JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. SINGLETON
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-13687

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 13, 2019 at 4:01 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
      ORDER Granting 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC., in the amount of $13,388.50. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant at his last known address and that the Clerk's Office shall close this matter. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/20/2018. (JB, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None OpinionCourt Filing
        OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/20/2018. (JB, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?