Baker v. A.W. Chesterton Company
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG08420263

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 8, 2017 at 3:13 PM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Baker, Phyllis Lee, Plaintiff
No Logo Baker, Richard Eugene, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo A.w. Chesterton, Company, Defendant
No Logo Ajax Tocco Magnethermic Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Corporation Limited, Defendant
No Logo Autozone, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bw/ip, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Chrysler, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cleaver-brooks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crown, Cork And Seal Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Csk Auto, Inc., Individ And As Parent..., Defendant
No Logo Csr Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Danieli Wean United, Defendant
No Logo Danieli, Inc., Defendant
No Logo E.d. Bullard Company, Defendant
No Logo Eaton Corporation, Indiv And Parent..., Defendant
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vastera, Inc.
No Logo Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric, Inc."
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
No Logo General Refractories Company, Defendant
No Logo Honeywell Internation Inc., Indiv. And As, Defendant
No Logo Imo Industries, Inc., Defendant
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Defendant
No Logo J.t. Thorpe & Son Inc, Defendant
No Logo Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Maremont Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mcnally Industries Inc., Defendant
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Plant Insulation Company, Defendant
No Logo Pneumo Abex LLC., Defendant
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant
No Logo Riley Power Inc., Defendant
No Logo Soco West, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Surface Combustion, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Swinerton Builders, Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company"
Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trimon, Inc. As Parent,..., Defendant
No Logo Berry & Berry, A Professional Corporation, Third Party
No Logo Correa, Gretchen, Third Party
No Logo Designated Defense Counsel, Third Party
No Logo Blalock, Anthony M., Attorney
No Logo Brown Jr., Eugene, Attorney
No Logo Cataldo, Lori L., Attorney
No Logo Ebstein, Gregory E., Attorney
No Logo Fadeff, Jeffery J, Attorney
No Logo Foley, Stephen J., Attorney
No Logo Friend, Kathleen B., Attorney
No Logo Gilbert, Peter R, Attorney
No Logo Glaspy, David M., Attorney
No Logo Hamblett, Robert M., Attorney
No Logo Harnett, Christopher M., Attorney
No Logo Henry, Karen A, Attorney
No Logo Hugo, Edward R, Attorney
No Logo James, Jon C., Attorney
No Logo Jamison, Kevin D, Attorney
No Logo Judin Esq, Jennifer, Attorney
No Logo Kannett, Mark S., Attorney
No Logo Kirby, John K., Attorney
No Logo Lopez, Ron, Attorney
No Logo Mccall, Michael T., Attorney
Unknown Role, Tuc Holding Co
No Logo Mcmahon, Brien F., Attorney
No Logo Nelson, Evan C, Attorney
No Logo Oberg, Lisa L, Attorney
No Logo Pietrykowski, Michael J, Attorney
No Logo Rhoades Esq, Ralph R., Attorney
No Logo Ridley, Shawn M., Attorney
No Logo Rome, Henry D., Attorney
No Logo Sabnis, Rohit A., Attorney
No Logo Sheldon, Charles T., Attorney
No Logo Shingler, Ronald J., Attorney
No Logo Spanos, Evanthia M, Attorney
No Logo Tavera, Leonard M, Attorney
No Logo Vo, Chinh T., Attorney
No Logo Young, Dennis M., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Asbestos
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Dismissal As to Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc. Entered (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Owens-Illinois, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Tentative Case Management Order (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 45 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Dismissal As to Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc. Entered
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Owens-Illinois, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Dismissal As to Defendant: IMO Industries Inc. Entered (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed (3 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party IMO Industries Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 40 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/10/2010 11:00 AM D- 20
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Dismissal As to Defendant: Riley Power, Inc. Entered (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 38 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Hearing Dropped from dept: 20 date: 10/28/2010 time: 02:00 PM
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Riley Power, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed (12 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Hearing Confirmed for 10/28/2010 02:00 PM D- 20
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Filed by Phyllis Lee Baker, Richard Eugene Baker (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Dismissal As to Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company Entered (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party A.W. Chesterton Company Filed (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/28/2010 02:00 PM D- 20
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party (1 Page)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Dismissal As to Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. Entered (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/17/2010 11:00 AM D- 20
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed (3 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Dismissal As to Defendant: Danieli, Inc. Entered (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Danieli, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Substitution of Attorney Filed for Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (10 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Compliance Hearing 07/09/2010 10:00 AM D- 20
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed (1 Page)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Hearing Continued to Civil Jury Trial dept: 20 date: 04/29/2010 time: 09:30 AM
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Dismissal As to Defendant: E.D. Bullard Company Entered
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Dismissal As to Defendant: Bechtel Corporation Entered
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Hearing Continued to Civil Jury Trial dept: 20 date: 04/28/2010 time: 09:30 AM
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Miscellaneous Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Dismissal As to Defendant: Danieli, Inc. Entered
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party E.D. Bullard Company Filed (4 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Danieli, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Bechtel Corporation Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Order Granting Courtroom View Network's Media Coverage Request Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Hearing Continued to Civil Jury Trial dept: 20 date: 04/26/2010 time: 09:30 AM
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Miscellaneous Attendance Sheet Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Hearing Continued to Civil Jury Trial dept: 20 date: 04/27/2010 time: 09:30 AM
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued (3 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Motion Media request Granted (8 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?