Chan v. WMC Mortgage Corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG10533163

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2017 at 1:25 AM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chan, Amy, Plaintiff
No Logo Chan, Peter, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, Defendant
U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.s. Bank National Association"
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Babcock, Daska P., Attorney
No Logo Harris, Lawrence D., Attorney
No Logo Lane, Gary, Attorney
No Logo Sorich, John M, Attorney
No Logo Yoo, S. Christopher, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Real Property
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Statement of WMC Mortgage Corporation Filed (4 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend (4 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend (4 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed (4 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 12/02/2010 09:00 AM D- 19
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Demurrer to Complaint Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation (17 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proof of Service on Complaint As to U.S. Bank National Association Filed (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 12/02/2010 09:00 AM D- 19
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association (56 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Not Found or Non Service Return Filed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Not Found or Non Service Return Filed (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Not Found or Non Service Return Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Other Real Property As to WMC Mortgage Corporation Filed (3 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Proof of Service on Complaint As to Chase Home Finance, LLC Filed (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Initial Case Management Conference 01/07/2011 09:00 AM D- 19 (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Complaint Other Real Property Filed (53 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Peter Chan (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?