Collier v. Drongosky
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:17-cv-02875

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2019 at 5:32 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Compel; denying 29 Motion to Strike. Defendant shall file a response or answer to the complaint by July 2, 2018. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/25/2018. (BEE)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Strike
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Compel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Discovery
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Expedite
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Clarification
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Clarification
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Compliance notice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?