FRAZIER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-05421

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 18, 2021 at 11:29 AM DT (2.6 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY BURTON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
No Logo DEBRA FRAZIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
No Logo LAVERNE VANN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
No Logo SHAMAL BRYANT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
No Logo THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
v.
No Logo CHIEF INSPECTOR ANTHONY BOYLE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER +1 215 683 5444 +1 215 683 5398 christopher.rider@phila.gov
No Logo CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , LEON A. KING, II +1 215 554 3597 philaking@aol.com
, JOHN F. HANAHAN +1 856 489 9746 rosenbaumfederal@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , COLIN STUART HAVILAND +1 216 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 colin.haviland@pacourts.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, MICHELE L. DEAN +1 215 963 3300 +1 215 963 9999 mdean@archerlaw.com
Space CARLTON L. JOHNSON +1 215 963 3300 +1 215 963 9999 cjohnson@archerlaw.com
, , , JEFFREY M. SCOTT +1 215 963 3300 jscott@archerlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , SHELLEY R. SMITH +1 215 963 3300 +1 215 963 9999 srsmith@archerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ASSISTANT GENERAL COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , REGINA ANGELICA LAWRENCE +1 856 343 8855

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ALEXANDRA BAK-BOYCHUK +1 215 864 8123 +1 215 933 3997 bakboychuka@ballardspahr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , SHANNON D. FARMER +1 215 665 8500 +1 215 864 9061 farmers@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett, Bricklin & Saltzburg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS A. CUMMINS +1 215 561 4300 +1 215 561 6661 cummins@bbs-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARITY C. HYDE +1 215 665 3302 hyde@bbs-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ruthanne Gordon - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 rgordon@bm.net
Space Bart D. Cohen +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 bcohen@bm.net
, H. Laddie Montague, Jr. +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 hlmontague@bm.net
, Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net
Space Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen +1 215 875 3053 +1 215 875 4604 sschalman-bergen@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by CHIEF DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , ANNE BARDEN +1 215 683 5101 anne.barden@phila.gov
, , , , , MARCIA BERMAN + 215 683 5296
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELISE BRUHL +1 215 683 5011 elise.bruhl@phila.gov
, MICHAEL F. EICHERT +1 215 683 5023 michael.eichert@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF PHILA. LAW DEPT.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT D. AVERSA +1 215 683 5020 robert.aversa@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , DANIEL L. GARRY +1 215 683 5024 +1 215 683 5098
Space CRAIG R. GOTTLIEB +TEL 215 683 5015 craig.gottlieb@phila.gov
, , , , , MATTHEW K. HUBBARD +1 215 683 5439 matthew.hubbard@phila.gov
, , , SHANNON G. ZABEL +1 215 683 5114 shannon.zabel@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , BROCK ATKINS +1 215 683 5446 brock.atkins@phila.gov
, , , , NIYA L. BLACKWELL +1 215 683 5445 niya.blackwell@phila.gov
, , , JOSHUA BRAND +1 215 683 5082 joshua.brand@phila.gov
, , , , , ARMANDO BRIGANDI +1 215 683 5444 +1 215 683 5397 armando.brigandi@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , EDWARD D. CHEW, JR. +1 215 683 5420 edward.chew@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , JONATHAN COOPER +1 215 683 5448 jonathan.cooper@phila.gov
, , , JOHN J. COYLE, III +1 215 683 5434 +1 215 683 5397 john.coyle@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , KRISTEN M. DAVIS +1 215 683 5445 kristen.stretz@phila.gov
, STEVEN R. DICKINSON +1 215 683 5077 steven.dickinson@phila.gov
TERMINATED: 12/20/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY FRANK E. WEHR, II +1 215 683 5183 frank.wehr@phila.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BENJAMIN H. FIELD +1 215 683 5024 +1 215 683 5397 benjamin.field@phila.gov
, TARA FUNG +1 215 683 5445 tara.fung@phila.gov
, KIA GHEE +1 215 683 5074 kia.ghee@phila.gov
Space CHRISTIAN KERSTETTER +1 215 683 5082 +1 215 683 5099 christian.kerstetter@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , REGINA LAWRENCE +1 215 683 5448 regina.lawrence@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , CARA E. LEHENY +1 215 683 5080 +1 215 988 1736 cara.leheny@phila.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T DUNCAN M. LLOYD +1 215 683 5078 duncan.lloyd@phila.gov
, DIANE A. LOEBELL +1 215 683 5083 diane.loebell@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , DIMITRIOS MAVROUDIS +1 215 683 5433 dimitrios.mavroudis@phila.gov
, MICHAEL R. MILLER +1 215 683 5433 michael.r.miller@phila.gov
, ALAN C. OSTROW +1 215 683 5390
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BENJAMIN RICHARD PATCHEN +1 215 683 5077 benjamin.patchen@phila.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARCEL S. PRATT +1 215 683 5038 marcel.pratt@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , REBECCA PROSPER +1 215 683 5443 rebecca.prosper@phila.gov
TERMINATED: 07/05/2018, TERMINATED: 07/05/2018, TERMINATED: 07/05/2018, TERMINATED: 07/05/2018 JOSEPH E RANDALL +1 215 683 5080 joseph.randall@phila.gov
Space ANDREW RICHMAN +1 215 683 5114 andrew.richman@phila.gov
, , , , , CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER +1 215 683 5444 +1 215 683 5398 christopher.rider@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA +1 215 683 5080 benjamin.salvina@phila.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 11/05/2013, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED TOI A. SHIELDS +1 215 683 5083 toi.shields@phila.gov
, , AMANDA C SHOFFEL +1 215 683 5443 amanda.shoffel@phila.gov
, , AARON SHOTLAND +1 215 683 5434 aaron.shotland@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , PATRICIA A. SIEMIONTKOWSKI +1 215 683 5078
, JEFFREY S. SIMONS +1 215 683 5443 jssimons@zarwin.com
Space LYNNE A. SITARSKI +1 215 683 5442
, , , , , , , , , PAUL D. SNITZER +1 215 683 5079 +1 215 683 5099 paul.snitzer@phila.gov
, , , , , , CRAIG M. STRAW +1 215 683 5442 craig.straw@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , LISA A. SWIATEK +1 215 683 5076 lisa.swiatek@phila.gov
, MARGARET THERANGER +1 215 683 5183 margaret.theranger@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , TRACY TRIPP +1 215 683 5183 tracy.tripp@phila.gov
, MILTON VELEZ +1 215 684 3057 milton.velez@pha.phila.gov
, , , , , SHANT H. ZAKARIAN +1 215 683 5076 shant.zakarian@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA SOLICITOR'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , NICOLE S. MORRIS +1 215 683 5446 +1 215 683 5397 nicole.morris@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City Solicitor's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JAMES P. COUSOUNIS +1 215 683 5020 +1 215 683 5071 james.cousounis@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , David Henry Bamberger +1 202 799 4500 +1 202 799 5500 david.bamberger@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GOLDBERG, MEANIX & MUTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, EVAN J. KELLY +1 610 436 6220 ekelly@gmmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey R. Lessin & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey R. Lessin +1 267 654 0300 +1 267 654 0305 j.lessin@lessinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JANE LOVITCH ISTVAN +1 215 683 5007 jane.istvan@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MARGARET M. FENERTY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , MARGARET M. FENERTY +1 215 947 4848 maggie@mylawyer.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RICHARD A. STOLOFF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, BENJAMIN N. GIALLORETO +1 215 988 9800 bgialloreto@stolofflaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
, Rachel Geman , +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 rgeman@lchb.com
, JOHN T. NICOLAOU +1 212 355 9500
, Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , GENELLE FRANKLIN +1 215 575 2631 ggfranklin@mdwcg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKissock & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JEAN Y. DURBIN +1 215 246 2100 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by MONTGOMERY COUNTY SOLICITOR'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , SHARON W. GLOGOWSKI +1 610 278 3033 sglogows@montcopa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Levine deLuca & Horst, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , REID I. HOWELL +1 856 665 8501 rhowell@nldhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , GARY M. SAMMS +1 215 665 3000 +1 215 665 3165 gary.samms@obermayer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , DENISE S. WOLF +1 215 861 8662 +1 215 861 8498 denise.wolf@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PHILADELPHIA OFFICE OF CITY SOLICITOR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , MARK MAGUIRE +1 215 683 5447 mark.maguire@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Schonbrun DeSimone Seplow Harris & Hoffman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ERWIN CHEMERINSKY +1 310 396 0731

Toggle Switch Represented by School District of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , RONAK RAMESH CHOKSHI +1 215 400 5391 +1 215 400 4121 rchokshi@philasd.org
, , , , , , , , , BRIAN J. PIERCE +1 215 400 4120 +1 215 400 4121 bpierce@philasd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by SPECTOR GADON AND ROSEN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JENNIFER MYERS CHALAL +1 215 241 8888 jmyers@lawsgr.com
, , , ALAN B. EPSTEIN +1 215 241 8832 +1 215 241 8844 aepstein@lawsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WEINSTEIN FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT J. HAURIN +1 215 636 0616 +1 215 494 5556 rhaurin@weinsteinfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , DEBORAH WEINSTEIN +1 215 636 0615 +1 215 494 5556 dweinstein@weinsteinfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TRUJILLO RODRIQUEZ & RICHARDS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ANNE B. TAYLOR +1 856 757 5031 anne.taylor@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ELIZABETH S. MATTIONI +1 215 861 8462 +1 215 861 8618

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , RAHEEMAH F. ABDULALEEM +1 202 307 2034 +1 202 514 1005 raheemah.abdulaleem@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , PAUL A. MARONE +1 215 861 5133 marone.paul@dol.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAM L. KELLER & ASSOC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , JAMES M. DUCKWORTH +1 215 735 8780 +1 215 735 5126 jduckworth@keller-goggin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WISLER PEARLSTINE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , CLAUDIA L. HUOT +1 610 825 8400 chuot@wispearl.com
No Logo JOHN DOES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Madelyn E. Johnson +1 703 379 9289 madelynjohnson@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Jason Vail +1 850 414 3300 ejv@jollylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert C. Divine +1 423 752 4416 +1 423 752 9533 rdivine@bakerdonelson.com
, , , J. David Folds +1 202 508 3441 +1 202 220 2241 dfolds@bakerdonelson.com
, , , James Wylie McBride +1 202 508 3400 +1 202 508 3402 jmcbride@bakerdonelson.com
, Mindy Lynn Rattan +1 202 508 3453 +1 202 220 2253 mrattan@bakerdonelson.com
, , , Craig Rust +1 202 508 3453 +1 202 220 3453 crust@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FROST & ZEFF, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JOSEPHINE M. CARABELLO-PATTI +1 856 429 1700
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , GREGG L. ZEFF +1 856 429 1700 da@fast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by John Does

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Does

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , THOMAS F CONGDON +1 850 414 3635 +1 850 488 4872 thomas.congdon@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PERKINS COIE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 654 6274 +1 202 654 9968 jhenault@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JAMES HENRY FORTE +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 jhf@saiber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Arthur Lazarus, Jr. +1 202 682 0240 +1 202 682 0249 alazarus@sonosky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Lloyd Benton Miller +1 907 258 6377 +1 907 272 8332 lloyd@sonosky.net

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Catherine Hancock Dorsey +1 202 514 3469 catherine.dorsey@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven Platt +1 202 532 4074 +1 202 305 7000 steven.a.platt@usdoj.gov
, , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WADE PALMER & SHOEMAKER PA - PENSACOLA FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , ELIZABETH NICOLE PALMER +1 850 429 0755 +1 850 429 0871 npalmer@wpslawyers.com
No Logo RAYMOND EVERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER +1 215 683 5444 +1 215 683 5398 christopher.rider@phila.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (121) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Settlement Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Sever
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Discovery Plan
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Statement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. 49) IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/20/18. 12/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 Supplemental MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Narcotics Bureau Arrest Statistics)(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. 49). SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/13/18. 12/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of David A. Berlin by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of DEBRA FRAZIER, with Certificate of Service.(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 12/11/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Compel
                                                                                                                                        Supplemental MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by DEBRA FRAZIER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of DEBRA FRAZIER, with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (INCORRECT PDF; ATTY HAS REFILED AT PAPER #50) Modified on 12/11/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONFERENCE CALL - MONDAY, DECEMBER 10, 2018 AT 3:00 P.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS SHALL INITIATE THE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE. (amw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 45 MOTION TO COMPEL BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/06/2018.12/06/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel and Status Report filed by SHAMAL BRYANT, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE THEIR RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL IS ENLARGED TO 12/5/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/28/18. 11/29/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION that Plaintiffs deadline to file their renewed Motion to Compel, if any, and Status Report, is enlarged to: December 5, 2018 by SHAMAL BRYANT, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 11/28/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE THEIR RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL ENLARGED TO 11/28/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/20/18. 11/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION that Plaintiffs deadline to file their renewed Motion to Compel, if any, and Status Report, is enlarged to: November 28, 2018 by SHAMAL BRYANT, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 11/21/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLANTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE THEIR RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL IS ENLARGED 7 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THE ORDER BELOW. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/13/18. 11/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re Plaintiffs deadline to file their renewed Motion to Compel, if any, is enlarged seven (7) days from the date of entry of the below Order by DEBRA FRAZIER. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 11/13/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 settlement conference
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET Settlement Conference held on 11/2/18. (rf, ) Modified on 11/27/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 settlement conference
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET Settlement Conference held on 10/26/18. (rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing:A settlement conference will be held on November 2, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Please report to the James A. Byrne U.S. Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Room 4006 (Chambers), Philadelphia, PA 19106. A status telephone call will be held one week before on October 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call to chambers (267-299-7410) once all defense counsel are on the line.(smcc) (Main Document 36 replaced on 10/16/2018) (fb). Modified on 10/16/2018 (fb).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PARTIES ARE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLORET TO SCHEDULE THE CONFERENCE. ALL CASE DEADLINES ARE STAYED PENDING THE COMPLETION OF THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/11/18. 10/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Praecipe/Request
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Letter From Counsel Regarding Open Discovery Issues, Settlement Conference Request, and Request for Stay of Deadlines by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, LAVERNE VANN. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. NO. 29 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A NEW MOTION WITHIN 2 WEEKS OF THIS ORDER AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/26/2018.9/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Discovery Requests with Amended Motion Title filed by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Emails)(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Discovery Requests filed by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Emails)(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE HER MOTION TO COMPEL IS ENLARGED TO EXPIRE 9/18/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/14/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Discovery Requests filed by SHAMAL BRYANT, DEBRA FRAZIER.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 27 Order, to Extend Time to File Motion to Compel, SHAMAL BRYANT, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 9/17/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 11/30/2018., DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 3/22/2019., MOTION TO COMPEL DUE BY 9/14/2018., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/22/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/30/18. 8/31/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Anthony Burton by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS. (RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re 24 Notice - DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONFERENCE CALL SET FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 30, 2018 AT 12:30 P.M. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF SHALL INITIATE THE CALL AND ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE CALL IN TO CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7450 TO CONNECT THE JUDGE (amw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN. Letter from Matthew B. Weisberg, Esquire, with Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 8/27/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (DOC. 15) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/23/18. 5/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 5/30/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS, JOHN DOES, filed by DEBRA FRAZIER, ANTHONY BURTON, SHAMAL BRYANT, LAVERNE VANN.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Amended Complaint by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN (original to follow via overnight mail). (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY) Modified on 5/10/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO RESPOND/AMEND TO THE SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS IS ENLARGED TO 5/10/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/26/18. 4/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 15 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Extend Deadline to Respond until May 10, 2018 by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/27/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS IS ENLARGED TO 4/26/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/3/18. 4/4/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond re 15 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DEBRA FRAZIER. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/4/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PAPERLESS ORDER - DISMISSING AS MOOT 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 03/16/2018.03/16/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, ) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS, JOHN DOES, filed by DEBRA FRAZIER, ANTHONY BURTON, SHAMAL BRYANT, LAVERNE VANN., JURY TRIAL DEMAND.(rf, ) Modified on 3/22/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, LAVERNE VANN of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; ATTY TO RESUBMIT IN HARD COPY) Modified on 3/16/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/18. (rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ON OR BEFORE 3/2/18 COUNSEL FOR PARTIES SHALL CONTACT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/22/2018., DAUBERT MOTIONS DUE BY 12/12/2018., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/12/2018; AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 3/15/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/23/18. 2/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO RESPOND/AMEND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS ENLARGED TO 3/13/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/22/18. 2/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, LAVERNE VANN. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY) Modified on 2/23/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report Of Rule 26(f) Conference by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS. (RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY 2/27/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/12/18. 2/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, LAVERNE VANN. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/13/2018 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/22/2018 04:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS 3809BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: # 1 Electronic Discovery Order, # 2 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan)(amw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER on behalf of ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS with Certificate of Service(RIDER, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against LAVERNE VANN, ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS, JOHN DOES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 169796.), filed by DEBRA FRAZIER, ANTHONY BURTON, SHAMAL BRYANT, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, LAVERNE VANN.(rt) Modified on 12/5/2017 (md). (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to ANTHONY BOYLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, RAYMOND EVERS. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on December 4, 2017 (rt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHAMAL BRYANT, ANTHONY BURTON, DEBRA FRAZIER, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, LAVERNE VANN. (rt) Modified on 12/5/2017 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?