United States v. Pansier
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01740

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 10, 2021 at 5:34 PM DT (5.6 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary L Pansier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by N6755 Loop Lake Rd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary L Pansier +1 715 854 7971
No Logo Joan R Pansier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by N6755 Loop Lake Rd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joan R Pansier +1 715 854 7971
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2009 LaQuita Joy Taylor-Phillips +1 202 305 7945 +1 202 514 6770 LaQuita.Taylor-Phillips@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LaQuita Joy Taylor-Phillips +1 202 305 7945 +1 202 514 6770 LaQuita.Taylor-Phillips@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Declaration
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Default Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Application
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Appoint (NOT Counsel)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Suggestion of Death
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Proposed Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Reopen Case
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Objections
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Statement of Fact
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING in part 6 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Gary L Pansier and Joan R Pansier, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/05/2018. Defendants' time to answer is extended to March 9, 2018. (cc: all counsel; Gary and Joan Pansier via U.S. Mail)(Griesbach, William)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(jcl) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Joan R Pansier served on 1/16/2018. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gary L Pansier served on 1/16/2018. (Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America.(Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor-Phillips, LaQuita)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lh)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?