Federal National Mortgage Corporation v. Wilson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00719

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2019 at 8:57 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Remand. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand 14 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transmit a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Charlotte County, Florida. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate pending motions and deadlines, and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/12/2018. (LMF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Interested persons order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Standing Order re: 25 pages
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of indigency
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Objection
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?