destroy Records and pay expenses associated with storage and destruction filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 536 Notice of Application for Compensation). Service Date 09/15/2010. (Admin.)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Notice of Application for Compensation (Negative Notice)
                            Notice of Application for Compensation to Professionals and Proposed Distribution to Creditors of the Estate filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 535 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Order on motion to compel
                              Administrative Entry Rendering Moot Motion to Compel (Re: 529) (Davis, Lisa)
                                LREF
                                Blank 534 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Withdrawal of document
                                Withdrawal of Document (Matter Resolved) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 529 Motion to Compel]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 533 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Hearing Cancelled
                                  Notice of cancelled hearing. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/10 is cancelled prior to hearing date (Re: 529 Motion to Compel); This matter is no longer in dispute. An agreed order will be submitted via e-mail immediately. filed by DAH Chancellor . (Nah, Janet)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Benjamin W. Beard on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE/USA. (Beard, Benjamin)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 6/27/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 530 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 06/27/2010. (Admin.)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Notice of hearing
                                        Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 529 Motion to Compel). Hearing scheduled on 7/22/2010 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 1, Winston E. Arnow Fed. Bldg., 100 N. Palafox St.). (Kantor, Martie)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010, Terminated: 7/29/2010 Motion to compel
                                          Motion to Compel filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/17/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 526 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 04/16/2010. (Admin.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 525 Hearing Cancelled). Service Date 04/14/2010. (Admin.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                Order Granting Motion to Pay (Re: 522) (Davis, Lisa)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Hearing Cancelled
                                                  Notice of cancelled hearing. Hearing scheduled for 5/27/10 is cancelled prior to hearing date (Re: 522 Motion to Pay); Hearing is not required, scheduled in error. (Nah, Janet)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 4/11/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 523 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 04/11/2010. (Admin.)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Notice of hearing
                                                      Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 522 Motion to Pay). Hearing scheduled on 5/27/2010 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 1, Winston E. Arnow Fed. Bldg., 100 N. Palafox St.). (Nah, Janet)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010, Terminated: 4/14/2010 Motion to Pay
                                                        Motion to Pay Department of Revenue filed by PAM Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 1/31/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 520 Order on Application for Compensation). Service Date 01/31/2010. (Admin.)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                            Order Granting Application for Compensation (Re: 515) for Mary P. Buchholz, fees awarded: $4856.25, expenses awarded: $ (Davis, Lisa)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 519 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                              Hearing Held (Re: 515 Application for Compensation)- Approved; Appear.: Chancellor (T); Order/Chancellor; CR: Kristin Lavoy (850-438-0503). (Nah, Janet)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Interim Report of Trustee
                                                                Interim Report of Trustee for period ending from 1/1/09 to 12/31/09. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 516 Notice of Hearing On Aplc for Compensation). Service Date 12/03/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Notice of Hearing on Application for Compensation
                                                                    Notice of hearing on application for compensation. Applicant, Mary P. Buchholz, Accountant ,requests the amount of $ 4,856.25 (Re: 515 Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled on 1/28/2010 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009, Terminated: 1/29/2010 Application for Compensation (Negative Notice)
                                                                      Application for Compensation for Mary P. Buchholz, Accountant, Fee: $4,856.25, Expenses: $0. filed by PAM Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  5-Alpha Case Administrator Assignment
                                                                        Case assigned to Lisa Davis (admin)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Notice of Final Dividends
                                                                          Notice of Interim Dividends to Creditors filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/26/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 510 Order on Application for Compensation). Service Date 07/26/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/26/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 509 Order on Application for Compensation). Service Date 07/26/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/26/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 508 Order on Motion to Approve). Service Date 07/26/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                  Order Granting Application for Compensation (Re: 497) for Sherry Chancellor, fees awarded: $16404.59, expenses awarded: $843.38 (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                    Order Granting Application for Compensation (Re: 496) for Sherry F. Chancellor, fees awarded: $14000.00, (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Order on Motion to Approve
                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Approve Interim Dist.,(Re: 495) (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 507 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                        Hearing Held (Re: 495 Motion to Approve Interim Distribution filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor- Approved; 497 Application for Compensation for Sherry Chancellor, Trustee Chapter 7, Fee: $16,404.59, Expenses: $843.38. filed by DAH Chancellor, Sherry Chancellor.- Approved; 498 Interim Amended Application for Compensation (Re: 496 Application for Compensation) for Sherry F. Chancellor, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $14,000.00, Expenses: $0.00. Amended to reflect that it is an Interim Application filed by (Re: 496 Application for Compensation). (Chancellor, DAH)- Approved; Orders (3)/Chancellor; Appear.: Chancellor (T), Venn (Petitioning Cred); CR: Kristin Lavoy (850-438-0503). (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 503 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 06/24/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 502 Notice of Hearing On Aplc for Compensation). Service Date 06/24/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 501 Notice of Hearing On Aplc for Compensation). Service Date 06/24/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 495 Motion to Approve). Hearing scheduled on 7/23/2009 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Notice of Hearing on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                  Notice of hearing on application for compensation. Applicant, Sherry F. Chancellor, Atty. for Trustee ,requests the amount of $ 17,247.97 (Re: 497 Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled on 7/23/2009 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Notice of Hearing on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                    Notice of hearing on Interim application for compensation. Applicant, Sherry F. Chancellor, Esq. ,requests the amount of $ 14,000.00 (Re: 498 Amended Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled on 7/23/2009 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                      Withdrawal of Claim 12 filed by Columbus Bank and Trust Company (Eldridge, Sandra)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                        Withdrawal of Claim 11 filed by Columbus Bank and Trust Company (Eldridge, Sandra)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009, Terminated: 8/3/2009 Amended application for compensation
                                                                                                          Interim Amended Application for Compensation (Re: 496 Application for Compensation) for Sherry F. Chancellor, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $14,000.00, Expenses: $0.00. Amended to reflect that it is an Interim Application filed by (Re: 496 Application for Compensation). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009, Terminated: 7/24/2009 Application for Compensation (Negative Notice)
                                                                                                            Interim Application for Compensation for Sherry Chancellor, Trustee Chapter 7, Fee: $16,404.59, Expenses: $843.38. filed by DAH Chancellor, Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009, Terminated: 7/24/2009 Application for Compensation (Negative Notice)
                                                                                                              Application for Compensation for Sherry F. Chancellor, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $14,000.00, Expenses: $0. filed by. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009, Terminated: 7/24/2009 Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Interim Distribution filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Notice of Filing Auctioneer Statement
                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Auctioneer Statement for Auction May 16, 2009 filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Adversary Case Closed
                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:08-ap-3008 Closed . (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Adversary Case Closed
                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:08-ap-3003 Closed . (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Adversary Case Closed
                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:07-ap-3016 Closed . (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Adversary Case Closed
                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:07-ap-3015 Closed . (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Adversary Case Closed
                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:08-ap-3002 Closed . (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/6/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 492 Order on Application for Compensation). Service Date 06/05/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application for Compensation (Re: 486) for Robert O. Beasley, fees awarded: $24000.00, (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 491 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                  Hearing Held (Re: 486 Final Application for Compensation for Robert O. Beasley, Special Counsel, Fee: $24,000.00, Expenses: $0.)- Approved; Appear.: Chancellor (T); Order/Chancellor; CR: Dana Jeffries (850-438-0503). (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 statement in support
                                                                                                                                    Statement in Support specifically time records in support of Application for Compensation filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor (Re: 486 Application for Compensation). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/25/2009, Entered: 4/26/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 487 Notice of Hearing On Aplc for Compensation). Service Date 04/25/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Notice of Intent to Sell
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Intention to Sell Property of the Estate by Auction May 16, 2009 filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Notice of Hearing on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                          Notice of hearing on application for compensation. Applicant, Robert O. Beasley, Special Counse ,requests the amount of $ 24,000.00 (Re: 486 Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled on 5/28/2009 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009, Terminated: 6/3/2009 Application for Compensation (Negative Notice)
                                                                                                                                            Final Application for Compensation for Robert O. Beasley, Special Counsel, Fee: $24,000.00, Expenses: $0. filed by PAM Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 482 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement). Service Date 03/26/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 481 Order on Motion to Seal). Service Date 03/26/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                  Settlement Agreement (filed under seal) by Sherry Chancellor [Re: 480 Motion to Approve Compromise]. (McClure, M.) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2009 (McClure, M.).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                    Order on Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement, (Re: 480) (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Order on Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal (Re: 479) (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009, Terminated: 3/24/2009 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Approve Compromise (to include adversary cases filed in conjunction with this action; 07-03015, 07-03016, 07-03018, 07-03019, 08-03002) filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2009 (McClure, M.). Modified on 3/25/2009 to included adversary case nos.(Kennington, A.).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009, Terminated: 3/24/2009 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                          Joint Motion to Seal. filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 477 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 03/12/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Order Withdrawing Amended Motion (Re: 142 Amended Motion) (Isom, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 476 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Document (Matter resolved) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 142 Amended Motion]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Report
                                                                                                                                                                  Report Accounting for February 2009 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/28/2009, Entered: 3/1/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 473 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 02/28/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Pay Trustee Expenses (Re: 467) (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/21/2009, Entered: 2/22/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 470 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 02/21/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/21/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 469 Order on Motion to Compel). Service Date 02/20/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Amended Motion for Authority to Obtain Titles (Re: 466 Amended Motion) (Kennington, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Withdrawing Motion to Compel (Re: 211) (Isom, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 468 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Document (matter resolved) filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 211 Motion to Compel). (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009, Terminated: 2/26/2009 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Pay Trustee Expenses filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009, Terminated: 2/19/2009 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Motion (Re: 465 Motion for Authority/Authorization) Amended to add Attachment filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor (Attachments: 1 Attachment). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009, Terminated: 3/5/2009 Motion for Authority/Authorization
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Authority/Authorization to Obtain Titles filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                        Report January 2009 Accounting filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group Inc., Ohio Funding Group, Inc. [Re: 462 Notice (Generic)]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Mediation filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group Inc., Ohio Funding Group, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath (Re: 451 Order). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 461 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Rendering Moot Motion Expedite Hearing (Re: 25) (Abel, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 460 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Rendering Moot Motion to Pay (Re: 314) (Abel, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 459 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Rendering Moot Motion to Pay (Re: 166) (Abel, K.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Interim Report of Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Report of Trustee 1/1/08-12/31/08. (Chancellor, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 1/4/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 456 Order). Service Date 01/04/2009. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: 1/2/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Regarding Mediation Schedule signed on 1/2/2009 (Re: 454 Stipulation). (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Report Accounting for December 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation by Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Sherry Chancellor, Anthony J. Ciano, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group, Inc. and Stipulation Regarding Mediation Schedule filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Sherry Chancellor, Anthony J. Ciano, Credit Acceptance Corporation, Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group, Inc. [Re: 451 Order] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order Regarding Mediation Schedule). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Report Monthly Accounting Report of N.A.F. Corp. for November 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - NAF's Monthly Accounting Report for November 2008). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/27/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 451 No action taken on Order). Service Date 11/26/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order of Referral to Mediation signed on 11/24/2008. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 450 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Held (Re: 430 Motion to Approve Compromise)- Mediation ordered: Mr. Ciano & Detroit Group will split cost equally; Order/Court; CAC to deliver full accounting for receivables; Order/Venn, Levin & Beasley; Appear.: Egan (UST), Chancellor (T), Beasley (Atty for Tee.), Venn (Ciano), Collier (Detroit Group), Levitt (Cred Accept. Corp.); CR: Connie Morse (850-438-0503). (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Horvath Holdings, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group, Inc. [Re: 448 Brief]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief in Response to Objection of Anthony Ciano to Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Arnstein & Lehr v. Tardif2 Exhibit Armstrong v Rushton3 Exhibit Part 1: Transcript4 Exhibit Part 2: Transcript5 Exhibit Romagosa v. Thomas). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service of Responses and Objections to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Petitioning Creditor Anthony J. Ciano (Re: 442 Request for Production of Documents). (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to (Request for Production of Documents) filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor. (Re: 441 Request for Production of Documents) (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to (Objection, Memorandum of Law) filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor. (Re: 439 Objection, 440 Memorandum of Law) (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report Monthly Accounting Report of N.A.F. Corp. for October 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A- NAF's Monthly Accounting Report for October 2008). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Horvath Holdings, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group Inc. [Re: 442 Request for Production of Documents]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 442 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Production of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Anthony Ciano filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Horvath Holdings, Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Production of Documents from Trustee filed by John E. Venn on behalf of Anthony J. Ciano. (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law filed by John E. Venn on behalf of Anthony J. Ciano [Re: 439 Objection]. (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to (430 Motion to Approve Compromise, 431 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement) filed by Petitioning Creditor Anthony J. Ciano. (Re: 430 Motion to Approve Compromise, 431 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement) (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 436 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 10/08/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to (Objection) filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor. (Re: 435 Objection) (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 430 Motion to Approve Compromise). Hearing scheduled on 11/20/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/5/2008, Entered: 10/5/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection filed by Charles F. Edwards on behalf of United States Trustee [Re: 430 Motion to Approve Compromise, 431 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Amended Memorandum of Understanding). (Edwards, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 433 Report]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report September 2008 Accounting filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 431 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement). Service Date 09/25/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement (Re: 430) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008, Terminated: 1/7/2009 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Approve Compromise filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 429 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of Document (Incomplete Document attached) filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor (Re: 428 Motion to Approve Compromise). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008, Terminated: 9/23/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of NAF for August 2008 Collections filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: 8/24/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 423 Order on Motion for Injunction). Service Date 08/23/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: 8/24/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 422 Order on Motion for Clarification). Service Date 08/23/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: 8/24/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 421 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 08/23/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Motion for Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Withdrawing Motion for Injunction (Re: 372) (Davis, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on motion for clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Withdrawing Motion for Clarification (Re: 371) (Davis, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Withdrawing Application to Employ (Re: 370) (Davis, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Document without prejudice filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 370 Application to Employ]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Withdrawal of Document without prejudice filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 372 Motion for Injunction]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Withdrawal of Document without prejudice filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 371 Motion for Clarification]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report for July 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 7/26/2008, Entered: 7/27/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 415 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 07/26/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulated Order on Motion for Payment of Trustee Expenses (Re: 402) (Bikowitz, C.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 414 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of cancelled hearing. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/08 is cancelled prior to hearing date (Re: 402 Motion to Pay); This matter is no longer in dispute. An agreed order will be submitted via e-mail immediately. filed by DAH Chancellor. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 412 Report]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report Regarding June 2008 Accounting filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/29/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 409 Notice of Hearing, ). Service Date 06/29/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/28/2008, Entered: 6/29/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 408 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 06/28/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Continued Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 372 Motion for Injunction, 370 Application to Employ, 371 Motion for Clarification). Hearing scheduled on 8/28/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing for 60 days on (407 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing, ). Hearing to be re-scheduled by separate notice (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008, Terminated: 6/26/2008 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing on 404 Objection, 370 Application to Employ, 371 Motion for Clarification, 398 Notice of Hearing,, 378 Objection, 372 Motion for Injunction, 403 Objection filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 6/21/2008, Entered: 6/22/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 405 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 06/21/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 402 Motion to Pay). Hearing scheduled on 7/24/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to (370 Application to Employ) Objection to Second Application to Employ filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 370 Application to Employ) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to (371 Motion for Clarification, 372 Motion for Injunction) filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 371 Motion for Clarification, 372 Motion for Injunction) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 7/24/2008 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Pay Trustee Expenses specifically for copies related to litigation filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/31/2008, Entered: 6/1/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 398 Notice of Hearing, ). Service Date 05/31/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/31/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 397 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 05/30/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Report of NAF Corporation for May 30, 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Continued Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 372 Motion for Injunction, 370 Application to Employ, 371 Motion for Clarification). Hearing scheduled on 6/26/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing on (396 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing). Hearing to be re-scheduled until the Court's next available date by separate notice (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing on 370 Application to Employ, 392 Notice of Hearing,, 371 Motion for Clarification, 372 Motion for Injunction filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 391 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 04/24/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 392 Notice of Hearing, ). Service Date 04/24/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 388 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 04/23/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Continued Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 372 Motion for Injunction, 370 Application to Employ, 371 Motion for Clarification). Hearing scheduled on 5/29/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing on Application to Employ(389 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing). Hearing to be re-scheduled by separate notice (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Notice of Filing Auctioneer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Auctioneer Statement regarding auction of vehicles at Long Beach Auto Auction filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008, Terminated: 4/22/2008 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing on 370 Application to Employ, 375 Notice of Hearing filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing on (387 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing). Hearing RE:371 and 372 to be re-scheduled by separate notice on next available court date. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008, Terminated: 4/21/2008 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing on 371 Motion for Clarification, 372 Motion for Injunction, 383 Notice of Hearing filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Notice of Filing Auctioneer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Auctioneer Statement of Property Sold at Auction filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 383 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 04/17/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 381 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 04/16/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Continued Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 372 Motion for Injunction). Hearing scheduled on 4/24/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 378 Objection]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order on Motion to Continue Hearing on (379 Motion to Continue hearing on Motion for Injunction 372 until 4/24/08). Hearing to be re-scheduled by separate notice (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to (379 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing, ) (Limited Objection) filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 379 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing, ) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008, Terminated: 4/14/2008 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing on 373 Notice of Hearing, 378 Objection, 372 Motion for Injunction Until April 24, 2008, in conjunction with related hearing on Motion for Clarification filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/13/2008, Entered: 4/13/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to (372 Motion for Injunction) filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 372 Motion for Injunction) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/12/2008, Entered: 4/13/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 375 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 04/12/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/12/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 373 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 04/11/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 370 Application to Employ, 371 Motion for Clarification). Hearing scheduled on 4/24/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 369 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 04/09/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 372 Motion for Injunction). Hearing scheduled on 4/14/2008 at 02:30 PM at Via TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Motion for Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency Motion for Injunction ExParte filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Clarification filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Application to Employ Robert O. Beasley, Esquire as Special Counsel filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order on Trustee's Motion to Pay Administrative Expenses (Re: 349) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/5/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 367 Order on Application for Compensation). Service Date 04/04/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying Trustee's Application for Compensation for Special Counsel for Estate(Re: 339) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion to Consolidate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Consolidate on Lead Case 07-03015 with Member Case 3-07-ap-03019. 07-03016, 08-03002, 08-03003, 08-03008 (Re: 24) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion to Consolidate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion to Consolidate on Lead Case 07-03015 with Member Case 3-07-ap-03018 (Re: 25) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 363 Report]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Report Monthly Accounting Report of N.A.F. Corp. for March 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - NAF's Monthly Accounting Report for March 2008). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 362 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript. Public access to this document will be restricted for 90 days from the date of filing, after which it will be available at the regular PACER fee. The transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office during the restricted period (read-only format) or copies may be purchased directly from the court reporter. Contact the Clerk's Office for court reporter information filed by [Re: 286 Proceeding Memo - Hearing Held,, ].Original sent by US Mail to Tallahassee on 3/26/08 (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 358 Objection, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/22/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 351 Order on Application for Administrative Expenses). Service Date 03/21/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary case 08-03008. Judge: MAM(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. against Sherry F. Chancellor Fee Amount $250 (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Objection to (339 Application for Compensation, 357 Memorandum of Law, 342 Objection, ) filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 339 Application for Compensation, 357 Memorandum of Law, 342 Objection, ) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Law filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 339 Application for Compensation, 342 Objection, ]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit Re: Application for Compensation for Special Counsel filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 350 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 03/20/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Intent to Sell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Intention to Sell Property of the Estate by Public Auction on April 9, 2008, at Long Beach Auto Auction, 8494 County Farm Road, Long Beach Mississippi filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 353 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Held (Re: 339 Application for Compensation)- Trustee to file affidavit of agreement; Appear.: Beasley (Atty. for Tee.), Chancellor (T), Collier (NAF); CRN: 5- Wanda Pearcey. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Report of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Report of Sale of vehicles at Gulf State Auto Auction filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Order on Application for Payment of Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Allowance of Administrative Expenses (Re: 298) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 349 Motion to Pay). Hearing scheduled on 4/24/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008, Terminated: 4/7/2008 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Pay for Subpoenaed Bank Records filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Bills for Bank Records). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/15/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 347 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 03/14/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Amended Motion for Payment Interim Trustee Expenses(Re: 345 Amended Motion) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Notice of Intent to Sell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Intention to Sell Property of the Estate at Auction, March 29, 2008, 1958 Lewis Turner Blvd., Ft. Walton Beach, FL filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008, Terminated: 3/12/2008 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Motion (Re: 314 Motion to Pay) filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 314 Motion to Pay). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Report Monthly Accounting Report of NAF Corp for February 2008 filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 342 Objection, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to (339 Application for Compensation) filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 339 Application for Compensation) (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Second Application for Employment of Special Counsel for Trustee2 Exhibit B - Order on Second Application for Employment of Special Counsel for the Trustee) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 340 Notice of Hearing On Aplc for Compensation, ). Service Date 02/21/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Notice of Hearing on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of hearing on application for compensation. Applicant, Robert O. Beasley, Esq. ,requests the amount of $ 10,652.58 (Re: 339 Application for Compensation). Hearing scheduled on 3/20/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008, Terminated: 4/2/2008 Application for Compensation (Negative Notice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation for Robert O. Beasley, Special Counsel, Fee: $10652.58, Expenses: $. filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 337 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 02/14/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order on Motion to Pay Administrative Expenses (Re: 336) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008, Terminated: 2/12/2008 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Pay Administrative expense to pay storage fees to secure property of estate filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/2/2008, Entered: 2/3/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 334 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement). Service Date 02/02/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulated Order Granting Amended Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement (Re: 310) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 331 Order on Application to Defer Fee Payment). Service Date 01/30/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report for January 2008 by NAF Corporation filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Order on Application to Defer Fee Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Motion to Defer Fee Payment Granting Application to Defer Filing Fee (Re: 325) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/27/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 328 Order on Motion to Compel). Service Date 01/27/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/26/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 323 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 01/25/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order On Withdrawal of Document re: Motion to Compel (Re: 321) (Isom, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: [326] Withdrawal of Document]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 326 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of Document (resolved) filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 321 Motion to Compel, 322 Certificate of Service]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008, Terminated: 1/28/2008 Application to Defer Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Defer Fee Payment filed by Robert Othell Beasley on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Beasley, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 324 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Held (Re: 298 Application for Administrative Expenses, )- Court takes under advisement; Appear.:: Chancellor (T), Venn (Pet. Cred.- Ciano), Collier/Kirk (Creds., AFCA,NAF); CRN: 5- David Deik. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 321 Motion to Compel). Hearing scheduled on 2/28/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 321 Motion to Compel]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 1/25/2008 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Compel N.A.F. Corporation's Motion to Compel Compliance and Brief in Support filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to ( Objection, Application for Administrative Expenses, ) filed by Petitioning Creditors Automotive Alternative, LLC, Anthony J. Ciano, Ciano Family Partnership, LLLP, Fact-O-Bake of Pensacola, Inc., Gulf States Auto Auction, LLC, Vannoy's Tires, Inc.. (Re: 305 Objection, 298 Application for Administrative Expenses, ) (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/21/2008, Entered: 1/21/2008 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 317 Objection, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/21/2008, Entered: 1/21/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary case 08-03003. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Sherry Chancellor against Ohio Funding Group Inc. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet2 Exhibit UCC3 Cover Sheet) (Chancellor, Sherry)JUDGE: MAM; Modified on 1/22/2008 to add judge (Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/21/2008, Entered: 1/21/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to (310 Motion to Approve Compromise) Limited Objection of N.A.F. Corporation to Second Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 310 Motion to Approve Compromise) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/21/2008, Entered: 1/21/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary case 08-03002. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Sherry Chancellor against N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet2 Exhibit 3 Exhibit 4 Exhibit) (Chancellor, Sherry)JUDGE: MAM; Modified on 1/22/2008 to add judge (Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 298 Application for Administrative Expenses, ]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008, Terminated: 1/7/2009 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Pay Interim Trustee expenses, specifically Westlaw Fees filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit) (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Interim Report of Trustee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Interim Report of Trustee 1-1-07 to 12-31-07. (Chancellor, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/13/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 311 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement). Service Date 01/13/2008. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Order on Compromise and Settlement (Re: 310) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008, Terminated: 1/31/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Motion to Approve Compromise and settlement filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 205 Motion to Approve Compromise). (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/29/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 308 Order on Application for Administrative Expenses). Service Date 12/28/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/24/2007, Entered: 12/24/2007 Order on Application for Payment of Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order to Pay Administrative Expense (Re: 304) (Broussard, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/22/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 303 Order on Motion for Relief From Stay). Service Date 12/21/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Ohio Funding Group, Inc. [Re: 305 Objection]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to (298 Application for Administrative Expenses, ) filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 298 Application for Administrative Expenses, ) (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 1-9) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007, Terminated: 12/24/2007 Application for Payment of Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting in part, Denying in part N.A.F. Corporation's Motion for Distribution of Trust Funds and/or Motion to Lift Stay (Re: 252) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/15/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 299 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 12/14/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 296 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 12/12/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor (Beasley, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 298 Application for Administrative Expenses, ). Hearing scheduled on 1/24/2008 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007, Terminated: 3/19/2008 Application for Payment of Administrative Expenses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Administrative Expenses and Request for Hearing filed by John E. Venn on behalf of Automotive Alternative, LLC, Anthony J. Ciano, Ciano Family Partnership, LLLP, Fact-O-Bake of Pensacola, Inc., Gulf States Auto Auction, LLC, Vannoy's Tires, Inc.. (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 297 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Held on 12/10/07; (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay)- Stay lifted with conditions as stated on the record in open court; Appear.: Hammer/Collier (NAF), Kirk (Local Csl. NAF), Thames (D), Chancellor (T), Beasley (Csl. for Tee), Levitt (Cred. Accept. Corp.); Order/Hammer; CRN: 16- LaQuada Williams. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order on Second Application for Employment of Special Counsel for the Trustee (Re: 249) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 295 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Submission Error Notification - Refiling of Document Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUBMISSION ERROR NOTIFICATION: Incorrect Filing Event - Document cannot be processed until re-filed using correct filing event; Please take immediate action to correct this error (Re: 294 Response). (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to ( Motion for Relief From Stay, Brief, ) Motion to Deny Relief filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor. (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay, 254 Brief, ) (Chancellor, DAH)SUBMISSION ERROR: Incorrect Filing Event; Modified on 12/10/2007 (Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of representation by Special Counsel filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 287 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement). Service Date 12/05/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit Re: Rule 2014 filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 289 Notice (Generic)]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Call-In Information for Telephonic Conference filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Re: 279 Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit Re: Waiver of Conflict by Alan Siskind filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 286 Proceeding Memo - Hearing Held, ]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement (Re: 280) (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Held on 11/29/07; (Re: 205 Motion to Approve Compromise- Court approves joint stipulation to approval of compromise; Order/Chancellor; 249 Application to Employ)- Approved as stated on the record in open court; Mr. Beasley to file supplemental affidavit within 20 days; Order/Chancellor; Appear.: Chancellor (T), Beasley (Sp. Csl); Emmanuel ; CRN: 5- Connie Morse. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 279 Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay). Service Date 11/29/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 277 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 11/28/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to ( Objection, ) filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor. (Re: 251 Objection, ) (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 282 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of cancelled hearing. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/07 is cancelled prior to hearing date (Re: 211 Motion to Compel); Movant will file a withdrawal of the motion immediately. filed by DAH Chancellor. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit A filed by Trent Bryce Collier, DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 280 Motion to Approve Compromise]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007, Terminated: 12/3/2007 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 232 Objection, ). (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Continued Preliminary Hearing (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled on 12/10/2007 at 02:15 PM at Via TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Ohio Funding Group Inc. (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Continuing Hearing until 12/10/07 on (275 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing, ). Hearing to be re-scheduled by separate notice (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Sherry Chancellor, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 275 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Continue Hearing on 252 Motion for Relief From Stay, 255 Notice of Prelim Hearing (Telephone Conf) on Motion for Relief Stipulated Motion for Continuance filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Sherry Chancellor, N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - proposed Order Adjourning Hearing). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 273 Reply,, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to (252 Motion for Relief From Stay) Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Distribution of Trust Funds and/or Relief from Automatic Stay filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay) (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - NAF Contracts Summary for Key Auto2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Gerald Kocak3 Exhibit C-1 - Debtor's Schedules4 Exhibit C-2 - Debtor's Schedules (continued)5 Exhibit D - Debtor's Claims Register6 Exhibit E - Open Invoices) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor.RE 273 (Chancellor, DAH) Modified on 11/26/2007 to add link(Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Michael C. Hammer on behalf of Ohio Funding Group, Inc. [Re: 270 Notice of Appearance]. (Hammer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Ohio Funding Group, Inc. (Hammer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Ohio Funding Group, Inc. [Re: 268 Notice of Appearance]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Ohio Funding Group, Inc. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 11/18/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 266 Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay). Service Date 11/18/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Preliminary Hearing (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay). Hearing scheduled on 11/26/2007 at 02:45 PM at Via TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Law in Support of Response to Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 264 Response] (Attachments: 1 Case Law and Statutes in Support of Memorandum). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to ( Motion for Relief From Stay) filed by Trustee Sherry Chancellor. (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay) (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 262 Affidavit, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Gerald Kocak filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay, 255 Notice of Prelim Hearing (Telephone Conf) on Motion for Relief] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note2 Exhibit B - Security Agreement3 Exhibit C - UCC Financing Form4 Exhibit E - "buy here/pay here" loan receivables). (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 11/4/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 258 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 11/04/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/3/2007, Entered: 11/4/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 255 Notice of Prelim Hearing (Telephone Conf) on Motion for Relief). Service Date 11/03/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/3/2007, Entered: 11/4/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 256 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 11/03/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 249 Application to Employ). Hearing scheduled on 11/29/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (CORRECT DATE/LOCATION) (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 250 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 11/01/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 249 Application to Employ). Hearing scheduled on 12/6/2007 at 10:30 AM at Gainesville (Courtroom 3, Third Floor, U.S. Courthouse, 401 S.E. First Avenue). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Order & Notice of Prelim Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay (Negative Notice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order and Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay. Preliminary hearing to be held on 11/26/2007 (Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay). Responses due by 11/16/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief IN Support of Motion for Distribution of Trust Funds And/Or Relief From Automatic Stay filed by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 252 Motion for Relief From Stay] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Exhibit E). (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 253 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Auto-docket of online payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(07-30419-LMK) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 150.00) filing fee. Receipt number 1210850, amount $ 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 12/19/2007 Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Relief from Stay And/Or Distribution of Trust Funds [ Fee Amount $150] filed by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Second Application For Employment Of Special Counsel For Trustee filed by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 249 Application to Employ] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A). (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Authorizing Employment of Recovery Agent (Re: 239) signed on 10/30/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 12/10/2007 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second Application to Employ Robert O. Beasley as Special Counsel filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Verified Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Verified Statement of Long Beach Auto Auction filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 240 Application to Employ). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Verified Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Verified Statement of Northwest Florida Recovery filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 239 Application to Employ). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/28/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 242 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 10/28/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/28/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 241 Order on Motion for Turnover of Property). Service Date 10/28/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/28/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 243 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 10/28/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 205 Motion to Approve Compromise). Hearing scheduled on 11/29/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application to Employ Long Beach Auto Auction as auctioneer (Re: 240) signed on 10/26/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Order on Motion for Turnover of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Resolving Motion for Turnover of Property (Re: 196) signed on 10/26/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007, Terminated: 10/26/2007 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Employ Long Beach Auto Auction as Auctioneer filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007, Terminated: 10/30/2007 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ Northwest Florida Recovery as Recovery Agent filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of Document filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 196 Motion for Turnover). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 229 Order on Motion for Turnover of Property). Service Date 10/24/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 228 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 10/24/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 227 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 10/24/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 226 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 10/24/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 232 Objection, ]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to (205 Motion to Approve Compromise) Limited Objection of N.A.F. Corporation to Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement filed by Creditor N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Re: 205 Motion to Approve Compromise) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Mark Horvath [Re: 230 Response]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to ( Motion to Compel) filed by Interested Party Mark Horvath. (Re: 211 Motion to Compel) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Order on Motion for Turnover of Property
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Resolving Motion for Turnover of Property (Re: 108) signed on 10/22/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Resolving Amended Motion (Re: 139 Amended Motion) signed on 10/22/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Resolving Amended Motion (Re: 140 Amended Motion) signed on 10/22/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Resolving Amended Motion (Re: 138 Amended Motion) signed on 10/22/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of Document filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 108 Motion for Turnover]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of Document filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 139 Amended Motion]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Withdrawal of Document filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 140 Amended Motion]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of Document filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 138 Amended Motion]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Hearing Cancelled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of cancelled hearing. Hearing scheduled for 10/30/07 is cancelled prior to hearing date (Re: 108 Motion for Turnover, 139 Amended Motion, 138 Amended Motion, 140 Amended Motion); Movant will file a withdrawal of the motion immediately. filed by DAH Chancellor. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 218 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 10/17/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ Robert O. Beasley as Special Counsel filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 140 Amended Motion to Avoid Lien, 138 Amended Motion to Avoid Lien, 139 Amended Motion to Avoid Lien). Hearing scheduled on 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola via VIDEO CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/13/2007, Entered: 10/14/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 214 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 10/13/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/13/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 213 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 10/12/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/13/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 212 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Agreement). Service Date 10/12/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 211 Motion to Compel). Hearing scheduled on 11/29/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion for Authority to Pay (Re: 197) signed on 10/10/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order on Compromise and Settlement (Re: 205) signed on 10/10/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007, Terminated: 2/18/2009 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Compel filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/7/2007, Entered: 10/8/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 206 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Service Date 10/07/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Detroit II Automobiles, Inc. [Re: 203 Response]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc. [Re: 202 Response]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Trent Bryce Collier on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc. [Re: 201 Response]. (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on motion to extend time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order on Motion to Extend Time (Extended for 30 days) (Re: 182) signed on 10/5/2007. (Broussard, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007, Terminated: 1/7/2009 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 200 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). Service Date 10/04/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to ( Amended Motion) to Avoid Lien filed by Creditor Detroit II Automobiles, Inc.. (Re: 139 Amended Motion) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to ( Amended Motion) to Avoid Lien filed by Creditor Auto Finance Center of America, Inc.. (Re: 140 Amended Motion) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to ( Amended Motion) to Avoid Lien filed by Creditor Auto Finance Center of America, Inc.. (Re: 138 Amended Motion) (Collier, Trent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order On Motion to Withdraw As Attorney (Re: 183) signed on 10/2/2007. (Isom, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/29/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 198 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 09/28/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 196 Motion for Turnover). Hearing scheduled on 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola via VIDEO CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007, Terminated: 10/10/2007 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Pay Escambia County Sheriff's Department Impound Fees filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007, Terminated: 10/26/2007 Motion for Turnover
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Turnover (Vehicle(s) of Estate) filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/22/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 189 Order on Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 09/22/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 187 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 09/21/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 186 Order re Amended Motion). Service Date 09/21/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Notice of Intent to Abandon & Opportunity to Object
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Intent to Abandon 1994 Lincoln filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 185 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 09/20/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 184 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 09/20/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Order on Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Resolving Motion to Avoid Lien (Re: 110) signed on 9/20/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Document filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor [Re: 141 Amended Motion, 110 Motion to Avoid Lien]. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Motion to Pay Deal Pack (Re: 167) signed on 9/19/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order re Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Motion to Pay Title Fees (Re: 173 Amended Motion) signed on 9/19/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 176 Response). Hearing scheduled on 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola via VIDEO CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 183 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). Hearing scheduled on 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola via VIDEO CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Louis L. Long Jr. on behalf of Ohio Funding Group, Inc.. (Long, Louis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 10/5/2007 Motion To Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Extend Time to Accept or Reject Executory Contracts filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/16/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 179 Expedited Order: Granted). Service Date 09/16/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service of Order Granting Credit Acceptance's Agreed Motion for Enlargment of Time filed by Peter H. Levitt on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation [Re: 179 Expedited Order: Granted]. (Levitt, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Expedited Order: Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GRANTED Credit Acceptance's Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time for 1 day (to 9-12-07) signed on 9/14/2007 (Re: 174 Motion to Extend Time). (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 172 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 09/12/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit Re: of Jeffrey Michael Brock in Support of Credit Acceptance's Response to Trustee's Motion for Turnover and Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Peter H. Levitt on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation [Re: 176 Response] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A2 Exhibit Exhibit B). (Levitt, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to ( Motion for Turnover) and its Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Interested Party Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Re: 108 Motion for Turnover) (Levitt, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Report of Trustee re: Conclusion of 341(a) Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trustee's memo/notice that 341(a) meeting of creditors was held and concluded (Chancellor, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Motion To Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Turnover filed by Peter H. Levitt on behalf of Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Levitt, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Motion (Re: 166 Motion to Pay) Amended to attach correct PDF filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 166 Motion to Pay). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Continued Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 108 Motion for Turnover). Hearing scheduled on 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola via VIDEO CONFERENCE. (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Motion (Re: 167 Motion to Pay) Amended to include Attachment filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 167 Motion to Pay). (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/9/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 164 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 09/09/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/9/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 163 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 09/09/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/8/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 155 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). Service Date 09/07/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Pay for Deal Pack filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007, Terminated: 1/7/2009 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Pay Titles Fee filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Order on Application to Defer Fee Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order on Second Motion to Defer Fee Granting Application to Defer Filing Fee (Re: 144) signed on 9/7/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Continue Hearing on (154 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing)until October calendar. Hearing to be re-scheduled by separate notice signed on 9/7/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Authorizing Employment of Accountant (Re: 156) signed on 9/7/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Interested Party Credit Acceptance Corporation (Levitt, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 149 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 09/06/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 148 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 09/06/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 147 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 09/06/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 146 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 09/06/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 145 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 09/06/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007, Terminated: 9/7/2007 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Employ Mary Buchholz as Accountant filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Withdrawal of Document Resolving Motion to Continue Hearing on (151 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing, ). (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/7/2007 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Continue Hearing on 108 Motion for Turnover filed by PAM Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of Document filed by Sherry Chancellor (Re: 151 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing, ). (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary case 07-03019. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Sherry Chancellor against Auto Finance Center of America, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet) (Chancellor, Sherry)JUDGE:MAM; Modified on 9/5/2007 (Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 Motion to Continue or Reschedule Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Continue Hearing on 113 Motion to Avoid Lien, 142 Amended Motion, 141 Amended Motion, 138 Amended Motion, 140 Amended Motion, 109 Motion to Avoid Lien, 108 Motion for Turnover, 139 Amended Motion, 110 Motion to Avoid Lien, 112 Motion to Avoid Lien, 111 Motion to Avoid Lien filed by PAM Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary case 07-03018. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Sherry Chancellor against Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet) (Chancellor, Sherry)JUDGE:MAM Modified on 9/5/2007 (Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien of Ohio Funding Group, Inc.(Re: 142 Amended Motion). Responses due by 10/4/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien of N.A.F. Corporation (Re: 141 Amended Motion). Responses due by 10/4/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien of Auto Finance Center of America(Re: 140 Amended Motion). Responses due by 10/4/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien of Detroit II Automobiles, Inc. (Re: 139 Amended Motion). Responses due by 10/4/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien of Auto Finance Center of America (Re: 138 Amended Motion). Responses due by 10/4/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007, Terminated: 9/7/2007 Application to Defer Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Motion to Defer Fee filed by Sherry Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/1/2007, Entered: 9/2/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. (Re: 124 Notice of Hearing). Service Date 09/01/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2009 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Motion (Re: 112 Motion to Avoid Lien) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH) [Service Address: Ohio Funding Group, Inc. 25221 Dequindre, Madison Heights, MI 48071]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Motion (Re: 110 Motion to Avoid Lien) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH) [Service Address: N.A.F. Corporation 27771 Ford Road, Garden City, MI 48135]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Motion (Re: 113 Motion to Avoid Lien) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH) [Service Address: Auto Finance Center of America 25221Dequindre, Madison Heights MI 48071]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Motion (Re: 111 Motion to Avoid Lien) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH) [Service Address: Detroit II Automobiles 27777Ford Road. Garden City, MI 48135]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Amended Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Motion (Re: 109 Motion to Avoid Lien) filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH) [Service Address: Auto Finance Center of America 25221 Dequindre, Madison Heights MI 48071]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Notice of Intent to Sell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Intention to Sell Property of the Estate private sale to John W. Roche filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 122 Order on Application to Defer Fee Payment). Service Date 08/30/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 121 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 08/30/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 120 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 08/30/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 119 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 08/30/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 118 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 08/30/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Re: 117 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien). Service Date 08/30/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Financial Affairs (Part 2 of 2) filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc.. (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Statement of Financial Affairs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Financial Affairs (Part 1 of 2) filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. [Re: [99] Update Deficiency Deadlines, ]. (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. [Re: [99] Update Deficiency Deadlines, ]. (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration re: Concerning Debtor's Schedules filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. [Re: [99] Update Deficiency Deadlines, ]. (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Summary of Assets and Liabilities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summary of Schedules filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Schedule A2 Schedule B3 Schedule C4 Schedule D5 Schedule E6 Schedule F7 Schedule G8 Schedule H). (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Summary of Assets and Liabilities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summary of Schedules filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. [Re: [99] Update Deficiency Deadlines, ]. (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing (Re: 108 Motion for Turnover). Hearing scheduled on 9/27/2007 at 09:00 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). (Kantor, Martie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 107 Order on Motion to Pay). Service Date 08/29/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Order on Application to Defer Fee Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Motion to Defer Fee (Re: 114) signed on 8/28/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien re Auto Finance Center of America (Re: 113 Motion to Avoid Lien). Responses due by 9/27/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien re Ohio Funding Group (Re: 112 Motion to Avoid Lien). Responses due by 9/27/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien re Detroit II Automobiles, Inc. (Re: 111 Motion to Avoid Lien). Responses due by 9/27/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien re N.A.F. Corporation (Re: 110 Motion to Avoid Lien). Responses due by 9/27/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Motion to Avoid Lien re Auto Finance Center of America(Re: 109 Motion to Avoid Lien). Responses due by 9/27/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary case 07-03016. Judge:MAM; (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Sherry Chancellor against Auto Finance Center of America, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet) (Chancellor, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary case 07-03015.Judge:MAM; (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Sherry Chancellor against Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Cover Sheet) (Chancellor, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 8/28/2007 Application to Defer Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Defer Fee for filing Complaints against Auto Finance Center of America and Detroit II Automobiles, Inc. filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Avoid Lien of Auto Finance Center of America Lien Lists Alan Siskind as addtional Debtor filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Avoid Lien of Ohio Funding Group, Inc. filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Avoid Lien of Detroit II Automobiles, Inc. filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Avoid Lien of N.A.F. Corporation filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 1/18/2011 Motion to Avoid Lien
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Avoid Lien of Auto Finance Center of America filed by DAH Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion for Turnover
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Turnover (Funds Held By Credit Acceptance Corporation) filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, DAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Order on Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Authorizing Payment (Re: 104) signed on 8/27/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (Re: 105 Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 7, ). Service Date 08/23/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007, Terminated: 12/14/2007 Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Meeting of Creditors . 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/12/2007 at 10:30 AM at Pensacola (Courtroom 220 W. Garden Street, Suite 700). Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/13/2007. Proofs of Claims due by 12/13/2007. (Mirra, M.) Modified on 10/22/2007 to remove deadline for filing Financial Management (Mirra, M.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion to Pay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Pay Secured Creditor - Loss Recovery filed by PAM Chancellor on behalf of Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Compliance with Court Order Dated August 15, 2007 filed by Debtor Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Re: 101 Order Directing Immediate Compliance). (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/18/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 101 Order Directing Immediate Compliance). Service Date 08/17/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Order Directing Immediate Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Directing Immediate Compliance. The following documents were not filed at the time of the filing of petition and are due from the debtor(s): Matrix; signed on 8/15/2007. Deadline for immediate compliance 8/20/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/11/2007, Entered: 8/12/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 98 Order). Service Date 08/11/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Update Deficiency Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deficiency Deadlines Updated . Schedule A due 8/30/2007. Schedule B due 8/30/2007. Schedule C due 8/30/2007. Schedule D due 8/30/2007. Schedule E due 8/30/2007. Schedule F due 8/30/2007. Schedule G due 8/30/2007. Schedule H due 8/30/2007. Summary of schedules due 8/30/2007. Form B6 - Statistical Summary due 8/30/2007. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/30/2007. Atty Disclosure Statement due 8/30/2007. Corporate Parent Statement due by 8/30/2007. (Broussard, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Extension of Time to Cure Deficiency Notice signed on 8/9/2007 (Re: 96 Consent). (Broussard, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 95 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 08/08/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Consent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Cure Clerk's Deficiency Notice filed by William K. Thames II on behalf of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Order). (Thames, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Authorizing Employment of Auctioneer re: Clyde Jackson Auction Services (Re: 94) signed on 8/6/2007. (Isom, L.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007, Terminated: 8/6/2007 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Employ Clyde Jackson as Auctioneer filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Petitioning Creditor Columbus Bank and Trust Company (Bates, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joinder in an Involuntary Petition filed by Philip Alan Bates on behalf of Columbus Bank and Trust Company. (Bates, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/5/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 89 Order on Application to Employ). Service Date 08/05/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/4/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Notice of Deficiency (Re: 83 Notice of Deficiency - Initial, , ). Service Date 08/03/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Order on Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing Employment of Attorney for the Trustee (Re: 88) signed on 8/3/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Employ Sherry F. Chancellor and Thomas G. Morton, Jr. as Attorney for Trustee filed by Sherry Chancellor. (Chancellor, PAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment). Service Date 08/02/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 82 Order for Relief in an Involuntary Case). Service Date 08/02/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder in an Involuntary Petition filed by Keith L. Bell Jr. on behalf of T. A. American Car Care Center, Inc.. (Bell, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 79 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). Service Date 08/01/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Notice of Deficiency - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Deficient Filing. The following documents were not filed at the time of the filing of petition and are due from the debtor(s): . 45-day Auto-Dismissal 9/17/2007 Schedule A due 8/16/2007. Schedule B due 8/16/2007. Schedule C due 8/16/2007. Schedule D due 8/16/2007. Schedule E due 8/16/2007. Schedule F due 8/16/2007. Schedule G due 8/16/2007. Schedule H due 8/16/2007. Summary of schedules due 8/16/2007. Form B6 - Statistical Summary due 8/16/2007. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/16/2007. Atty Disclosure Statement due 8/16/2007. Corporate Parent Statement due by 08/16/2007. Incomplete Filings due by 8/16/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Order for Relief in an Involuntary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order for Relief in an Involuntary Case signed on 7/31/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Order on motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Petitioning Creditors' Motion for Summary Judgment (Re: 12) signed on 7/31/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Trustee added to case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sherry Chancellor added to case . (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Brief (Supplemental) in Opposition to Petitioning Creditors' Motion for Summary Judgment 12 filed by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc.. (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Withdraw As Attorney (Re: 46) signed on 7/30/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder in an Involuntary Petition Corrected filed by Louis L. Long Jr. on behalf of Ohio Funding Group, Inc.. (Long, Louis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joinder in an Involuntary Petition filed by Louis L. Long Jr. on behalf of Ohio Funding Group, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A). (Long, Louis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Proceeding Memo/Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Held (Re: 46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney)- Granted; Appear.: Long (Ohio), Kirk; Order/Kirk; CRN: 5- Wanda Pearcey. (Nah, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Ohio Funding Group, Inc. (Long, Louis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/21/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 72 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay With Consent of Parties). Service Date 07/20/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief (Reply Brief in Opposition to Petitioning Creditors' Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Trent Bryce Collier, William K. Thames II, Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 12 Motion for Summary Judgment, 68 Response,, ]. (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay With Consent of Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion for Relief From Stay With Consent of Parties (Re: 55) signed on 7/18/2007. (Mirra, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to ( Brief, ) filed by Petitioning Creditors Ace Unlocks of Pensacola, Inc., Automotive Alternative, LLC, Fact-O-Bake of Pensacola, Inc., Gulf States Auto Auction, LLC, Kell Recovery, Lee Auto Transport, McKenzie Motor Company, Mediacom, P.A.T. Auto Transport, Inc., Vannoy's Tires, Inc., Want Ads of Pensacola, Inc., William's Transmissions, Inc.. (Re: 70 Brief, ) (Bell, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Brief (Second) in Opposition to Petitioning Creditors' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 12 Motion for Summary Judgment] (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B). (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joinder in an Involuntary Petition filed by Keith L. Bell Jr. on behalf of Mediacom. (Bell, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to ( Brief,, ) Petitioning Creditors Response to Joint Supplemental Brief filed by Petitioning Creditors Automotive Alternative, LLC, Anthony J. Ciano, Ciano Family Partnership, LLLP, Fact-O-Bake of Pensacola, Inc., Gulf States Auto Auction, LLC, Vannoy's Tires, Inc.. (Re: 63 Brief,, ) (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A-Invoices2 Exhibit B-Summary of Checks3 Exhibit C-Consolidated List of Creditors4 Exhibit D-Letters re default5 Exhibit E-Bank Statement6 Exhibit F-Balance Sheets7 Exhibit G-2004 Tax Return) (Venn, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath (Hammer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/14/2007 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 56 Order on Motion for Relief From Stay). Service Date 07/13/2007. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joinder in an Involuntary Petition filed by Keith L. Bell Jr. on behalf of William's Transmissions, Inc.. (Bell, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Certificate of Service/Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service filed by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 63 Brief,, ]. (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Petitioning Creditors' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Trent Bryce Collier, William K. Thames II, Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc. [Re: 12 Motion for Summary Judgment] (Attachments: 1 Index Of Exhibits2 Exhibit A3 Exhibit B4 Exhibit C5 Exhibit D6 Exhibit E7 Exhibit F8 Exhibit G9 Exhibit H10 Exhibit I). (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Joinder in Involuntary Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder in an Involuntary Petition filed by Keith L. Bell Jr. on behalf of McKenzie Motor Company. (Bell, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Jennifer Wheeler filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Alleged Debtor Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Attachment2 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript) (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Della Smith filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Alleged Debtor Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Attachment2 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript) (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Roger Hackney filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Alleged Debtor Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Attachment2 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript) (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Deposition of Anthony Ciano filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Alleged Debtor Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Attachment2 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript 13 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript 24 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript 35 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript 46 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript 5) (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Deposition of Thomas Garrett filed by Creditors Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II, Automobiles, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Interested Parties Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Donald Foss, Mark Horvath, Alleged Debtors Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Attachment2 Exhibit to Deposition Transcript) (Kirk, Donald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?