TRAN v. MNUCHIN

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02601
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 11, 2020 at 11:20 AM EDT (5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo DINH TRAN, Plaintiff

Represented by FEDERAL PRACTICE GROUP WORLDWIDE SERVICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley +1 202 808 3133 +1 888 899 6053 rpittswiley@fedpractice.com
v.
Mnuchin, Steven Mnuchin, Steven, Defendant
Officially listed as "STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN"
Attributes
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Surreply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/3/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None order on motion for judgment on the pleadings
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by DINH TRAN. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by DINH TRAN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for Treasury Secretary, # 2 Summons for US Atty for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Atty General)(Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5234946) filed by DINH TRAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Secretary of the Treasury, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC)(Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (sth)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 17 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?