Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence v. U.S. Department of Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-07166

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 15, 2019 at 3:16 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Javier M. Guzman +1 202 448 9090 jguzman@democracyforward.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Frances Thurston +1 202 448 9090 rthurston@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by giffords.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hannah Elizabeth Shearer +1 415 433 2062 hshearer@giffords.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Rika Valdman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Rika Valdman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Gregory G Brooker +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 greg.brooker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Zachary David Clopton +1 312 353 6630 zachary.clopton@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen Emanuel Frank +1 617 748 3244 stephen.frank@usdoj.gov
, , , , , David W Fuller +1 612 664 5627 +1 612 664 5787 david.fuller@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Dennis Heffron scott.heffron@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela T Johann +1 415 436 7025 +1 415 436 6748 pamela.johann@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/05/2013 Mary J Madigan +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 maryjo.madigan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Pamela Marentette +1 612 664 5652 Pamela.Marentette@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharanya Mohan +1 212 637 2737 +1 212 637 2786 sharanya.mohan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Erika R Mozangue +1 612 664 5600 erika.mozangue@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sarah Sheive Normand +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 sarah.normand@usdoj.gov
, Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, Doreen M. Rachal +1 617 748 3282 doreen.rachal@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jennifer A. Serafyn +1 617 748 3188 +1 617 748 3969 jennifer.serafyn@usdoj.gov
, , , Thomas P. Walsh +1 312 353 5300 thomas.walsh2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , James Alan Weinkle +1 305 961 9290 +1 305 530 7139 James.Weinkle@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Ellen Blain +1 212 637 2743 +1 212 637 2730 Ellen.Blain@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury +1 212 637 2633 +1 212 637 2750 arastu.chaudhury@usdoj.gov
Space Andrea Iris Newmark +1 202 514 4267 +1 202 616 8470 andrea.newmark@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christine Schessler Poscablo +1 212 637 2674 +1 212 637 0033 christine.poscablo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Elliott Marc Davis +1 202 616 4206 +1 202 616 5200 elliott.m.davis@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Matthew Allan Josephson +1 912 652 4422 +1 912 652 4991 matthew.josephson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, , Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
Space Karen A. Smith +1 202 307 6483 +1 202 307 6588 karen.a.smith@usdoj.gov
, Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick H. Turner +1 202 305 0641 +1 202 514 4231 frederick.turner@usdoj.gov
, , , , Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Victoria L. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Victoria L. Francis
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING 25 request to continue CMC and related deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/16/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Status report
                STATUS REPORT and Request to Continue CMC by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER re: Status Report. Initial Case Management Conference Continued, now set for 8/23/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor.Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Request to Continue Case Management Conference by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ***Disregard. Duplicate entry.*** ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/2/2018 by Howard Herman. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 4/2/2018 (af, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/2/2018 by Howard Herman. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thurston, Robin) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, April 2, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time (1:00 PM Eastern). Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and exempt parties from Rule 26 Requirements. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Joint) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Justice.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Robin Thurston. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12107775.) filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Thurston, Robin) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deborah Won)(Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Disqualify Judge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ***erroneous docket entry*** (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) Modified on 1/4/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence.. (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                Civil Cover Sheet by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet). (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11959469.). Filed byGiffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shearer, Hannah) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Case reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas S Hixson. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Please resubmit the civil cover sheet for the Northern District of California from our website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?