Irish et al v. Ferguson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00174-JHS
District Judge Joel H. Slomsky, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2017 at 2:32 AM EST (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo George P. Irish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph George Murray +1 570 706 1307 jm1959@netscape.net
No Logo MIK, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph George Murray +1 570 706 1307 jm1959@netscape.net
No Logo Sandra K. Irish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph George Murray +1 570 706 1307 jm1959@netscape.net
v.
No Logo Alan Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Trachtman Logan Carrle Bowman & Lomboardo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN K. HOLLIN +1 610 354 9700 jhollin@powelltrachtman.com
Space MARY J. PEDERSEN +1 610 354 9700 mpedersen@powelltrachtman.com
No Logo Benjamin Fishbein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Trachtman Logan Carrle Bowman & Lomboardo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN K. HOLLIN +1 610 354 9700 jhollin@powelltrachtman.com
Space MARY J. PEDERSEN +1 610 354 9700 mpedersen@powelltrachtman.com
No Logo Bugaj and Fischer, P.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn M. Brady +1 610 275 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by KANE, PUGH, KNOELL, TROY & KRAMER, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL C. TROY +1 610 275 2000 ptroy@kanepugh.com
No Logo Carversville Development Company, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Lehutsky +1 570 253 3800 +1 570 253 3838 esquire@lehutsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Durkin MacDonald, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Durkin +1 570 558 1500 +1 570 558 1501 larry@durkinmacdonald.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hellerwaldman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Gordon +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155 jgordon@hellerwaldman.com
Space Glen H. Waldman +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155
No Logo Carversville Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Lehutsky +1 570 253 3800 +1 570 253 3838 esquire@lehutsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Durkin MacDonald, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Durkin +1 570 558 1500 +1 570 558 1501 larry@durkinmacdonald.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hellerwaldman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Gordon +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155 jgordon@hellerwaldman.com
Space Glen H. Waldman +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155
No Logo Christine M. Vehstedt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ORLOSKI LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randolph T. Borden +1 570 226 6465 +1 570 226 0673 justice@ptd.net
No Logo Deborah Friese, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Malley Harris Durkin & Perry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Barrett +1 570 348 3711 +1 570 348 4092 mbarrett@omalleyandharris.com
No Logo ESSA Bank and Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newman, Williams, Mishkin, Corveleyn, Wolfe & Fareri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James V. Fareri +1 570 421 9090 +1 570 424 9739 jfareri@newmanwilliams.com
Space CIARAN B. KISLING +1 570 421 9090 ciaran@newmanwilliams.com
No Logo G. Anderson Homes, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. McDonough +1 570 347 1011 +1 570 347 7028 smcdonough@dlplaw.com
No Logo Grace Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dougherty, Leventhal & Price, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. McDonough +1 570 347 1011 +1 570 347 7028 smcdonough@dlplaw.com
No Logo Harry J. Ferguson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Durkin +1 570 558 1500 +1 570 558 1501 larry@durkinmacdonald.com
Space Glen H. Waldman +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155

Toggle Switch Represented by hellerwaldman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Gordon +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155 jgordon@hellerwaldman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by lehutsky.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Lehutsky +1 570 253 3800 +1 570 253 3838 esquire@lehutsky.com
No Logo Heather Meagher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haggerty McDonnell O'Brien and Hinton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Cosgrove +1 570 344 9845 +1 570 343 9731 mikecosgrove@haggertylaw.net
Space John Timothy Hinton, Jr. +1 570 344 9845 +1 570 343 9731 timhinton@haggertylaw.net
No Logo Judith Rodonski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Malley Harris Durkin & Perry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Barrett +1 570 348 3711 +1 570 348 4092 mbarrett@omalleyandharris.com
No Logo Karen Rice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Malley Harris Durkin & Perry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Barrett +1 570 348 3711 +1 570 348 4092 mbarrett@omalleyandharris.com
No Logo Martin Woldow, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Meagher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreder, Brooks, Hailstone & Ludwig

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucille Marsh +1 717 346 7922 +3463 346 346 3715 LMarsh@kbh-law.com
No Logo Meagher Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'CONNOR KIMBALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS J. GREGORY +1 215 564 0400 +1 215 564 1973 tgregory@okllp.com
Space GLEN D. KIMBALL +1 215 564 0400 gkimball@okllp.com
No Logo Meagher Realty Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haggerty McDonnell O'Brien and Hinton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Cosgrove +1 570 344 9845 +1 570 343 9731 mikecosgrove@haggertylaw.net
Space John Timothy Hinton, Jr. +1 570 344 9845 +1 570 343 9731 timhinton@haggertylaw.net
No Logo Paul M. Meagher, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucille Marsh +1 717 346 7922 +3463 346 346 3715 LMarsh@kbh-law.com
No Logo Paul M. Meagher, Sr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'CONNOR KIMBALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS J. GREGORY +1 215 564 0400 +1 215 564 1973 tgregory@okllp.com
Space GLEN D. KIMBALL +1 215 564 0400 gkimball@okllp.com
No Logo Re/max, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CONSTANTINE THOMAS FOURNARIS +1 215 988 8311 +1 215 988 8344 cfournaris@wiggin.com
No Logo Ronald M. Bugaj, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn M. Brady +1 610 275 2000
Space PAUL C. TROY +1 610 275 2000 ptroy@kanepugh.com
No Logo Santos Rolon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Barrett +1 570 348 3711 +1 570 348 4092 mbarrett@omalleyandharris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dougherty, Leventhal & Price, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean P. McDonough +1 570 347 1011 +1 570 347 7028 smcdonough@dlplaw.com
No Logo Tammy Lee Clause, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSHUA J.T. BYRNE +1 215 299 4369 +1 215 299 4301 jbyrne@swartzcampbell.com
Space Kathleen M. Carson +1 215 564 5190 kcarson@swartzcampbell.com
Space Jeffrey B. McCarron +1 215 299 4376 +1 215 299 4301 jmccarron@swartzcampbell.com
No Logo Thomas McColligan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Malley Harris Durkin & Perry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Barrett +1 570 348 3711 +1 570 348 4092 mbarrett@omalleyandharris.com
No Logo Tim Meagher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'CONNOR KIMBALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS J. GREGORY +1 215 564 0400 +1 215 564 1973 tgregory@okllp.com
Space GLEN D. KIMBALL +1 215 564 0400 gkimball@okllp.com
No Logo Waldman and Black, a Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Lehutsky +1 570 253 3800 +1 570 253 3838 esquire@lehutsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Durkin MacDonald, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Durkin +1 570 558 1500 +1 570 558 1501 larry@durkinmacdonald.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hellerwaldman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Gordon +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155 jgordon@hellerwaldman.com
Space Glen H. Waldman +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155
No Logo Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Malley Harris Durkin & Perry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Barrett +1 570 348 3711 +1 570 348 4092 mbarrett@omalleyandharris.com
No Logo WeiserMazars LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Trachtman Logan Carrle Bowman & Lomboardo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN K. HOLLIN +1 610 354 9700 jhollin@powelltrachtman.com
Space MARY J. PEDERSEN +1 610 354 9700 mpedersen@powelltrachtman.com
No Logo William G. Waldman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Lehutsky +1 570 253 3800 +1 570 253 3838 esquire@lehutsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Durkin MacDonald, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Durkin +1 570 558 1500 +1 570 558 1501 larry@durkinmacdonald.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hellerwaldman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Gordon +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155 jgordon@hellerwaldman.com
Space Glen H. Waldman +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155
No Logo WILLIAM H BLACK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Lehutsky +1 570 253 3800 +1 570 253 3838 esquire@lehutsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Durkin MacDonald, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A. Durkin +1 570 558 1500 +1 570 558 1501 larry@durkinmacdonald.com

Toggle Switch Represented by hellerwaldman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Gordon +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155 jgordon@hellerwaldman.com
Space Glen H. Waldman +1 305 448 4144 +1 305 448 4155
No Logo William Lewis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newman, Williams, Mishkin, Corveleyn, Wolfe & Fareri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James V. Fareri +1 570 421 9090 +1 570 424 9739 jfareri@newmanwilliams.com
Space CIARAN B. KISLING +1 570 421 9090 ciaran@newmanwilliams.com
No Logo Martin Woldow, Amicus
Office Scranton
Filed 1/31/2012
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Pike
Terminated 9/4/2013
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,SCR
  Entries (179) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 order on motion to strike
OPINION AND ORDER granting Motions to Dismiss [60] [60] [62] [65] [66] [67] [68] [69] [70] [71] [72] [75] [76] [77] [102] and denying [133] Motion for Sanctions. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 9/3/2013 (bg) Modified on 9/4/2013 (bg).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Reply Brief
    REPLY BRIEF re [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) re: Plaintiff's Response to Cohen, Fishbein, WeiserMazars' Supplemental Reply Brief filed by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Pedersen, Mary)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Reply Brief
      REPLY BRIEF re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) Defendant RE/MAX, LLC's Supplemental Post-Hearing Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Re/Max, LLC.(Fournaris, Constantine)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief)
        REPLY by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. to [151] Memorandum of Law, . (Gordon, Jason)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Reply Brief
          REPLY BRIEF re [67] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Way, Ciaran)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/17/2013, Entered: 2/17/2013 Reply Brief
            REPLY BRIEF re [102] MOTION to Dismiss to Plaintiffs' Brief in Response to Supplemental Memorandum of Defendant filed by Martin Woldow.(Woldow, Martin)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) as Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc 147 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket in Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [65] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) with Certificate of Concurrence filed by Plaintiffs as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc 146 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket for Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                  BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [72] MOTION to Dismiss by Tim Meagher, by Paul Meagher, Sr., and Plaintiffs Brief in Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 154 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket for Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                    BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [77] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 159 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket in Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 158 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket in Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                        BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [67] MOTION to Dismiss, [69] MOTION to Dismiss PROPOSED ORDER as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 149 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket in Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                          BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 148 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket in Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                            BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 153 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket in Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [71] MOTION to Dismiss Party as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 152 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket for Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                                BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [102] MOTION to Dismiss as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 150 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket for Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                                  BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [68] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc 157 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Meeting of Creditors and Docket for Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Brief in Opposition
                                    BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint as Response to Supplemental Memorandum at Doc. 151 filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Notice of Creditors Meeting and Docket for Bankruptcy Case of Lakefront Development Company LLC)(Murray, Joseph)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                      ORDER that the page limitation within the local Rule for the Plaintiffs' briefs in opposition to all of the Defendants' Supplemental Memoranda is hereby extended for 30 days; Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 2/4/13. (kn)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013, Terminated: 2/5/2013 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
                                        MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Plaintiffs' Briefs in Response to Defendants' Supplemental Memoranda by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Page Limitations for Plaintiffs' Briefs in Response to Defendants Supplelmental Memoranda)(Murray, Joseph)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Reply Brief
                                          REPLY BRIEF re [77] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Tammy Lee Clause.(McCarron, Jeffrey)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Reply Brief
                                            REPLY BRIEF re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Deborah Friese, Thomas McColligan, Karen Rice, Judith Rodonski, Santos Rolon, Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc..(Barrett, Matthew)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Brief in Opposition
                                              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [68] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants motioin to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-part 1, # (2) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-part 2, # (3) Exhibit(s), # (4) Certificate of Service)(Troy, Paul)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Letter
                                                Letter from Sean P. McDonough, Esquire . (McDonough, Sean)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Brief in Support
                                                  BRIEF IN SUPPORT (supplemental) pursuant to Court Order of 11-07-12 re [72] MOTION to Dismiss by Tim Meagher, by Paul Meagher, Sr., and filed by Meagher Associates.(Gregory, Thomas)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Brief in Support
                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT DEFENDANT RE/MAX, LLC'S SUPPLEMENTAL POST-HEARING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) filed by Re/Max, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT E-1, # (2) Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT E-2, # (3) Exhibit(s) EXHIBITS F - H)(Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Brief in Support
                                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss re [71] MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Christine M. Vehstedt.(Borden, Randolph)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Memorandum of Law
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership re [102] MOTION to Dismiss, [142] Order, (Supplemental Memorandum of Law). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Complaint)(Gordon, Jason)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Brief in Support
                                                          BRIEF IN SUPPORT SUPPLEMENTAL re [102] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Martin Woldow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Ferguson Real Estate Transaction, # (2) Exhibit(s) Purposeful Diversion of LFD's Profits, # (3) Exhibit(s) Purposeful Diversion of LFD's Profits, # (4) Exhibit(s) Purposeful Diversion of LFD's Profits)(Woldow, Martin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Brief in Support
                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT SUPPLEMENTAL re [67] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Way, Ciaran)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                              ORDER granting [145] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.It is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file a SupplementalBrief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Complaint in excess of fifteen pages but not toexceed forty-three (43) pages in length. Letter from counsel attached as page 2 or Order. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 1/4/2013 (bg)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Document Filed
                                                                Supplemental Brief by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP. [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) . (Pedersen, Mary)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 supplement
                                                                  Supplement by Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC. to [85] Brief in Support . (Cosgrove, Michael)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Reply Brief
                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re [65] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) with Certificate of Concurrence filed by Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Jr.(Marsh, Lucille)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: 12/28/2012, Terminated: 1/4/2013 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                      MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation for Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Waldman, Glen)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Notice to Non-Registered ECF Users re Filing of Transcript
                                                                        NOTICE TO UNREGISTERED ECF ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTIES regarding the filing of [143] Transcript. Copy of notice sent to Kathryn M. Brady on 11/26/2012. (mep)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on November 6, 2012, before Judge Joel E. Slomsky. (Attachments: # (1) Part II, # (2) Part III, # (3) Part IV) (ts)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Order
                                                                            ORDER; AND NOW, this 7th day of November 2012, following a hearing held November 6, 2012on all outstanding motions, it is ORDERED that:1. Each Defendant shall file a supplemental brief by January 7, 2013 addressing theissues raised by the Court during the November 6, 2012 hearing.2. Plaintiffs shall file a response by February 6, 2013.3. Defendants may file a reply by February 20, 2013.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 11/7/2012. (bg)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Josh J.T. Byrne on behalf of Tammy Lee Clause (McCarron, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/6/2012 (ga).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Constantine T. Fournaris on behalf of Re/Max, LLC. (Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: 9/4/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 11/6/2012 02:00 PM before Honorable Joel H. Slomsky.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 9/4/2012. (bg, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Reply Brief
                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit "A", # (2) Exhibit(s) Exhibit "B")(Waldman, Glen)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: 6/4/2012 Reply Brief
                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re [102] MOTION to Dismiss Reply to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Martin Woldow. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Note, # (2) Exhibit(s) Transfer Deed, # (3) Exhibit(s) Bank Documents, # (4) Exhibit(s) Letter of Instruction)(Woldow, Martin)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/27/2012, Entered: 5/27/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                        BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Movants/Defendants Harry F. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, William H. Black, Waldman and Black, Carversville Development Company LLC and Carversville Group LLC filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: 5/21/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                          BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [102] MOTION to Dismiss of Martin C. Woldow filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion for sanctions
                                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 11 by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Correspondence of April 20, 2012)(Gordon, Jason)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT Defendant RE/Max, LLC's Reply in Support of its re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) filed by Re/Max, LLC.(Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Notice to Non-Registered ECF Users re Filing of Transcript
                                                                                                NOTICE TO UNREGISTERED ECF ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTIES regarding the filing of [130] Transcript. A copy of notice was sent to Attorney Kathryn Brady. (lh, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, hearing held on May 9, 2012, before Judge Joel H. Slomsky. Court Reporter Lori A. Fausnaught, RMR/CRR, Telephone number 570.323.6704. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2012. (cr6, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Reply Brief
                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF re [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP.(Hollin, Jonathan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Reply Brief
                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Deborah Friese, Thomas McColligan, Karen Rice, Judith Rodonski, Santos Rolon, Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc..(Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Court Reporter NotesCourt Filing
                                                                                                        COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Lori A. Fausnaught, RMR/CRR of motion hearing before Judge Joel H. Slomsky on May 9, 2012. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Joel H. Slomsky on May 9, 2012. By s/ Lori A. Fausnaught, RMR/CRR. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (cr6, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Reply Brief
                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF re [67] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Way, Ciaran)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss re [112] MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint and for Additional Enlargement of Page Limit, [76] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Order Appointing Liquidating Receiver, # (2) Exhibit(s) Order of November 2, 2010)(Waldman, Glen)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice [57] Motion to Disqualify Counsel. AND NOW, this lOth day of May 2012, upon consideration of Defendants Ronald M.Bugaj and Bugaj & Fischer, P.C.'s Motion to Disqualify Joseph Murray as Counsel for PlaintiffsGeorge P. Irish and Sandra K. Irish, H/W[,] and MIK, Inc. (Doc. No. 57) and Plaintiffs' Brief inOpposition to Motion to Disqualify of Defendants Ronald M. Bugaj and Bugaj [&]Fischer, P.C.(Doc. No. 61) and for the reasons stated by the Court on the record at the hearing held onMay 9, 2012, it is ORDERED that Defendants Ronald M. Bugaj and Bugaj & Fischer, P.C.'sMotion to Disqualify Joseph Murray as Counsel for Plaintiffs George P. Irish and Sandra K.Irish, H/W[,] and MIK, Inc. (Doc. No. 57) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 5/10/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                ORDER denying [118] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. AND NOW, this lOth day of May 2012, upon consideration of the Motion of Michael P.Lehutsky, Esquire For Leave to Withdraw His Appearance as Counsel (Doc. No. 118), it isORDERED that the Motion of Michael P. Lehutsky, Esquire For Leave to Withdraw HisAppearance as Counsel (Doc. No. 118) is DENIEDSigned by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 5/10/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kathryn M. Brady; Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 5/8/12. (kn, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Paul C. Troy on behalf of Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C. Attorney Kathryn Brady is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2473551.. (Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 order on motion to strike
                                                                                                                      ORDER that: 1) Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Memorandum of Law of Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, William H. Black, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, Carversville Development Group, LLC and Carversiville Group, LLC only [104] is DENIED; 2) Plaintiff's Motion to File a Brief with Equal Word Count Only [104] is GRANTED; 3) Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motionto Dismiss the Complaint and For Additional Enlargement of Page Limite [112] is GRANTED; SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS; Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 5/8/12. (kn, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: 5/7/2012, Terminated: 5/10/2012 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership.(Lehutsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: 5/7/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A. Durkin on behalf of William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Durkin, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [102] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Martin Woldow.(Woldow, Martin)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [60] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint,,, MOTION to Dismiss of Tammy Lee Clause filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                ORDER that: A Hearing is set for 5/9/2012 at 11:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on Defendants' Motion to DIsqualify Joseph Murray as counsel for Plaintiff; Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 5/3/12. (kn, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                  BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [104] MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Law or Other Relief filed by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership.(Gordon, Jason)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012, Terminated: 5/8/2012 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint and for Additional Enlargement of Page Limit by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Proposed Order)(Gordon, Jason)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) of Re/Max, LLC filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) of WeiserMazars, Alan Cohen and Benjamin Fishbein filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/29/2012, Entered: 4/29/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [71] MOTION to Dismiss Party of Christine Vehstedt filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/29/2012, Entered: 4/29/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [67] MOTION to Dismiss of ESSA Bank and Trust Co. and William Lewis filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/28/2012, Entered: 4/28/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint of Weichert Defendants and Santos Rolon filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [24] MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, [62] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) of Heather Meagher and Meagher Realty Group LLC filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [65] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) with Certificate of Concurrence of Paul Meagher, Jr. and Matthew Meagher filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012, Terminated: 5/8/2012 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Memorandum of Law or Other Relief by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Letter of April 25 2012 to Defendant's counsel re brief and local rules, # (2) Proposed Order Proposed order granting one form of alternative requests for relief)(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                      VERBAL ORDER that the Hearing scheduled for 4/27/12 at 11:00AM in Scranton is continued until further order of court. (kc, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/22/2012, Entered: 4/22/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [60] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint,,, MOTION to Dismiss filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Martin Woldow.(Woldow, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [68] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint of Ronald M. Bugaj and Bugaj and Fischer, P.C. filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [72] MOTION to Dismiss by Tim Meagher, by Paul Meagher, Sr., and Meagher Associates, Inc. filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [77] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Tammy Lee Clause.(McCarron, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [88] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 4/16/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Harry J. Ferguson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) Exhibit(s))(Waldman, Glen)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT EXHIBIT C TO DEFENDANT RE/MAX LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) filed by Re/Max, LLC.(Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT DEFENDANT RE/MAX, LLC'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS re [75] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) filed by Re/Max, LLC.(Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP.(Hollin, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that: A Hearing will be held on Friday, 4/27/12 at 11:00 a.m. on Defendants Motion to Disqualify Joseph Murray as counsel for Plaintiffs and on Plaintiffs' Brief in Oppostion to Motion to Disqualify in Scranton before Honorable Joel H. Slomsky; Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 4/13/12. (kn, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF re [40] MOTION for Extension of Time to to file answer or other pleading, [71] MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Christine M. Vehstedt.(Borden, Randolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [40] MOTION for Extension of Time to to file answer or other pleading, [71] MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Christine M. Vehstedt.(Borden, Randolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Carversville Group, LLC re [76] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Notice of Adoption (Waldman, Glen)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [67] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Way, Ciaran)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012, Terminated: 4/16/2012 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation on All Plaintiffs' Briefs in Oppostion to Motions to Dismiss of All Defendants by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Page Limitation)(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Deborah Friese, Thomas McColligan, Karen Rice, Judith Rodonski, Santos Rolon, Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc. re [66] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [65] MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) with Certificate of Concurrence filed by Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Jr.(Marsh, Lucille)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [62] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC.(Cosgrove, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [83] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 4/10/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012, Terminated: 4/10/2012 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation in Excess of 15 Pages by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Gordon, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [80] Motion exceed page limit.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 4/9/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [78] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 4/9/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012, Terminated: 4/9/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to [70] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP.(Hollin, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [60] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint,,, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Grace Anderson, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., Santos Rolon.(McDonough, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012, Terminated: 4/9/2012 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Grace Anderson, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., Santos Rolon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McDonough, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/31/2012, Entered: 3/31/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Tammy Lee Clause. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Carson, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership.(Gordon, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12 (b)(6) by Re/Max, LLC.(Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jason Gordon.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 3/30/2012. (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012 Brief in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [72] MOTION to Dismiss by Tim Meagher, by Paul Meagher, Sr., and filed by Meagher Associates.(Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Tim Meagher, by Paul Meagher, Sr., and by Meagher Associates. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # (2) Proposed Order)(Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to dismiss party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Party by Christine M. Vehstedt.(Borden, Randolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Hollin, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss PROPOSED ORDER by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Way, Ciaran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum of Law, # (3) Certificate of Nonconcurrence, # (4) Certificate of Service, # (5) Exhibit(s), # (6) Exhibit(s))(Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: 3/30/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Way, Ciaran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Deborah Friese, Thomas McColligan, Karen Rice, Judith Rodonski, Santos Rolon, Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc..(Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) with Certificate of Concurrence by Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Marsh, Lucille)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jason Gordon on behalf of Harry J. Ferguson, Carversville Group, LLC, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, William G. Waldman Attorney Jason Gordon is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2439226., filed by on behalf of Harry J. Ferguson, Carversville Group, LLC, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, William G. Waldman.(Gordon, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Glen H. Waldman on behalf of Harry J. Ferguson, Carversville Group, LLC, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, William G. Waldman Attorney Glen H. Waldman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2438868., filed by on behalf of Harry J. Ferguson, Carversville Group, LLC, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, William G. Waldman.(Waldman, Glen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC.(Cosgrove, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: 3/23/2012 Brief in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [57] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Ronald M. Bugaj and Bugaj and Fischer, P.C. filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of George P Irish in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify, # (2) Proposed Order Denying Motion to Disqualify)(Murray, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012, Terminated: 9/3/2013 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint,,,, MOTION to Dismiss by Grace Anderson, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., Santos Rolon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McDonough, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Cosgrove on behalf of Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC (Cosgrove, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012, Terminated: 3/8/2012 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFF'S RICO CASE STATEMENT RICO Case Statement of Plaintiffs by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish, MIK, Inc..(Murray, Joseph) Modified on 3/8/2012 (ts, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012, Terminated: 5/10/2012 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A & B)(Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Barrett on behalf of Santos Rolon. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Order on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [54] Motion to enlarge time - Deft Remax shall file its responsive pleading to Pltfs' Complaint by 3/31/2012. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 3/2/2012 (rm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012, Terminated: 3/2/2012 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Re/Max, LLC.(Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Re/Max, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RMCO, LLC for Re/Max, LLC.. (Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Constantine T. Fournaris on behalf of Re/Max, LLC (Fournaris, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 2/29/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc.. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC. (Hinton, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C.. (Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by WeiserMazars, LLP. (Pedersen, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [42] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 2/23/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Order on motion to extend time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [36] Motion to Extend Time; denying as moot [40] Motion to Extend Time; granting [41] Motion to Extend Time.1. The Motion ofDefendant, Tammy Lee Clause, to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. 36) is GRANTED.2. Defendant Christine M. Vehstedt's Motion for Extension ofTime to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No. 40) is DENIED AS MOOT.'3. The Motion ofDefendants, Meagher Associates, Inc., Tim Meagher, and Paul Meagher[, Sr.], to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. No.4 I) is GRANTED.4. Defendants Tammy Lee Clause, Meagher Associates, Inc., Tim Meagher, and Paul Meagher, Sr. shall file their responsive pleadings to Plaintifrs Complaint (Doc. No.1) by March 31. 2012.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 2/23/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC. (Lehutsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by ESSA Bank and Trust. (Fareri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership. (Lehutsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012, Terminated: 2/23/2012 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Christine Vehstedt ONLY by Christine M. Vehstedt.(Lehutsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012, Terminated: 2/23/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Tim Meagher, by Paul Meagher, Sr., and by Meagher Associates.(Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012, Terminated: 2/23/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to to file answer or other pleading by Christine M. Vehstedt.(Borden, Randolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph T. Borden on behalf of Christine M. Vehstedt (Borden, Randolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Santos Rolon answer due 3/31/2012; ESSA Bank and Trust answer due 3/31/2012; Harry J. Ferguson answer due 3/31/2012; Heather Meagher answer due 3/31/2012; G. Anderson Homes, Inc. answer due 3/31/2012; Carversville Group, LLC answer due 3/31/2012; Paul M. Meagher, Jr answer due 3/31/2012; Waldman and Black, a Partnership answer due 3/31/2012; Grace Anderson answer due 3/31/2012; Thomas McColligan answer due 3/31/2012; William Lewis answer due 3/31/2012; Meagher Realty Group, LLC answer due 3/31/2012; Matthew Meagher answer due 3/31/2012; Judith Rodonski answer due 3/31/2012; William H. Black answer due 3/31/2012; Christine M. Vehstedt answer due 3/31/2012; Carversville Development Company, LLC answer due 3/31/2012; William G. Waldman answer due 3/31/2012; Karen Rice answer due 3/31/2012; Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc. answer due 3/31/2012; Deborah Friese answer due 3/31/2012.; granting [23] Motion to Extend Time; granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting [24] Motion to Extend Time; granting [28] Motion to Extend Time; granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 2/21/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Meagher Realty Group, LLC. (Hinton, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012, Terminated: 2/23/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Tammy Lee Clause. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service, # (2) Certificate of Concurrence, # (3) Proposed Order)(Carson, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Glen D. Kimball on behalf of Meagher Associates (Kimball, Glen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Glen D. Kimball on behalf of Paul M. Meagher, Sr (Kimball, Glen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Glen D. Kimball on behalf of Tim Meagher (Kimball, Glen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Meagher Associates Fed.Civ.P. 7.1 Disclosure (Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Gregory on behalf of Meagher Associates (Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Gregory on behalf of Paul M. Meagher, Sr (Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Gregory on behalf of Tim Meagher (Gregory, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Plaitniffs' Complaint by ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis.(Kisling, Ciaran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Ciaran B. Kisling on behalf of ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis (Kisling, Ciaran)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by James V. Fareri on behalf of ESSA Bank and Trust, William Lewis (Fareri, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Lehutsky on behalf of Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, Christine M. Vehstedt, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership (Lehutsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Hinton, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion & Proposed Order to Extend Time to Reply to Complaint to March 31, 2012, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,,, by William H. Black, Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Harry J. Ferguson, Christine M. Vehstedt, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership.(Lehutsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2012 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,,, by Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Barrett on behalf of Karen Rice. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Barrett on behalf of Deborah Friese. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Barrett on behalf of Judith Rodonski. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Barrett on behalf of Thomas McColligan. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Barrett on behalf of Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc.. (Barrett, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2012 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,,, w/ Certificate of Concurrence by Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Marsh, Lucille)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lucille Marsh on behalf of Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Jr (Marsh, Lucille)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012, Terminated: 2/21/2012 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint,,, by Grace Anderson, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., Santos Rolon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(McDonough, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by J. Timothy Hinton on behalf of Heather Meagher, Meagher Realty Group, LLC (Hinton, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Order on motion to extend time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [6] Motion to Extend Time to answer; & also granting [9] Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Defendants ahall file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint by 3/31/2012. Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 2/16/2012 (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a RICO Case Statement within (20) days. Please see Order for details.Signed by Honorable Joel H. Slomsky on 2/16/2012. (bg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. McDonough on behalf of Grace Anderson, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., Santos Rolon. (McDonough, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012, Terminated: 2/16/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Proposed Order)(Pedersen, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: 2/13/2012 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C.. (Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Mary J. Pedersen on behalf of Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP (Pedersen, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012, Terminated: 2/16/2012 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C. Troy on behalf of Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C. (Troy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. McCarron on behalf of Tammy Lee Clause (McCarron, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Hollin on behalf of Alan Cohen, Benjamin Fishbein, WeiserMazars, LLP (Hollin, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by MIK, Inc.. (ts, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Grace Anderson, William H. Black, Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C., Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Tammy Lee Clause, Alan Cohen, ESSA Bank and Trust, Harry J. Ferguson, Benjamin Fishbein, Deborah Friese, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., William Lewis, MIK, Inc., Thomas McColligan, Heather Meagher, Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Sr, Paul M. Meagher, Jr, Tim Meagher, Meagher Associates, Meagher Realty Group, LLC, Re/Max, LLC, Karen Rice, Judith Rodonski, Santos Rolon, Christine M. Vehstedt, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc., WeiserMazars, LLP, Martin Woldow ( Filing fee $350, Receipt Number 333021923), filed by George P. Irish, Sandra K. Irish. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Receipt)(ts, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Grace Anderson, William H. Black, Ronald M. Bugaj, Bugaj and Fischer, P.C., Carversville Development Company, LLC, Carversville Group, LLC, Tammy Lee Clause, Alan Cohen, ESSA Bank and Trust, Harry J. Ferguson, Benjamin Fishbein, Deborah Friese, G. Anderson Homes, Inc., William Lewis, Thomas McColligan, Heather Meagher, Matthew Meagher, Paul M. Meagher, Sr, Paul M. Meagher, Jr, Tim Meagher, Meagher Associates, Meagher Realty Group, LLC, Re/Max, LLC, Karen Rice, Judith Rodonski, Santos Rolon, Christine M. Vehstedt, William G. Waldman, Waldman and Black, a Partnership, Weichert Realtors/Paupack Group, Inc., WeiserMazars, LLP, Martin Woldow and provided to Atty Murray for service on Defendant(s). (ts, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?