USA v. Ahmed
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cr-10154-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 19, 2017 at 1:04 AM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil J. Gallagher, Jr. +1 617 748 3397 neil.gallagher@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Walters +1 617 535 4031 sewalters@mwe.com
v.
No Logo Ahmed, Iftikar, Defendant
Officially listed as "Iftikar Ahmed"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Iftikar Ahmed (1)
Office Boston
Filed 6/1/2016
County Suffolk
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
115-mj-02161-MBB
Count 1-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 - WIRE FRAUD...
Count 5-7
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - MAKING AND SUBSCRIBING A FALSE TAX RETURN...
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CASREF,VICTIM
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Reason for referral: For Pretrial Proceedings as to Iftikar Ahmed (Catino3, Theresa)
    LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Iftikar Ahmed; Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly)
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: 6/1/2016 indictment
      INDICTMENT as to Iftikar Ahmed (1) count(s) 1-4, 5-7. (Attachments: # (1) JS45)(Catino3, Theresa)
      LREF
      Blank 33 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: 5/25/2016 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot [25] Motion to Continue as to Iftikar Ahmed (2) (Garvin, Brendan)[1:15-mj-02161-MBB]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: 4/15/2016, Terminated: 5/25/2016 Motion to Continue
        Assented to MOTION to Continue to 3 Weeks to PC/Preliminary Hearing as to Shalini Ahmed, Iftikar Ahmed by USA. (Gallagher, Neil)[1:15-mj-02161-MBB]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Shalini Ahmed, Iftikar Ahmed; Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)[1:15-mj-02161-MBB]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Complaint
            COMPLAINT as to Shalini Ahmed (1), Iftikar Ahmed (2). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Ryan Lane in support of criminal complaint, # (2) JS45)(Moore, Kellyann)[1:15-mj-02161-MBB]
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 46 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?