Luminoso v. Berryhill
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00330

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 12:14 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
          CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/17/18. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (emw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER that final judgment be entered in this case in accordance with the decision of the Administrative Law Judge re 9 Response to Motion 8 MOTION to Reopen Case . Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/14/18. (emw)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Reopen Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER that this matter is hereby remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings, pursuant to sentence six of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/26/2018. (kby)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Remand to Agency
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?