Ilona Miller v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-02433

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 4:30 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal GRANTING Stipulation For Dismissal Without Prejudice 17 : the Court hereby orders this matter dismissed in its entirety without prejudice, each of the Parties to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (ad)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?