Bank of America Corporation v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00546

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2019 at 12:46 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hayden Dennison Brown +1 704 444 3512 +1 704 377 2033 hbrown@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian K. Kittle +1 212 506 2187 bkittle@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Marjorie Mallin Margolies +1 312 701 8044 +1 312 706 9199 mmargolies@mayerbrown.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Bergmann +1 202 616 3425 +1 202 514 9440 jason.bergmann@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal to FEDERAL CIRCUIT
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Memorandum and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Reply to Objection to Memorandum and Recommendation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None appendix
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None appendix
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None appendix
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None appendix
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/8/2018, Entered: None appendix
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None appendix
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/8/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Change Venue
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 30 Motion to Withdraw ; Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Dismiss re 22 Motion to Change Venue; 22 Motion to Dismiss is withdrawn. Defendant shall respond to the Third Amended Complaint by September 7, 2018; and if Defendant files a motion in response to the Third Amended Complaint, Plaintiff shall have fourteen days to respond and Defendant shall have fourteen days to reply to Plaintiffs response. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/17/2018. (brl)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None appendix
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum/Brief
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Change Venue
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: 5/21/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Bank of America Corporation.(Brown, Hayden)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. United States of America answer due 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/24/18. (tob)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by United States of America. Responses due by 5/7/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bergmann, Jason). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. United States of America answer due 4/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/28/18. (tob)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by United States of America. Responses due by 3/13/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bergmann, Jason). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 5 Notice of Appearance, 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Bergmann, Jason)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brian W. Kittle for Bank of America Corporation; granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Marjorie M. Margolies for Bank of America Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/29/18. (tob)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marjorie M Margolies Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3576087. by Bank of America Corporation. (Brown, Hayden). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian W. Kittle Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3576007. by Bank of America Corporation. (Brown, Hayden). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. United States of America answer due 2/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/22/18. (tob)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by United States of America. Responses due by 2/5/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bergmann, Jason). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Bergmann on behalf of United States of America (Bergmann, Jason)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Bank of America Corporation. United States of America served on 12/1/2017, answer due 12/22/2017. (Brown, Hayden)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued Electronically as to United States, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 and Local Rule 73.1(A)(2). (brl) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Reference List (available to Bank of America) (Brown, Hayden) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against United States ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3454240), filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Corporate Disclosure, # 29 Exhibit List)(Brown, Hayden) Modified text on 9/15/2017 (rth). (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Notice to Brian W. Kittle: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/5/2018. (tob)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Notice to Margorie M. Margolies: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/5/2018. (tob)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?