LOVITKY v. KUSHNER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-02693

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 18, 2020 at 5:17 PM EDT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JEFFREY A. LOVITKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Lovitky +1 202 429 3393 +1 202 318 4013 lovitky@aol.com
v.
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Officially listed as "IVANKA TRUMP"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vinita Andrapalliyal +1 202 598 8085 vinita.b.andrapalliyal@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Kushner, Jared C. Kushner, Jared C., Defendant
Officially listed as "JARED C. KUSHNER"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Vinita Andrapalliyal +1 202 598 8085 vinita.b.andrapalliyal@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
        Consent MOTION to Stay Litigation by JARED C. KUSHNER, IVANKA TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita B. Andrapalliyal on behalf of JARED C. KUSHNER, IVANKA TRUMP (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by JARED C. KUSHNER, IVANKA TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of All Defendants (Straus Harris, Julie)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JARED C. KUSHNER served on 1/9/2018 (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IVANKA TRUMP served on 1/9/2018 (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/26/2017. (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/20/2018. (Lovitky, Jeffrey)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JEFFREY A LOVITKY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(td) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to JARED C. KUSHNER, IVANKA TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: 12/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/19/17. (DM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2017, Entered: 12/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JEFFREY A LOVITKY. Case related to Case No. 17cv450. (Lovitky, Jeffrey) Modified to replace fillable form on 12/20/2017 (jd).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/17/2017, Entered: 12/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5251937) filed by JEFFREY A LOVITKY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Civil Cover Sheet, # 20 Summons Jared Kushner Summons, # 21 Summons Ivanka Trump Summons, # 22 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 23 Summons US Attorney Summons)(Lovitky, Jeffrey) Modified to replace fillable civil cover sheet on 12/20/2017 (jd).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' 13 Consent Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Plaintiff's Appeal in Lovitky v. Trump, Civ. No. 1:17-cv-450-CKK, and in light of Plaintiff's consent, the Court GRANTS the Motion. This case is stayed pending final disposition of Lovitky v. Trump, No. 18-5105 (D.C. Cir.). The Court hereby adopts the parties' proposal that within 10 days of the issuance of the mandate in the Lovitky v. Trump appeal, the parties shall file a joint status report providing their views as to how this case should proceed in light of the Lovitky v. Trump decision, and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if deemed necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 23, 2018. (lcckk1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to 1 due by 4/23/2018. (dot)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 11 Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Based on the complexity of issues raised by the lengthy 1 Complaint and attachments, Defendants seek an additional 60 days to answer or otherwise respond. Plaintiff only agreed to a 30-day extension, but the Court shall grant the 60-day extension in an exercise of its discretion based on the more than 300-page length of the 1 Complaint and attachments. Accordingly, for good cause shown the Court GRANTS Defendants' 11 Motion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by APRIL 23, 2018. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 13, 2018. (lcckk1)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Approval by Pro Se Party to File Electronically, and GRANTS that motion as Plaintiff has represented that he is a member of the bar of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, has certified that he "has been permitted to file electronically in several other federal district courts" as well as certain federal circuit courts, and has otherwise complied with Local Civil Rule 5.4(b)(2). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 3, 2018. (lcckk1)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (jd)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?