Preservation Technologies LLC v. MindGeek USA Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-08906

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2021 at 3:09 PM ST (8.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MG Content DP Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S Brooks +1 310 229 0408 +1 310 229 9901 ssbrooks@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Ralph Albert Dengler +1 212 503 0655 +1 212 307 5598 radengler@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alper T. Ertas +1 415 343 3214 +1 415 653 3755 ATErtas@Venable.com
No Logo MG Content RK Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S Brooks +1 310 229 0408 +1 310 229 9901 ssbrooks@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Ralph Albert Dengler +1 212 503 0655 +1 212 307 5598 radengler@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alper T. Ertas +1 415 343 3214 +1 415 653 3755 ATErtas@Venable.com
No Logo MG Freesite II Ltd., Defendant
No Logo MG Freesites Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Mindgeek SARL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, TERMINATED: 04/04/2018, TERMINATED: 04/04/2018 Tamany Vinson Bentz +1 310 229 9900 +1 310 229 9901 tamany.bentz@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S Brooks +1 310 229 0408 +1 310 229 9901 ssbrooks@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Ralph Albert Dengler +1 212 503 0655 +1 212 307 5598 radengler@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alper T. Ertas +1 415 343 3214 +1 415 653 3755 ATErtas@Venable.com
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Frank M Gasparo +1 212 370 6273 +1 212 307 5598 fmgasparo@venable.com
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Todd M. Nosher tmnosher@venable.com
No Logo MindGeek USA Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, TERMINATED: 04/04/2018, TERMINATED: 04/04/2018 Tamany Vinson Bentz +1 310 229 9900 +1 310 229 9901 tamany.bentz@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S Brooks +1 310 229 0408 +1 310 229 9901 ssbrooks@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Ralph Albert Dengler +1 212 503 0655 +1 212 307 5598 radengler@venable.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alper T. Ertas +1 415 343 3214 +1 415 653 3755 ATErtas@Venable.com
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Frank M Gasparo +1 212 370 6273 +1 212 307 5598 fmgasparo@venable.com
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Todd M. Nosher tmnosher@venable.com
No Logo Preservation Technologies LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/05/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Nicole E Glauser +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 nglauser@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor G. Hardy +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 vhardy@dpehlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE William Morrison Parrish +1 512 539 2628 +1 512 539 2627 bparrish@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
Space Michael J. Farnan +1 302 777 0338 +1 302 421 5870 mfarnan@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardy Parrish Yang LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE R. Floyd Walker

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/17/2012 Joseph J Mellema

Toggle Switch Represented by Stefanie T. Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stefanie T. Scott

Toggle Switch Represented by Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Salil Bali +1 949 725 4000 +1 949 725 4100 sbali@sycr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Quinton Hahn +1 949 725 4000 +1 949 725 4100 dhahn@sycr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weir and Brandt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/11/2012 Jan P Weir +1 949 482 8265 jweir@wbiplaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (158) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Dismiss Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/23/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/9/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Referring Case to Special Master
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Joinder (Motion Related)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Held and continued. Scheduling Conference continued to 1/9/2019 @ 3:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Terri Steele for Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Douglas Quinton Hahn, Victor G. Hardy, William M. Parrish; Defendant Attorney: Sarah S. Brooks, Frank M. Gasparo, Ralph A. Dengler; Time in Court: :31. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 11/5/2018 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2018 @ 4:30 PM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8 days, filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC.. (Walker, R) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/2/2018 re Transcript 70 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/2/2018 Hearing. ****Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.**** Redaction Request due 11/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2019. (Gale, Debbie) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended complaint 68 . Plaintiffs shall seek leave to file a Third Amended Complaint by November 19, 2018. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File as to Amended Complaint/Petition 64, Amended Complaint/Petition 63 filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report 66 . The Parties shall have until October 29, 2018 to file their Rule 26(f)Report. (twdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC, identifying Preservation Technologies, LLC; Preservation Technologies Archive LLC; PlanoIP Ventures LLC; HY EMAX Inc.; HTX IP Ventures LLC; and BENCH WALK 18A, L.P.. (Walker, R) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd. amending Amended Complaint/Petition, 44, filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC(Walker, R) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff MG Freesite II Ltd., MG Freesites Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL amending Amended Complaint/Petition, 45, filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC(Walker, R) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaints for Patent Infringement 61 . The previous Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 40 ) filed on August 6, 2018, is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants withdrew the Motion to Dismiss filed on September 24, 2018 (Dkt. 60 ). (twdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint/Petition, 44, Amended Complaint/Petition, 45 filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2nd Amended Complaint re MindGeek USA et al., # 2 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint reB - MG Content RK Ltd. et al., # 3 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Walker, R) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Case, 52 filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. (Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Relief, 53 filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Walker, R) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 56 Non-Resident Attorney Ralph A. Dengler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mindgeek USA Inc. and MindGeek S.A.R.L., MG Content RK Ltd., and MG Content DP Ltd., Defendants, designating Sarah S. Brooks as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Ex Parte Application for Relief From Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 53 52 Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: The parties shall file notices of withdrawal of these pleadings by 10/5/18. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ralph A. Dengler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22513961) filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from to limit Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Other Relief 53 . Application set for hearing on 10/2/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from to limit Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Other Relief 53 filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Sarah Brooks with Exhibit 1)(Brooks, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Motion for relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from to limit Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Other Relief filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order) (Hahn, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 1-5, # 3 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth re Stipulation for Protective Order 50 . (See document for details.) (sbou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Stipulation for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC, (Parrish, William) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to First Amended Complaint 47 . Defendants MG Content DP Ltd. answer due 9/24/2018; MG Content RK Ltd. answer due 9/24/2018; MG Freesite II Ltd. answer due 9/24/2018; MG Freesites Ltd. answer due 9/24/2018; MindGeek USA Inc. answer due 9/24/2018; Mindgeek SARL answer due 9/24/2018. (twdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah S Brooks counsel for Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek USA Inc., Mindgeek SARL. Adding Sarah S. Brooks as counsel of record for Defendants MindGeek USA Inc., MindGeek S.A.R.L., MG Content RK Ltd. and MG Content DP Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants MindGeek USA Inc., MindGeek S.A.R.L., MG Content RK Ltd. and MG Content DP Ltd.. (Attorney Sarah S Brooks added to party MG Content DP Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah S Brooks added to party MG Content RK Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah S Brooks added to party MindGeek USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah S Brooks added to party Mindgeek SARL(pty:dft))(Brooks, Sarah) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc., MG Freesites Ltd., MG Freesite II Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1, filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix Appendix)(Hardy, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1, filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix Appendix)(Hardy, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, 41 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. (gga)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion to dismiss. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Dismiss hearing set for 11/05/2018 at 8:30 a.m. (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 Defendants MindGeek USA, Inc., et al.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC's Complaints Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ.P. 12 (b)(6) filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Defendants MindGeek USA, et al.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Defendants MindGeek USA, et al.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Defendants MindGeek USA, et al.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Defendants MindGeek USA, et al.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Defendants MindGeek USA, et al.'s Motion to Dismiss, # 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants MindGeeks USA Inc., et al.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Ertas, Alper) Modified on 8/7/2018 (gga). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond, Set Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule and Extend Page Limits 38 . The Defendants have until August 6, 2018 to file their responsive pleading to the complaint. Opening Brief 8/6/18; Opposition Brief 45 days after the filing of Defendant's opening brief; Reply Brief 30 days after the filing of Plaintiff's opposition brief; The Parties shall be granted forty-five (45) pages for the opening and opposition briefs and thirty (30) pages for the reply brief. (twdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motion to Dismiss Briefing, Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 6, 2018 filed by Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd., MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Ertas, Alper) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 36 Non-Resident Attorney Raymond Floyd Walker APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Preservation Technologies LLC, designating Douglas Q. Hahn as local counsel. (twdb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Raymond Floyd Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21856834) filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hahn, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alper T Ertas on behalf of Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd. (Ertas, Alper) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alper T Ertas on behalf of Defendants MG Content DP Ltd., MG Content RK Ltd. (Ertas, Alper) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. upon MG Content DP Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/17/2018, answer due 7/16/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Alper T. Ertas. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. upon MG Content RK Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/17/2018, answer due 7/16/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Alper T. Ertas. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Named Defendants. (Ertas, Alper) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation to Consolidate Cases 29, ORDER granting Stipulation to Consolidate Cases 29, Defendant(s) MindGeek S.A.R.L. MindGeek USA Inc. shall have until July 16, 2018 to respond or otherwise plead to the complaint. (es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Stipulation to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:18-cv-03058 filed by Defendants MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation to Consolidate Re: 2:18-cv-03058-SVW-JPR)(Ertas, Alper) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), 26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflicts; re adding and terming the attorney In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tamany Vinson Bentz counsel for Defendants MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc.. Tamany Vinson Bentz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants MindGeek USA Inc. et al. (Bentz, Tamany) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alper T Ertas counsel for Defendants MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc.. Alper T. Ertas is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant MindGeek USA, INC. and MindGeek S.A.R.L. (Attorney Alper T Ertas added to party MindGeek S.A.R.L.(pty:dft), Attorney Alper T Ertas added to party MindGeek USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Ertas, Alper) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting 24 Non-Resident Attorney William M. Parrish APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC, designating Douglas Q. Hahn as local counsel. (lwag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William M. Parrish to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21485753) filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (A ttachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hahn, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, GRANTING Extension of Time for MindGeek USA to Respond to Complaint. 22 Defendant MindGeek USA has until April 19, 2018 to respond or otherwise plead to the Complaint. (es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 19, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. upon MindGeek S.A.R.L. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/19/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Tamany Vinson Bentz, Esq.. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank M. Gasparo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MindGeek USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21137058) 15, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd M. Nosher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MindGeek USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21137377) 16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local counsel failed to sign applications. (lt) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank M. Gasparo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MindGeek USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21137058) 15, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd M. Nosher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MindGeek USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21137377) 16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local counsel failed to sign applications. (lt) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 16 Non-Resident Attorney Todd M. Nosher APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant(s) MindGeek USA, Inc., designating Tamany Vinson Bentz as local counsel. (dv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 15 Non-Resident Attorney Frank M. Gasparo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant(s) Mindgeek USA Inc., designating Tamany Vinson Bentz as local counsel. (dv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Todd M. Nosher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MindGeek USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21137377) filed by defendant MindGeek USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C ertificate of Good Standing - Todd M. Nosher) (Bentz, Tamany)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank M. Gasparo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MindGeek USA Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21137058) filed by defendant MindGeek USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Frank Michael Gasparo) (Bentz, Tamany)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MindGeek USA Inc. answer now due 2/1/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant MindGeek USA Inc..(Attorney Tamany Vinson Bentz added to party MindGeek USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Bentz, Tamany) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, GRANTING 12 Non-Resident Attorney Victor G Hardy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC, designating Douglas Q Hahn as local counsel. (es)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Victor G. Hardy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20993067) filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Atta chments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hahn, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:11-cv-01860 DOC(JPRx). Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-08906 DOC(JPRx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Victor G. Hardy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for MindGeek SARL) (et) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Preservation Technologies LLC. (Hahn, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Summons Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons on 2nd defendant)(Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC, identifying Preservation Technologies LLC; Preservation Technologies Archive LLC; PlanoIP Ventures LLC; HY EMAX Inc.; HTX IP Ventures LLC; MindGeek USA Inc.; MindGeek S.A.R.L.. (Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Hahn, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20952328 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Preservation Technologies LLC. (Attorney Douglas Quinton Hahn added to party Preservation Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Hahn, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?