IYM Technologies LLC v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-mc-80167

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 4:49 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iym Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
Synopsys, Inc. Synopsys, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Richard Davis +1 415 391 0600 blake.davis@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Gregory Frenkel +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 rick.frenkel@lw.com
v.
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Spansion Inc.
Unknown Role, Amd Investments, Inc.
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Shorten Time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Shorten Time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synopsys, Inc. re 17 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certificate of Service of Documents Filed Conditionally Under Seal (Davis, Blake) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Declaration of Blake R. Davis in Support of 18 Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Davis, Blake) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1 MOTION to Compel ) (Redacted) filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 4 Unredacted Version of Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 5 Sealed Version of Exhibit 8 to Davis Declaration, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14 to Davis Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14 to Davis Declaration)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Declaration of Daniel Page in Support of 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySynopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Proof of Service Pursuant to Dkt. 14 filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Whitman, Robert) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim Reserving Ruling on 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct ;. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Joint Motion to Amend the Briefing Schedule re 1 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Synopsys, Inc.. Responses due by 1/12/2018. Replies due by 1/19/2018. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Certification of Interested Entities or Persons and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Synopsys, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for Synopsys, Inc.. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Richard Davis for Non-Party Synopsys, Inc. (Davis, Blake) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by Richard Gregory Frenkel for Non-Party Synopsys, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RECEIVED EXHIBIT "H" submitted by IYM Technologies LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      RECEIVED EXHIBIT "E" submitted by IYM Technologies LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          [Proposed] Order Granting re 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert A. Whitman in Support of 4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Related document(s) 4 ) (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (tnS ) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2017: # 1 Motion to Compel, # 2 Declaration of Charles Wizenfeld, # 3 Exhibits A-D, F-G and I-M) (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      [Proposed] Order Granting re 1 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          [Redacted] Declaration of Charles Wizenfeld in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by IYM Technologies LLC. (Related document(s) 1 ) (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              [Redacted] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by IYM Technologies LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2018. Replies due by 1/12/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Filing Fee Receipt) (tnS) (Filed on 12/22/2017) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?