Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley v. Napolitano
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-06899

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 6:08 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Khader Kakish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Caleb Dalton +1 480 444 0028 +1 480 444 0028 cdalton@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
No Logo Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 02/05/2018 Michael Casey Mattox, PHV +1 202 393 8690 +1 202 347 3622 cmattox@ADFlegal.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE David A. Cortman +1 770 339 0774 +1 770 339 6744 dcortman@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Caleb Dalton +1 480 444 0028 +1 480 444 0028 cdalton@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyson C. Langhofer +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 tlanghofer@ADFlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Alliance Defending Freedom - Scottsdale, AZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis Christopher Barham +1 770 339 0774 +1 770 339 6744 tbarham@alliancedefendingfreedom.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Parichan, Renberg & Crossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Loren Renberg +1 559 431 6300 +1 559 432 1018 mrenberg@prcelaw.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Garrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Thomas Foust +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 jfoust@crowell.com
No Logo Carol Christ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Thomas Foust +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 jfoust@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Belinda Y. Liu +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 bliu@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Daniel Sharp +4159 862 800 7372 +1 415 986 2827 dsharp@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeslyn A Everitt +1 415 512 4040 jeslyn.everitt@mto.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Bryan Harte Heckenlively +1 415 512 4015 +1 415 512 4077 bryan.heckenlively@mto.com
, , , , , Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
, , , , , Sara N Taylor +1 213 683 9247 +1 213 687 3702 sara.taylor@mto.com
No Logo Janet Napolitano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Southern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jennifer L Stark +1 213 977 9500

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret L. Wu +1 510 987 9747 +1 510 987 9757 margaret.wu@ucop.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by AUSA - Office of the US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Terrence M Jones +1 213 894 7354 +1 213 894 7819 terrence.jones@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Stefanie Notarino Hennes +1 202 532 4175 Stefanie.Hennes@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division U.s. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Victor M. Lawrence +1 202 305 8788 +1 202 233 0397 victor.lawrence@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Division - United States Courthouse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Mark R. Conrad +1 415 436 7025 +1 415 436 6748 mark.conrad@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Thomas Foust +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 jfoust@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Belinda Y. Liu +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 bliu@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Daniel Sharp +4159 862 800 7372 +1 415 986 2827 dsharp@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeslyn A Everitt +1 415 512 4040 jeslyn.everitt@mto.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Bryan Harte Heckenlively +1 415 512 4015 +1 415 512 4077 bryan.heckenlively@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , , , , , , , Elizabeth Ann Kim +1 415 512 4089 +1 415 644 6909 elizabeth.kim@mto.com
, , , , , Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
, , , , , , , , , Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
, , , , , Sara N Taylor +1 213 683 9247 +1 213 687 3702 sara.taylor@mto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of Immigration Litigation - District Court Section

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L. Roden +1 615 736 5151 michael.roden@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , James A. Scharf +1 408 535 5044 +1 408 535 5081 james.scharf@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , John C Bell John.Bell2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Jacqueline Christine Romero +1 215 861 8470
Space Kenneth L Shaitelman +1 313 226 9709 kenneth.shaitelman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Matthew Silverman +1 718 254 6409 +1 718 254 6081 matthew.silverman@usdoj.gov
, , , Carolyn Williams Steverson Carolyn.Steverson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lana L. Vahab +1 202 532 4067 +1 202 305 7000 lana.vahab@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.o. Box 868

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jacob A Bashyrov +1 202 616 3477 jacob.bashyrov@usdoj.gov
, , , Kathleen Ann Connolly +1 202 305 8627 +1 202 307 8781 kathleen.a.connolly@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Regents of the University of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Furlonge Robinson +1 510 987 9800 +1 510 987 9757

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Carolyn Aiko Ikari +1 860 760 7953 +1 860 760 7979 carolyn.ikari@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , F. Franklin Amanat +1 718 254 6024 +1 718 254 6081 franklin.amanat@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bradley M. Bole +1 407 648 7514 +1 407 648 7588 bradley.bole@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Hans Chen +1 301 307 4469 +1 202 305 7000 hans.h.chen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Zachary David Clopton +1 312 353 6630 zachary.clopton@usdoj.gov
, , Christopher Kendrick Connolly +1 212 637 2761 +1 212 637 2786 christopher.connolly@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Melanie Dyani Hendry +1 202 252 2510 +1 202 252 2599 melanie.hendry2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Regan Hildebrand +1 202 286 2531 +1 202 616 8962 regan.hildebrand@usdoj.gov
, , , , Jeffrey B Isaacs +1 213 978 7940 +1 213 978 8112 USACAC.Criminal@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Timothy Judge +1 570 348 2800 timothy.judge@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Sam Delk Kennedy, Jr. +1 615 736 5151 delk.kennedy@usdoj.gov
, , Orelia E. Merchant +1 718 254 6058 +1 718 254 6081 Orelia.merchant@usdoj.gov
, , Brian D. Morris +1 718 254 6512 +1 718 254 7489 brian.morris2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Karin K. Orenstein +1 718 254 6188 +1 718 254 6321 karin.orenstein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliot M. Schachner +1 718 254 6053 +1 718 254 6081 Elliot.Schachner@usdoj.gov
, , Beth Patricia Schwartz +1 718 254 6017 +1 718 254 6081 Beth.Schwartz@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer A. Serafyn +1 617 748 3188 +1 617 748 3969 jennifer.serafyn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Barbara Healy Smith +1 617 748 3100 +1 617 748 3969
, Sekret T Sneed +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 sekret.sneed@usdoj.gov
, Keith M Staub +1 213 894 7423 keith.staub@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Ana H Voss +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 ana.voss@usdoj.gov
, Christine J. Wichers +1 617 748 3278 christine.wichers@usdoj.gov
, Mark H. Wildasin +1 615 736 2079 +1 615 736 5323 mark.wildasin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office - 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Mark Morrison +1 717 221 4482 +1 717 221 2246 Mark.E.Morrison@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Christopher R Yates +1 614 469 5715 +1 614 469 5240 christopher.yates@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Amanda Adams Rocque +1 303 454 0100 +1 303 454 0404 amanda.rocque@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
, , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, Dianne Schweiner +1 619 557 5610 +1 619 557 7122 Dianne.Schweiner@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gary L. Anderson +1 210 384 7365 +1 210 384 7312 stephanie.karam@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Richard E. Finneran +1 314 539 2183 +1 314 539 2287 richard.finneran@usdoj.gov
, David Louis Guerra +1 956 618 8010 +1 956 618 8016 david.guerra@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shane Patrick Cargo +1 212 210 9460 +1 212 922 3860 shane.cargo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Stephen Cerutti +1 717 221 4482 Stephen.Cerutti@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brandon H. Cowart +1 212 637 2800 +1 212 637 2702 brandon.cowart@usdoj.gov
, , , , Jessica Dawgert +1 202 616 9428 Jessica.A.Dawgert@usdoj.gov
, , , , Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Ronald W. Kish +1 212 264 3475 +1 212 264 4534 ronald.kish@dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Theodore William Atkinson +1 202 532 4135 +1 202 305 7000 theodore.atkinson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Michael Bauer +1 202 532 4786 +1 202 616 8962 jeffrey.bauer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Timothy Michael Belsan +1 202 532 4596 +1 202 305 7000 timothy.m.belsan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jesi J Carlson +1 202 305 7037 +1 202 305 7000 jesi.j.carlson@usdoj.gov
, , , Varudhini Chilakamarri +1 202 616 8489 varudhini.chilakamarri@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY John Robert Coleman +1 202 514 4505 +1 202 616 8460 John.Coleman3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kirsten L Daeubler +1 202 616 4458 +1 202 305 7000 kirsten.daeubler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Craig Andrew Defoe +1 202 532 4114 +1 202 305 7000 craig.defoe@usdoj.gov
, , , Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Marsha Stelson Edney +1 202 514 4520 +1 202 318 1287 marsha.edney@usdoj.gov
, , , , Sarah B. Fabian +1 202 532 4824 +1 202 879 5200 sarah.b.fabian@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
, , , August Edward Flentje +1 202 514 1278 august.flentje@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Siegmund Fred Fuchs +1 202 616 4322 siegmund.f.fuchs@usdoj.gov
, , , Helen L Gilbert +1 202 514 4862
, , , , , , , , , , , Glenn M Girdharry +1 202 532 4807 +1 202 305 7000 glenn.girdharry@usdoj.gov
, , , Katherine E.M. Goettel +1 202 532 4115 +1 202 305 7000 kate.goettel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Adam Laurence Goldman +1 713 567 9534 +1 713 718 3303 Adam.Goldman2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Aaron S Goldsmith +1 202 532 4107 +1 202 616 8962 aaron.goldsmith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , Neelam Ihsanullah +1 202 532 4269 +1 202 616 8962 neelam.ihsanullah@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Craig W. Kuhn +1 202 616 3540 craig.kuhn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Anna Nelson +1 202 532 4402 Anna.Nelson@usdoj.gov
, , Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Nicole R Prairie +1 202 532 4074 +1 202 305 7000 Nicole.Prairie@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Durwood Riedel +1 202 616 3074 +1 202 305 7000 durwood.h.riedel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey S. Robins +1 202 616 1246 +1 202 233 0397 jeffrey.robins@usdoj.gov
, , , William C. Silvis +1 202 307 4693 +1 202 305 7000 william.silvis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
, , , Tamara Lynn Ulrich +1 202 305 1432 +1 202 616 8460 tamara.ulrich@usdoj.gov
, , , Lana L. Vahab +1 202 532 4067 +1 202 305 7000 lana.vahab@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Lee Walker +1 202 532 4271 +1 202 305 7000 Elizabeth.L.Walker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov
, , , , Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Navy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Colin A. Kisor , +1 202 532 4331 colin.kisor@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Joshua Eric Braunstein +1 202 551 8470 braunsteinj@sec.gov
No Logo Stephen Sutton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Thomas Foust +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 jfoust@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Belinda Y. Liu +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 bliu@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Daniel Sharp +4159 862 800 7372 +1 415 986 2827 dsharp@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeslyn A Everitt +1 415 512 4040 jeslyn.everitt@mto.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/15/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Stipulation And [proposed} Order
    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Khader Kakish, Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2018. The parties advised that they have reached an agreement in principle and will be filing a stipulation with the district court to continue dates. The settlement conference shall go forward on June 5 at 2:00 p.m. if the parties need additional assistance to finalize the settlement. (Not Reported)(Time: 5 mins.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Tyson Langhofer.Attorney for Defendant: Joshua Foust. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2018) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the in-person settlement conference currently scheduled for June 5, 2018 is continued to June 13, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER re 43 . The parties' proposed deadlines are fine. The hearing on the motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 40 ) is continued to 6/7/2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Proceedings on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Carol Christ, Anthony Garrison, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2018. Parties to submit stipulation to the district court to stay motion to dismiss proceedings while settlement discussions are pending. Further call April 27, 2018 at 11 a.m. to determine status of discussions. If case does not resolve, in person settlement conference to occur on June 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Not Reported)(Time: 35 mins)Attorney for Plaintiff: Caleb Dalton.Attorney for Defendant: Joshua Foust. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2018) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                Request for Judicial Notice re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (6)) filed byCarol Christ, Anthony Garrison, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 40 ) (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (6)) filed by Carol Christ, Anthony Garrison, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/5/2018. Replies due by 4/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marissa Reynoso in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 15 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE by Khader Kakish, Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a) (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      Summons Issued as to Anthony Garrison (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018) Modified on 3/15/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/8/2018. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Proposed Summons. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byYoung Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley, Khader Kakish. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/6/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Travis C. Barham. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12143623.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Barham, Travis) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Viceas to Tyson C. Langhofer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Liu, Belinda) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on March 6, 2018 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attestation of Signatories)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12135725.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Langhofer, Tyson) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER re 19 . The initial case management conference and associated deadlines will not be continued. The parties' proposed deadline for defendants to respond to the complaint is fine. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda Y. Liu (Liu, Belinda) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by J. Daniel Sharp (Sharp, J.) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Thomas Foust on behalf of Defendants Janet Napolitano, Carol Christ, and Stephen Sutton (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Carol Christ, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Thomas Foust in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. Responses due by 2/6/2018. Replies due by 2/13/2018. (Mattox, Michael) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 stipulation
                                                                  STIPULATION to Set Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Carol Christ, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Everitt, Jeslyn) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons Returned Executed Christ, # 2 Summons Summons Returned Executed Sutton)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Summons issued
                                                                      Summons Issued as to Carol Christ, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Cortman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                                          Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Napolitano, # 2 Summons Sutton)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David A. Cortman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11933736.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cortman, David) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Casey Mattox. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Donato terminating 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Caleb Dalton. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley (Renberg, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11924153.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/04/2017 filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11924189.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mattox, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11924153.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                              Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                Civil Cover Sheet by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley . (Renberg, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11922142.). Filed byYoung Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Renberg, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?