District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit United States Supreme Court

S.E., et al v. Brookline Public Schools
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 17-2057

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 16, 2017 at 9:49 PM ST (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeffrey R. Wulfson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly A. Parr +1 617 963 2489
Space Amy Spector
No Logo Brookline Public Schools, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan E. Simpson +1 617 730 2190 +1 617 264 6463
No Logo O.e., By Her Mother, G.e., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia E. MacCausland +1 617 284 3804
No Logo S.e., By Her Mother, G.e., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia E. MacCausland +1 617 284 3804
Nature of Suit 3899 - Other Statutes
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:16-cv-11111-DPW&caseId=0
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:16-cv-11111-DPW&caseId=0
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107232582 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE issued. After 12/27/2017, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Cynthia E. MacCausland for S.E. and O.E.. [17-2057] (GA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107232280 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Brookline Public Schools filed by Attorney Jonathan Simpson. Certificate of service dated 12/12/2017. [17-2057] (JES)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107227674 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 12/14/2017. [17-2057] (GK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107224229 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 12/05/2017. Docketing Statement due 12/05/2017. Transcript report/order form due 12/05/2017. [17-2057] (GA)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00107216700 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #44) filed by Appellants O.E. and S.E.. Docketing Statement due 11/14/2017. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/14/2017. Appearance form due 11/14/2017. Fee due 11/14/2017. [17-2057] (GA)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 121 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?