United States v. Dobkins
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-07342

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 23, 2019 at 2:33 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Moore +1 415 436 7017 +1 415 436 7009 tom.moore@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Yolanda Dobkins, Respondent
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
    Declaration Of Kelly Kim re certificate of service by United States of America re 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 3/5/2018) Modified on 3/7/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Enforcement of IRS Summons. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Order To Show Cause filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Kelly Kim)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/29/2018 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2018 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/8/18. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER RELATING CASES: 4:17-cv-07340-DMR United States of America v. Dobkins and 3:17-cv-07342-SK United States of America v. Dobkins are related. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/4/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Replies due by 2/12/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2018 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/3/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by United States of America. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/11/2018. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    VERIFIED PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, #(3) [Proposed] Order, #(4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 12/28/2017) Modified on 12/29/2017 (tnS).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Set/Reset Hearing re 8 Order on Motion: Order to Show Cause Hearing rescheduled to 4/12/2018 11:00 AM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/22/2018. Replies due by 3/29/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?