OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC et al v. KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-00209-MCR-MD
District Judge M CASEY RODGERS, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 2, 2017 at 5:05 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trent B. Collier +1 248 355 4141 +1 248 355 2277 trent.collier@ceflawyers.com
Space Michael C. Hammer +1 734 623 7075 +1 734 623 1625 mchammer2@dickinsonwright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Radey Thomas Yon & Clark, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space REX D WARE +1 850 425 6654 rware@radeylaw.com
No Logo Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Collins, Einhorn, Farrell & Ulanoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trent B. Collier +1 248 355 4141 +1 248 355 2277 trent.collier@ceflawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C. Hammer +1 734 623 7075 +1 734 623 1625 mchammer2@dickinsonwright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Radey Thomas Yon & Clark, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space REX D WARE +1 850 425 6654 rware@radeylaw.com
No Logo N A F CORPORATION INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Collins, Einhorn, Farrell & Ulanoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trent B. Collier +1 248 355 4141 +1 248 355 2277 trent.collier@ceflawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C. Hammer +1 734 623 7075 +1 734 623 1625 mchammer2@dickinsonwright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Radey Thomas Yon & Clark, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space REX D WARE +1 850 425 6654 rware@radeylaw.com
No Logo OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John David Emmanuel +1 813 228 7411 +1 813 229 8313 emmanuel@fowlerwhite.com
Space Donald R. Kirk +1 813 229 4334 dkirk@carltonfields.com
v.
No Logo ALAN SISKIND, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSS ALAN KEENE +1 850 438 3111 +1 850 432 1919 rkeene@berosetkeene.com
No Logo ANTHONY CIANO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PATRICK MICHAEL PATTERSON +1 850 433 6581 +1 850 434 5856 pmp@esclaw.com
Space John E. Venn +1 850 438 0005 +1 850 438 1881 johnevennjrpa@aol.com
No Logo Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O Beasley +1 850 432 9818 +1 850 432 9830 rob@lawpensacola.com
Space MICHELLE LYNN HENDRIX +1 850 433 5461 +1 850 432 0166 mhendrix@florida-law.com
No Logo ALAN SISKIND, ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BEROSET & KEENE - PENSACOLA FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSS ALAN KEENE +1 850 438 3111 +1 850 432 1919 rkeene@berosetkeene.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Litvak Beasley & Wilson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O Beasley +1 850 432 9818 +1 850 432 9830 rob@lawpensacola.com
No Logo Foss, Donald A., ThirdParty Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD FOSS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Collins, Einhorn, Farrell & Ulanoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trent B. Collier +1 248 355 4141 +1 248 355 2277 trent.collier@ceflawyers.com
No Logo MARK HORVATH, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Collins, Einhorn, Farrell & Ulanoff, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trent B. Collier +1 248 355 4141 +1 248 355 2277 trent.collier@ceflawyers.com
No Logo SHERRY F CHANCELLOR, Trustee
Office Pensacola
Filed 5/18/2007
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Santa Rosa
Terminated 3/2/2009
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags STAYED,CLOSED,MEDIATION
  Entries (198) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by ANTHONY CIANO, ALAN SISKIND, KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Attorney Time Record
    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Attorney Time Record
        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
          ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The action is DISMISSED from the active docket of the Court. In the event settlement is not consummated, the Court reserves the power, upon motion filed by any party within (60) days of the date of this Order, to amend or vacate and set aside this Order of Dismissal and reinstate the case. At this time, the Clerk is directed to close the file in this case for administrative purpose, and upon the expiration of (60) days without activity, the Clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 3/2/2009. (laj)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Mediation Report - Settled
            MEDIATION REPORT - Settled. (FLEET, HOWARD)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Action Required by District Judge
              ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [164] Mediation Report - Settled (lcu)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER - GRANTING [162] Notice of Settlement of All Pending Matters and Unopposed Motion to Stay Ruling on Pending Motions. All proceedings in this case are stayed for (30) days. It is expected that counsel will file the appropriate settlement documents and Notice of Dismissal within the (30) days period. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 2/18/2009.Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 3/20/2009. (laj)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                  ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [162] Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay Ruling on Pending Motions. (laj)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Notice of settlement
                    NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay Ruling on Pending Motions by ALAN SISKIND (KEENE, ROSS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [161] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to [156] Motion to Dismiss Amended Third Party Complaint. (laj)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009, Terminated: 3/2/2009 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Amended Third Party Complaint by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
                          Amended NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC (COLLIER, TRENT)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 Attorney Time Record
                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
                                NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009, Terminated: 3/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                  MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Amended Third Party Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/2/2009). (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                    AMENDED ANSWER to [110] First Amended Complaint and Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against DONALD FOSS and MARK HORVATH by ALAN SISKIND. Document reposted by Clerk for tracking purposes, see [154]. (laj)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Answer
                                      Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS) Modified on 12/31/2008 - See Docket entry [155], Pleading reposted (laj)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                        ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [151] Order, Nothing filed. (laj)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Attorney Time Record
                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                              ORDER - GRANTING [150] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Third Party Complaint in Lieu of Response to Third Party Defendant's [143] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 12/2/2008. (laj)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [150] First MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Party Complaint. (laj)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 150 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008, Terminated: 12/2/2008 motion to amend/correct
                                                  First MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Party Complaint by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER - GRANTING [148] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [143] MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/17/2008. (laj)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [148] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint. (laj)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008, Terminated: 11/17/2008 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Third Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 response in opposition to motion
                                                          The wrong event code was used - Attorney has refiled the document using the correct event - see [148] entry. RESPONSE in Opposition re [143] MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Response to Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint filed by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS) Modified on 11/14/2008 to "annotate entry". (laj).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Attorney Time Record
                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Case Referred to Mediation
                                                                CASE REFERRED to Mediation - pursuant to [140] Order. (laj)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                  ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: Pltf's [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, Dft's [131] Response to Motion and Pltf's [142] Statement of Facts in Support. (laj)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008, Terminated: 3/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/18/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement) (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Statement of facts
                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS Re: [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - NAF Security Agreement, # (3) Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Answer of Defendant Alan Siskind, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Continuing Guaranty, # (6) Exhibit 5 - Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # (7) Exhibit 6 - Motion to Approve Compromise, # (8) Exhibit 7 - NAF Proof of Claim) (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK MICHAEL PATTERSON on behalf of ANTHONY CIANO (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          FINAL SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL - 1) Jury Trial set for 10/19/2009 at 8:30 AM in Pensacola before District Judge M CASEY RODGERS; 2) Discovery due by 3/15/2009; 3) Pltfs and Third Party Defendants shall be allowed until 10/30/2008 to join additional parties and Dfts shall be allowed until 11/15/2008 to amend the pleadings. Disclosures of retained expert witnesses their written reports under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Pltfs (and/or Horvath and Foss) on or before 3/1/2009. Pltfs (and/or Horvath and Foss) may file a Reply to Dfts' expert reports by 3/15/09. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2008. (laj)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Discovery Advisory
                                                                            DISCOVERY ADVISORY - Re: [136] Notice of Filing filed by AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, MARK HORVATH, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, N A F CORPORATION INC and DONALD FOSS - Counsels attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (laj)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by ANTHONY CIANO. (PATTERSON, PATRICK)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Notice - other
                                                                                  NOTICE Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures of Ohio Funding Group, Inc., Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) and Certificate of Service by MARK HORVATH, DONALD FOSS, OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [135] Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (laj)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER AND NOTICE - Re: [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - The Motion will be taken under advisement by the Court on 10/27/2008. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 10/6/2008. (laj)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Response/Reply
                                                                                          RESPONSE re [114] Answer to Amended Complaint by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                            ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and [131] Response to Motion and [132] Status Report. (laj)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Status report
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT In Response to this Court's Order filed as Docket #109 by SHERRY F CHANCELLOR. (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Response to motion
                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                  Defendant Alan Siskind's ANSWER to [110] Amended Complaint and THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS) Modified on 10/1/2008 to correct "docket text" and "linkage" (laj).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER - GRANTING [128] Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to [110] First Amended Complaint. ALAN SISKIND's Answer due 9/23/2008. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 9/19/2008. (laj)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [128] Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [110] Amended Complaint. (laj)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008, Terminated: 9/19/2008 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [110] Amended Complaint, by ALAN SISKIND. (KEENE, ROSS)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by ROSS ALAN KEENE on behalf of ALAN SISKIND (KEENE, ROSS)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by N A F CORPORATION INC. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER - Re: [113] Motion - Dft SISKIND has (14) days from the entry of this Order to obtain counsel. If counsel does not appear on his behalf within this time period, SISKIND will be deemed to be proceeding pro se. In any event, SISKIND's response to NAF's Motion must be filed within (20) days from the date entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 9/2/2008. Pltf's attorney appearance due by 9/17/2008 and Pltf's Response to Motion due by 9/23/2008). (laj)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2008; Discovery due by 12/23/2008. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 9/2/2008. (laj)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER - GRANTING [119] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to [110] First Amended Complaint. ALAN SISKIND's Answer due 9/15/2008. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/27/2008. (laj)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                          ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [119] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to [110] First Amended Complaint. (laj)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                            (Second) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to [110] First Amended Complaint by ALAN SISKIND. (laj)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Deficiency ORDER - Re: [117] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [110] Amended Complaint and [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALAN SISKIND - The document shall remain in the electronic file, but the Court will not consider it until you have corrected the deficiencies through the filing of a corrected document. The document is denied without prejudice with leave given to refile after correction. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/22/2008. (laj)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [117] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [110] Amended Complaint and [113] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (laj)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Response to [110] First Amended Complaint and [113] MOTION for (Final) Partial Summary Judgment by ALAN SISKIND. (laj)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to [110] Amended Complaint, by ANTHONY CIANO. (VENN, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008, Terminated: 3/2/2009 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by N A F CORPORATION INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/25/2008). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment, # (3) Exhibit 2 - NAF Note, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Continuing Guaranty, # (5) Exhibit 4 - NAF Security Agreement, # (6) Exhibit 5 - Notice of Default) (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC re [110] Amended Complaint, (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                              DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT - Re: [110] Amended Complaint, filed by AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC and N A F CORPORATION INC - The pleading does not have a Certificate of Service. The attorney is requested to file a Certificate of Service for the pleading as soon as possible. The pleading does not have to be re-filed. The correct event code is located under Civil Events/Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANTHONY CIANO, ALAN SISKIND, filed by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit H) (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The Trustee is hereby directed to file a supplemental status report of the bankruptcy proceedings within 120 days of this order or upon disposition of the bankruptcy proceedings, whichever occurs first. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/10/08. Status Report due by 10/7/2008. (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re [106] Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,. (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [107] Status Report (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Status report
                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by SHERRY F CHANCELLOR. (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Trustee Sherry Chancellor shall have ten (10) days from the date of this order to file the report as previously directed and to shall show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/08. Show Cause Response due by 7/23/2008. (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                            ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: Proposed Initial Scheduling Order (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                              ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [105] Order, No Status Report or Motion filed. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadline pursuant to [105] Order (Defendant, Siskind, will have fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order to re-file his motion to dismiss to the extent he finds warranted under applicable law). Miscellaneous Deadline - by 6/3/2008. (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The Motion to Dismiss filed by NAF, AFCA, Detroit II, Horvath, and Foss [100] is GRANTED. KALC's counterclaims against NAF, AFCA, and Detroit II and its third-party claims against Horvath and Foss are DISMISSED without prejudice. KALC's counterclaim against Ohio Funding and its third-party claim against CAC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Siskind's third-party claim against Horvath is DISMISSED without prejudice. The plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint [5] is GRANTED. The Amended Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Action filed by Horvath and Foss [14], the Amended Motion to Dismiss Answer, to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for KALC, and/or to Dismiss RICO Claim filed by Horvath and Foss [15], and the Motion to Dismiss or Stay Third Party Claim and Compel Arbitration filed by CAC [18] are DENIED as moot. The clerk is directed to terminate Credit Acceptance Corporation, Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss as parties to this case. The remaining parties (the plaintiffs, Siskind, and Defendant Anthony Ciano) will proceed according to a new scheduling order which will be entered separately. Chancellor shall file a status report in this court within thirty (30) days regarding the status of the bankruptcy proceedings, including an explanation of the impact of those proceedings if any on the litigation before this court. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 5/20/08. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson and/or Motion for Clarification [4] shall be stayed during KALC's bankruptcy proceedings. Statues Report due: 6/20/08(lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [104] Response by TRUSTEE re [103] Order. (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [103] Order, [100] MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Claims by N.A.F. Corporation, Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss. . (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [100] MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Claims and [102] Response to Motion. Ms. Chancellor and Mr. Siskind are directed to file their responses to these inquiries within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. Failure to file a response within the allotted time will result in dismissal of the claims stated in the preceding paragraph.Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 2/27/08.Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/13/2008). (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                          ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [100] MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Claims by N.A.F. Corporation, Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss; Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 and [101] Memorandum in Support of Motion and [102] Response to Motion. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [100] MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Claims by N.A.F. Corporation, Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss; Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 filed by SHERRY F CHANCELLOR. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [100] MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Claims by N.A.F. Corporation, Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss; Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 and Certificate of Service filed by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Claims by N.A.F. Corporation, Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Mark Horvath, and Donald Foss; Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1 by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/11/2008). (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                  ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [99] Status Report (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by SHERRY F CHANCELLOR. (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - Re: [97] Status Report - It is hereby ordered that Ms. Chancellor shall file in this Court a Supplemental Status Report within (10) days of this Order. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/7/2008. Supplemental Status Report due by 1/17/2008. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by SHERRY F CHANCELLOR. (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                          ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [97] Status Report (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Robert Beasley's [93] MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Alan Siskind is GRANTED. Mr. Siskind shall have thirty (30) days to notify the court that he has retained substitute counsel. If the court does not receive notification within this time, the court will consider Mr. Siskind to be proceeding with his third-party claim and his defense of the Pltfs' claims pro se. Miscellaneous Deadline (notify court re substitute counsel) - by 1/20/2008.Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on December 21, 2007. (cbj)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007, Terminated: 12/21/2007 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Alan Siskind by ALAN SISKIND. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A and B) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [93] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Alan Siskind. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH TRAVIS APPLEBY on behalf of OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC (APPLEBY, KEITH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - The Bankruptcy Trustee shall have (30) days from the Bankruptcy Court's ruling on the pending Second Application to Employ Robert O. Beasley as Special Counsel to file Notice with this Court as to whether and to what extent claims on behalf of KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION INC shoud pursue and in what venue. All further litigation proceedings of this matter in this Court shall be STAYED pending further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/5/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge M CASEY RODGERS : Status Conference held on 11/2/2007. All counsel appeared by phone. Court discusses Rule 16 issues with parties. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Gwen Kesinger.) (sps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - GRANTING [83] MOTION for Hearing - Re: [78] Order. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/1/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - Re: [83] Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Third Party Complaint of KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC Against ALAN SISKIND and ANTHON ("TED") CIANO (Docket No. 11) - The relief requested is Noted. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/1/2007. (laj) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (laj, Pensacola).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re [78] Order Setting Hearings for November 2, 2007 @ 10:00 AM central before M. Casey Rodgers. All counsel appearing by phone will need to call #866/208-4864 and provide the Conference ID #23302786 to the Sprint Operator in order to join this conference prior to 10:00 AM central time. (sps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [82] Stipulation of Dismissal and [83] MOTION for Hearing - Re: [78] Order, Motion to Participate Via Telephone in Status Conference. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing re [78] Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Motion to Participate Via Telephone in Status Conference by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (PATRICOFF, HAROLD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Third Party Complaint of Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. Against Alan Siskind and Anthony ("Ted") Ciano by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (VENN, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SHERRY F CHANCELLOR (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by SHERRY FOWLER CHANCELLOR on behalf of SHERRY F CHANCELLOR (CHANCELLOR, SHERRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - This matter is set for Attorney Status Conference on 11/2/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4N before District Judge M CASEY RODGERS. The time allotted is (1) hour. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [75] Response. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re [59] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Joint Supplemental Brief of Auto Finance Center of America,Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss and Mark Horvath by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-H) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - DENYING in part, [61] Motion to Strike [59] Notice or in the alternative Motion for Leave to Respond to Joint Supplemental Brief and Memorandum of Law in Support. Attorney Beasley shall have the opportunity to respond to the Supplemental Brief. Response must be filed within the next (10) days. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/15/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT - Re: [64] Attorney Time Record filed by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC - Pleading posted in the wrong case. Attorney will refile the document in the correct case number. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [61] MOTION to Strike [59] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief MOTION to Strike [59] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief and [62] Response to Motion. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - GRANTING [57] Motion to Withdraw As Counsel for OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. Pltf shall have (30) days in which to secure new counsel. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/13/207. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [61] MOTION to Strike [59] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief MOTION to Strike [59] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief filed by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (APPLEBY, KEITH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007, Terminated: 8/15/2007 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike [59] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) or in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File Response to Supplemental Brief by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/27/2007) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by ANTHONY CIANO. (VENN, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Joint Supplemental Brief of Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., Detroit II Automobiles, Inc., Donald Foss, and Mark Horvath by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B) (EMMANUEL, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [58] Notice of Bankruptcy Court Ruling. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Bankruptcy Court Ruling by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH (EMMANUEL, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [57] Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Ohio Funding Group, Inc.. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007, Terminated: 8/13/2007 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Ohio Funding Group, Inc. by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (APPLEBY, KEITH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - GRANTING [48] Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/12/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Order on motion to extend timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - GRANTING [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File A Response to Pending Motions and Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/12/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [14] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Action and Corrected Memo in Support of Defendant Mark Horvath's Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Action; [15] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Answer, to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., and/or to Dismiss RICO Claim and Corrected Memo in Support and [26] Response in Opposition to Motion; [23] MOTION to Extend Time To File A Response To Pending MOtions And Answer To Third-Party Complaint By Alan Siskind and and [24] Amended Document/Amended Rule 7.1(B) Certificate; [47] Notice and [48] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ANTHONY CIANO. (VENN, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR OHIO FUNDING GROUP, INC. by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC (Attachments: # (1)) (APPLEBY, KEITH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C HAMMER on behalf of DONALD FOSS, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH (HAMMER, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service of Trent B. Collier) (APPLEBY, KEITH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Order on motion to extend timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - GRANTING [42] Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Filing Joint Report and Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - DENYING without prejudice to refiling, [41] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel's Motion does not cite compliance with Local Rule 11.1.(F). Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/9/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [42] Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Joint Report and Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion To Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Joint Report and Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: [41] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (lcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (EMMANUEL, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to [11] Third Party Complaint, Acceptance of Service of Process Acknowledgment filed by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - DENYING as moot, [36] Ex-Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Adjourn. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/26/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - GRANTING [35] Motion to Adjourn Hearing. The hearing will be rescheduled following the Bankruptcy Court's decision on the Motion for Summary Judgment. Pltf shall promptly notify the Court of the Bankruptcy Court's ruling. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/26/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [35] MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Exhibit A Part 2# (3) Exhibit A Part 3) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [35] MOTION to Continue Hearing and [36] Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Adjourn. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007, Terminated: 6/26/2007 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Adjourn by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007, Terminated: 6/26/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Hearing by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (Attachments: # (1) Motion to Adjourn# (2) Exhibit A) (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONALD FOSS, OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONALD FOSS, OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Attorney Time Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC, ALAN SISKIND, ANTHONY CIANO. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - Re: [4] MOTION for Clarification and/or to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson; [5] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint; [14] MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Action; [15] Correcte MOTION to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson LLP and/or MOTION to Dismiss RICO Claim; [18] MOTION to Dismiss and/or Stay Third Party Claim and Compel Arbitration and [23] MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Response to Pending Motions and Third-Party Complaint: The Court shall hold a Status Conference and hear oral argument in this matter on Thursday, 7/3/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4N before District Judge M CASEY RODGERS. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/13/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [15] Amended MOTION to Dismiss Answer, to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., and/or to Dismiss RICO Claim and Corrected Memo in Support filed by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [4] MOTION to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson and Supporting Memorandum and/or Motion for Clarification, [5] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Supporting Memorandum, [7] Response to Motion, [18] MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Third Party Claim and Compel Arbitration and [25] Response to Motion. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [18] MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Third Party Claim and Compel Arbitration filed by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Amended document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. Amendment to [23] MOTION to Extend Time To File A Response To Pending MOtions And Answer To Third-Party Complaint By Alan Siskind and Key Auto Liquidation Center Inc.. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion To Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Extend Time To File A Response To Pending MOtions And Answer To Third-Party Complaint By Alan Siskind and by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC identifying KALC Partners, L.L.C. as Corporate Parent. (THAMES, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson and Supporting Memorandum and/or Motion for Clarification filed by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhibit S# (20) Exhibit T# (21) Exhibit U# (22) Exhibit V# (23) Exhibit Y# (24) Affidavit Alan Siskind# (25) Affidavit Kramer Litvak) (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC identifying none as Corporate Parent. (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by TRENT B COLLIER on behalf of DONALD FOSS, OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC, AUTO FINANCE CENTER OF AMERICA INC, N A F CORPORATION INC, DETROIT II AUTOMOBILES INC, MARK HORVATH (COLLIER, TRENT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Third Party Claim and Compel Arbitration by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/18/2007) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A and B to Motion to Dismiss/Stay and Compel Arbitration) (PATRICOFF, HAROLD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deficiency ORDER - Re: [9] MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Action and Brief in Support - The documet shall remain in the electronic file, but the court will not consider ti until you have corrected the deficiency through the filing of a corrected document. The document is denied without prejudice with leave given to refile after correction. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - Re: [8] MOTION to Dismiss Answer, to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., and/or to Dismiss Rico Claim and Brief in Support - The document shall remain in the electronic file, but the Court will not consider it until you have corrected the deficiency through the filing of a corrected document. The document is denied without prejudice with leave given to refile after correction. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Dismiss Answer, to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., and/or to Dismiss RICO Claim and Corrected Memo in Support by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/18/2007) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Motion to Dismiss Answer to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc. and/or to Dismiss RICO Claim and Corrected Memo in Support) (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Action and Corrected Memo in Support of Defendant Mark Horvath's Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Action by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/18/2007) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Motion to Dismiss Shareholder Action and Memo in Support) (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Additional State Court Pleading by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH re [12] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Key Auto Liquidation Center's Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses) (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing State Court Pleadings by DONALD FOSS, MARK HORVATH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Complaint attachment to Notice of Filing State Court Pleadings# (2) Exhibit A, B, C to Complaint# (3) Exhibit D, E, F to Complaint# (4) Exhibit G, H, I, J, K to COMPLAINT# (5) Exhibit Summons of Siskind to Notice of Filing State Court Pleadings# (6) Exhibit Summons to Key Auto Liquidation to Notice of Filing State Court Pleadings# (7) Exhibit DF's Answer to Complaint-to go with Notice of Filing State Court Pleadings# (8) Exhibit Motion to Dismiss to go with Notice of Filing State Court Pleadings# (9)) (WARE, REX)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third Party THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ANTHONY CIANO and against ALAN SISKIND, filed by KEY AUTO LIQUIDATION CENTER INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D) (THAMES, WILLIAM) Modified on 5/29/2007 to correct "linkage". (laj, Pensacola).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Action and Brief in Support by MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/12/2007) (Attachments: # (1)) (BIGGART, JAMES) Modified on 5/25/2007 to note deficiency (i.e. Lacks Counsel Conference, Rule 7.1(B) ) (cbj, Pensacola).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Answer, to Disqualify Litvak Beasley as Counsel for Key Auto Liquidation Center, Inc., and/or to Dismiss Rico Claim and Brief in Support by MARK HORVATH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/12/2007) (Attachments: # (1)) (BIGGART, JAMES) Modified on 5/25/2007 to note deficiencies (i.e. Lacks Counsel Conference, Rule 7.1(B) ) (cbj, Pensacola).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [5] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Supporting Memorandum, [4] MOTION to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson and Supporting Memorandum and/or Motion for Clarification filed by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit to Response to Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum) (BIGGART, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Counter-Claim of Ohio Funding Group, Inc., Auto Finance Center of America, Inc., N.A.F. Corporation, Inc., and Detroit II Automobiles, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (BIGGART, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007, Terminated: 5/20/2008 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Supporting Memorandum by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit First Amended Complaint# (2) Exhibit A, B and C to First Amended Complaint# (3) Exhibit D, E, F and G to First Amended Complaint# (4) Exhibit H, I, J, K and L to First Amended Complaint) (BIGGART, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007, Terminated: 3/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Answer and Disqualify Litvak Beasley and Wilson and Supporting Memorandum and/or Motion for Clarification by OHIO FUNDING GROUP INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/11/2007) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit to Motion for Clarification) (BIGGART, JAMES)STAYED pursuant to [105] Order. Modified on 7/11/2008 (lcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/5/2007, Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2007, Discovery due by 9/19/2007. Signed by Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 5/22/2007. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadline - Discovery due by 9/19/2007 (pursuant to #3, Order). (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Action Required by District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed - Re: [1] Notice of Removal, with Proposed ISO. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DONALD FOSS and MARK HORVATH from First Judicial Circuit - Santa Rosa County, FL, Case Number: 07-376-CA - Filing Fee $350.00, Receipt Number: FLN 400001829. State Court Record NOT FILED at time of case filing. (laj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?