UTAH DINE BIKEYAH v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02605

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 9, 2020 at 4:08 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ACCESS FUND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
No Logo ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
No Logo CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
No Logo FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
No Logo PATAGONIA WORKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
No Logo SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
No Logo UTAH DINE BIKEYAH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com
v.
No Logo BRIAN STEED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, SALVATORE T. ALFANO +1 973 743 9390 stalfano@aol.com
, , , HUGH J. BRACKEN +1 610 565 4776 hjbracken@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , PETER S. PANTALEO

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allyson Newton Ho +1 214 466 4180 +1 214 466 4001 aho@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. SHANE CREAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , J. SHANE CREAMER

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Fred Fisher Fielding +1 202 739 5560 +1 202 739 3001 fred.fielding@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael E. Kenneally +1 202 739 5893 michael.kenneally@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason R. Scherr +1 202 373 6709 jr.scherr@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric W. Sitarchuk +1 215 963 5840 +1 215 963 5001 eric.sitarchuk@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Piper Rudnick, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Roxane Sokolove Marenberg +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 689 7415 roxane.marenberg@piperrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SPRAGUE & SPRAGUE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , RICHARD A. SPRAGUE +1 215 561 7681 rasprague@spragueandsprague.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 609 945 7638 jlaskey@stark-stark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT WEBSTER REID +1 215 861 8358 scott.reid@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Price Davis +1 202 514 9242 +1 202 616 8470 ethan.p.davis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED: 08/17/2018, TERMINATED Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/25/2017, TERMINATED: 08/25/2017, TERMINATED: 08/25/2017, TERMINATED: 08/25/2017 David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/22/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 01/2 Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jacqueline Margaret Leonard +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 jacqueline.leonard@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018, TERMINATED: 07/02/2018 Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
, , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, Nikhel Sus +1 202 514 2071 +1 202 616 8470 nikhel.s.sus@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
No Logo RYAN ZINKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Devon Lea Damiano +1 202 305 0201 devon.flanagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrea Gelatt, GOVT +1 202 305 0388 andrea.gelatt@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony P. Hoang +1 202 305 0241 +1 202 353 2021 anthony.hoang@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Devon Lehman McCune +1 303 844 1487 +1 303 844 1350 devon.mccune@usdoj.gov
, , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Clifford Eugene Stevens +1 202 353 7548 +1 202 305 0275 clifford.stevens@usdoj.gov
No Logo SONNY PERDUE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
No Logo TONY TOOKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
No Logo BIGGAME FOREVER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo BRANDON SULSER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo GAIL JOHNSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo MICHAEL NOEL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo SANDY JOHNSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo SPORTSMEN FOR FISH & WILDLIFE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo UTAH BOWMEN'S ASSOCIATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo UTAH WILD SHEEP FOUNDATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Wood +1 916 419 7111 +1 916 419 7747 jw@pacificlegal.org
No Logo NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrea C. Ferster

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Andrea Carol Ferster +1 202 974 5142 +1 202 223 9257 aferster@railstotrails.org

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James T. Banks +1 202 637 5802 +1 202 627 5910 james.banks@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Daniel G. Morris +1 202 408 6400 +1 202 408 6399 daniel.morris@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTO Robin Cooley +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 rcooley@earthjustice.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Stephen Freeman +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 mfreeman@earthjustice.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi J. McIntosh +1 303 623 9466 hmcintosh@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Adam M. Kushner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 adam.kushner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Houston Shaner +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 houston.shaner@hoganlovells.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas P. Wheeler, III +1 202 637 5556 douglas.wheeler@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Scott M. Edson +1 202 626 2908 +1 202 626 3737 SEdson@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sharon Buccino +1 202 289 6868 +1 202 289 1060 sbuccino@nrdc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Simon Davies +1 202 339 8631 +1 202 339 8500 mdavies@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Utah Wilderness Alliance

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNE Stephen H. Bloch +1 801 486 3161 steve@suwa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE (SLC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Garbett +1 801 486 3161 +1 801 486 4233 david@suwa.org
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: Consolidating 17-cv-2590-TSC (HOPI TRIBE et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2605-TSC (UTAH DINE BIKEYAH et al v. TRUMP et al); and 17-cv-2606-TSC (NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al). All future filings in these consolidated cases shall be filed only in 17-cv-2590-TSC (HOPIE TRIBE). Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" The parties shall identify both cases in the captions of all future filings. See order for further details, including the parties' obligations to make the appropriate designations in the heading of a document and on ECF when filing a document that relates solely to one case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/15/18. (DJS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Proposed Order by ACCESS FUND, ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, PATAGONIA WORKS, SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY, UTAH DINE BIKEYAH (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Banks, James)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT OF 1/31/18 STATUS HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on January 31, 2018. Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance: February 7, 2018. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018.(Wayne, Bryan)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah by SONNY PERDUE, BRIAN STEED, TONY TOOKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philpott, Romney)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Shaner by ACCESS FUND, ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, PATAGONIA WORKS, SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY, UTAH DINE BIKEYAH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shaner, John)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah filed by ACCESS FUND, ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, PATAGONIA WORKS, SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY, UTAH DINE BIKEYAH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Banks, James)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hunter J. Kendrick, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street NW, Washington, DC 20004. Phone No. - 202.637.5600. Fax No. - 202.637.5910 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5314933. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ACCESS FUND, ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, PATAGONIA WORKS, SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY, UTAH DINE BIKEYAH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Banks, James)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by BIGGAME FOREVER, GAIL JOHNSON, SANDY JOHNSON, MICHAEL NOEL, SPORTSMEN FOR FISH & WILDLIFE, BRANDON SULSER, UTAH BOWMEN'S ASSOCIATION, UTAH WILD SHEEP FOUNDATION. (Wood, Jonathan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by ACCESS FUND, ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, PATAGONIA WORKS, SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PALEONTOLOGY, UTAH DINE BIKEYAH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Banks, James)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE re 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by SONNY PERDUE, BRIAN STEED, TONY TOOKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, RYAN ZINKE. (Philpott, Romney)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BRIAN STEED served on 12/18/2017 (Banks, James)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 12/18/2017 (Banks, James)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SONNY PERDUE, BRIAN STEED, TONY TOOKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philpott, Romney)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah by SONNY PERDUE, BRIAN STEED, TONY TOOKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philpott, Romney)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey W. McCoy, :Firm- Pacific Legal Foundation, :Address- 930 G Street, Sacramento, CA 95814. Phone No. - (916) 419-7111. Fax No. - (916) 419-7747 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5283297. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BIGGAME FOREVER, GAIL JOHNSON, SANDY JOHNSON, MICHAEL NOEL, SPORTSMEN FOR FISH & WILDLIFE, BRANDON SULSER, UTAH BOWMEN'S ASSOCIATION, UTAH WILD SHEEP FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey W. McCoy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Jonathan)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Intervene by BRANDON SULSER, BIGGAME FOREVER, SPORTSMEN FOR FISH & WILDLIFE, UTAH BOWMEN'S ASSOCIATION, UTAH WILD SHEEP FOUNDATION, MICHAEL NOEL, SANDY JOHNSON, GAIL JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Brandon Sulser, # 3 Declaration of Ryan Benson, # 4 Declaration of Troy Justensen, # 5 Declaration of LeRoy Hampton, # 6 Declaration of Travis Jenson, # 7 Declaration of Michael Noel, # 8 Declaration of Sandy Johnson, # 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement for BigGame Forever, # 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Sportsmen for Fish & Wildlife, # 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Utah Bowmen's Association, # 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Utah Wild Sheep Foundation, # 13 Proposed Answer in Intervention, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Jonathan)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 12/18/2017 (Shaner, John)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TONY TOOKE served on 12/18/2017 (Shaner, John)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SONNY PERDUE served on 12/18/2017 (Shaner, John)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/18/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/16/2018. (Shaner, John)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General December 18, 2017. (Shaner, John)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Notice - other
                                                          NOTICE of Filing by SONNY PERDUE, BRIAN STEED, TONY TOOKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Philpott, Romney)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                            SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to SONNY PERDUE, BRIAN STEED, TONY TOOKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Houston Shaner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shaner, John)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Kushner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kushner, Adam)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by John Houston Shaner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shaner, John)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Judith E. Coleman on behalf of All Defendants (Coleman, Judith)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Romney Sharpe Philpott on behalf of All Defendants (Philpott, Romney)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas P. Wheeler, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wheeler, Douglas)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, PATAGONIA WORKS, SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PELEONTOLOGY, THE ACCESS FUND, UTAH DINE BIKEYAH (Banks, James)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Notice of Related Case
                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-02590. (Banks, James) Modified to replace fillable form on 12/13/2017 (jd).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5236930) filed by UTAH DINE BIKEYAH, CONSERVATION LANDS FOUNDATION, INC., SOCIETY OF VERTEBRATE PELEONTOLOGY, PATAGONIA WORKS, FRIENDS OF CEDAR MESA, NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION, ARCHAEOLOGY SOUTHWEST, THE ACCESS FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Banks, James)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Cases Consolidated. Cases 17-2605 TSC and 17-2606 TSC have been consolidated with case 17-cv-2590 TSC, pursuant to an Order entered 2/15/18. All future filings in these consolidated cases shall be filed only in this case 17-cv-2590-TSC (HOPIE TRIBE). Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" The parties shall identify both cases in the captions of all future filings. See order for further details, including the parties' obligations to make the appropriate designations in the heading of a document and on ECF when filing a document that relates solely to one case. (td)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 2/15/2018. (tb)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: Granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John Houston Shaner is hereby terminated as counsel for Utah Din Bikyah, Friends of Cedar Mesa, Archaeology Southwest, Conservation Lands Foundation, Inc., Patagonia Works, The Access Fund, the National Trust for Historic Preservation, and the Society of Vertebrate Paleontology. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/18. (DJS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Federal Defendants may file a reply brief in support of their Motion to Transfer in each of the two consolidated cases, of up to 20 pages each, on or before February 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/5/18. (DJS)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: The Plaintiffs in 17-cv-2587-TSC (WILDERNESS SOCIETY et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2590-TSC (HOPI TRIBE et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2591-TSC (GRAND STAIRCASE ESCALANTE PARTNERS et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2605-TSC (UTAH DINE BIKEYAH et al v. TRUMP et al); and 17-cv-2606-TSC (NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al) are hereby ordered to submit a proposed order, by Wednesday, February 7, 2018 at noon, memorializing the court's rulings at the January 31 status conference regarding the motions to consolidate. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/2/2018. (lctsc2).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order due by 2/7/2018. (tb)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 1/31/2018 in case numbers: 17-cv-2587, 17-cv-2590, 17-cv-2591, 17-cv-2605, 17-cv-2606. The Court's Grants the 17 17 Motions to Consolidate, and the Cases will be consolidated in 2 Groups. Case 17-cv-2587 is consolidated with case 17-2591 in the first group; Case 17-cv-2590 is consolidated with case numbers 17-cv-02605 and 17-cv-2606 in the second group. A further detailed Order is Forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne) (jth)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is hereby scheduled for 1/31/18 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan for the following Utah National Monument Cases: 17-cv-2587-TSC (WILDERNESS SOCIETY et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al): 17-cv-2590-TSC (HOPI TRIBE et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2591-TSC (GRAND STAIRCASE ESCALANTE PARTNERS et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2605-TSC (UTAH DINE BIKEYAH et al v. TRUMP et al); and 17-cv-2606-TSC (NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al). (jth)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set for 1/31/18 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 in the following Utah National Monument Cases: 17-cv-2587-TSC (WILDERNESS SOCIETY et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al): 17-cv-2590-TSC (HOPI TRIBE et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2591-TSC (GRAND STAIRCASE ESCALANTE PARTNERS et al v. TRUMP et al); 17-cv-2605-TSC (UTAH DINE BIKEYAH et al v. TRUMP et al); and 17-cv-2606-TSC (NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/26/18. (DJS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/16/2018. (tb)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: Granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/22/18. (DJS)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (jd)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?