Davis v. Allied Packing & Supply, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG07319072

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2017 at 12:30 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amatto, Lynn, Plaintiff
No Logo Brown, Dian, Plaintiff
No Logo Davis, Kim, Plaintiff
No Logo Davis, Victoria, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Aiv, LP, Defendant
No Logo Allied Packing & Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Export Lines, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Corporation Limited, Defendant
No Logo Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aurora Pump Company, Defendant
No Logo Barksdale, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Beaird Company, Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Beaird Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bethlehem Steel Corporation, Defendant
BP America, Inc. BP America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bw/ip Internation Inc., Defendant
No Logo CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Chevron Capital Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Clark-reliance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cleaver-brooks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crane Company, Defendant
No Logo Crosby Valve Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crown, Cork And Seal Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Csr Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Denison Hydraulics Inc., Defendant
No Logo Designated Defense Counsel, Defendant
No Logo Durabla Manufacturing Company, Defendant
No Logo Elliott Turbomachinery Co Inc., Defendant
No Logo Flowswerve Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Foster Wheeler LLC, Defendant
No Logo Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Defendant
Garlock, Inc. Garlock, Inc., Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
No Logo General Refractories Company, Defendant
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia-pacific Corp."
Goodrich Corporation Goodrich Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Goulds Pumps, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hamilton Materials, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Defendant
No Logo Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ibrandtsen Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Imo Industries, Inc., Defendant
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Defendant
No Logo J.t. Thorpe & Son Inc, Defendant
No Logo Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Defendant
No Logo Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lamons Gasket Company, Defendant
No Logo Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Moran Plumbers Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo N. V. Moran Plumbing Suppply, Defendant
No Logo National Bulk Carriers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Steel And Shipbuilding Company, Defendant
No Logo Oakfabco, Inc., Defendant
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Plant Insulation Company, Defendant
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant
No Logo Republic Supply Company Of California, Defendant
No Logo S. B. Decking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sargent Controls & Aerospace, Defendant
No Logo Soco West, Inc., Defendant
No Logo States Marine International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo States Marine Lines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo B.F. Goodrich Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Bf Goodrich Company"
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company"
No Logo The M.w. Powell Company, Defendant
No Logo The Nash Engineering Company, Defendant
No Logo The Wm. Powell International Sales Corp., Defendant
No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc."
Tyco International, Ltd. Tyco International, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tyco International (us) Inc."
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Uniroyal, Inc., Defendant
Viacom, Inc. Viacom, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, New Viacom Corp.
Unknown Role, Redstone Sumner M
No Logo Warren Pumps, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Warren Pumps LLC, Defendant
No Logo Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weir Valve & Controls Usa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westburne Supply Inc., Defendant
No Logo Yarway Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Amatto, Lynn, Debtor
No Logo Brown, Dian, Debtor
No Logo Davis, Kim, Debtor
No Logo Davis, Victoria, Debtor
No Logo Biderman, David T, Attorney
No Logo Brown Jr., Eugene, Attorney
No Logo Calle, Nancy S., Attorney
No Logo Caruana, Maria A, Attorney
No Logo Cordery, Theodore T, Attorney
No Logo Cunningham, James P., Attorney
No Logo Dumont, Richard D., Attorney
No Logo Eassa, Robert D., Attorney
No Logo Estrada, Michael J., Attorney
No Logo Fadeff, Jeffery J, Attorney
No Logo Field, Jennifer M., Attorney
No Logo Foley, Stephen J., Attorney
No Logo Gifford, David A., Attorney
No Logo Gilbert, Peter R, Attorney
No Logo Gill, Raymond L., Attorney
No Logo Glaspy, David M., Attorney
No Logo Gunter, W. Joseph, Attorney
No Logo Hartman, James O., Attorney
No Logo Hollenbeck, Kenneth D., Attorney
No Logo Hughes, John F., Attorney
No Logo Hugo, Edward R, Attorney
No Logo Jackson, Gabriel A, Attorney
No Logo Kannett, Mark S., Attorney
No Logo Kelly, Daniel J., Attorney
No Logo Kraft, Robert S., Attorney
No Logo Luskin, Vladislav V., Attorney
No Logo Mccall, Michael T., Attorney
Unknown Role, Tuc Holding Co
No Logo Nelson, Evan C, Attorney
No Logo Oberg, Lisa L, Attorney
No Logo Pfalzer, Thomas E, Attorney
No Logo Pietrykowski, Michael J, Attorney
No Logo Rome, Henry D., Attorney
No Logo Rowell, William B, Attorney
No Logo Rushing, Geoffrey C, Attorney
No Logo Sapcoe, Lisa A., Attorney
No Logo Serra, Denise J., Attorney
No Logo Sheldon, Charles T., Attorney
No Logo Simon, Aaron H., Attorney
No Logo Thayer, Jeffrey T., Attorney
No Logo Torres, Julie, Attorney
No Logo Wah, Douglas G., Attorney
No Logo Wood, Christopher W, Attorney
No Logo Zapala, Alan J, Attorney
No Logo Elliott Turbomachinery Co Inc., Creditor
No Logo Warren Pumps LLC, Creditor
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Asbestos
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 49 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Dismissal As to Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company Inc. Entered
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Crown, Cork & Seal Company Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 47 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Dismissal As to Defendant: CSR, Ltd. Entered
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party CSR, Ltd. Filed (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 44 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Dismissal As to Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc. Entered
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party IMO Industries, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Dismissal As to Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc. Entered (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Goulds Pumps, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 38 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Compliance Hearing 12/18/2009 09:15 AM D- 30
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Plant Insulation Company (13 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 35 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Dismissal As to Defendant: BP America, Inc. Entered
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party BP America, Inc. Filed (3 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Dismissal As to Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company Entered
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Ingersoll-Rand Company Filed (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Order re Case Management Filed (3 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Hearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 30 date: 06/12/2009 time: 09:19 AM
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Dismissal As to Defendant: Moran Plumbers Supply, Inc. Entered
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Moran Plumbers Supply, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Dismissal As to Defendant: Westburne Supply, Inc. Entered
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Westburne Supply, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed (1 Page)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 05/06/2009 09:15 AM D- 30 (5 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed (3 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed (6 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. (10 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Judicial Reassignment Issued (7 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Dismissal As to Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited Entered
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Asbestos Corporation Limited Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Judgment Entered (2 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Summary Judgment - Partial As to Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Proposed Judgment Received (3 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Letter re Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Dismissal As to Defendant: Garlock, Inc. Entered
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Garlock, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Judgment Entered (1 Page)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Summary Judgment - Partial As to Victoria Davis, Kim Davis, Dian Brown, Lynn Amatto Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Notice of Entry of Order Filed (18 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Compliance Hearing 05/01/2009 08:30 AM D- 509
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed (5 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Hearing Assigned to Civil Jury Trial 02/02/2009 09:00 AM Dept: 509
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Master Jury Trial Called and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?