Batista v. Apple Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-07355-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Davila, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 17, 2019 at 3:14 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Aniledis Batista, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan Michael Smith +1 310 593 9890 +1 310 788 3399 nate@bnsklaw.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd Seth Garber +1 914 298 3281 +1 914 824 1561 tgarber@fbfglaw.com
No Logo Paul Sohayegh, Plaintiff

Represented by Brown Neri Smith & Khan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan Michael Smith +1 310 593 9890 +1 310 788 3399 nate@bnsklaw.com

Represented by Suite 220

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd Seth Garber +1 914 298 3281 +1 914 824 1561 tgarber@fbfglaw.com
v.
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore Joseph Boutrous, Jr. +1 213 229 7804 +1 213 229 6804 tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
Space Christopher Chorba +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 cchorba@gibsondunn.com
Space Timothy William Loose +1 213 229 7746 +1 213 229 6746 tloose@gibsondunn.com
Office San Jose
Filed 12/28/2017
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
518-md-02827-EJD
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,CONSOL
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER requesting proposal re: protocol for common benefit work and expenses. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  set deadlines/hearings
      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/14/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/25/2018, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (18 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2018. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2018. Counsel will continue to meet and confer regarding the procedure for preservation of evidence. The Court continued to STAY request for injunctive relief until Lead Counsel is appointed. Motion for consolidation AND to Appoint Lead Counsel are due by 5/3/2018. Motions will be limited to 15 pages and no responses shall be filed per agreement of counsel. Motions to Consolidate AND to Appoint Lead Counsel Hearing SPECIAL SET for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The parties agreed to submit to the Court a list of 4 names for a potential discovery referee for the matter. The Court will in turn appoint a discovery referee. The parties agreed and Court ordered that a Consolidated Complaint shall be filed by 7/12/2018. The Court ordered the deadline for a Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2018 by NOON; and SPECIAL SET a Further Case Management Conference for 7/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Total Time in Court:10:24-10:52am(28 Mins.) Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. Defendant Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. Attachment: Attorney Attendance Sheet. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Case Management Conference - FurtherCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2018. Counsel will continue to meet and confer regarding the procedure for preservation of evidence. The Court continued to STAY request for injunctive relief until Lead Counsel is appointed. Motion for consolidation AND to Appoint Lead Counsel are due by 5/3/2018. Motions will be limited to 15 pages and no responses shall be filed per agreement of counsel. Motions to Consolidate AND to Appoint Lead Counsel Hearing SPECIAL SET for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The parties agreed to submit to the Court a list of 4 names for a potential discovery referee for the matter. The Court will in turn appoint a discovery referee. The parties agreed and Court ordered that a Consolidated Complaint shall be filed by 7/12/2018. The Court ordered the deadline for a Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2018 by NOON; and SPECIAL SET a Further Case Management Conference for 7/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Total Time in Court:10:24-10:52am(28 Mins.) Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. Defendant Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2018)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                      ORDER RELATING CASES. The following cases are ordered related to In re Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation, Case No. 18-md-02827-EJD: Liebermann et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00110-EJD,Holman v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00125-EJD, Solak v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00123-EJD,Munro v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00128-EJD,Grillo v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00148-EJD,Diner v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00179-EJD,Littlefield et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00182-EJD,Ferguson v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00206-EJD,Gilson v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00216-EJD,Banks et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00241-EJD,Werner et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00283-EJD,White v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00305-EJD,Neumann v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00324-EJD,Cunningham v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00338-EJD,Wetherald v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00371-EJD,Johnson v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00385-EJD,Jones, et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00406-EJD,Bilic, et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00449-EJD,Williams, et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00440-EJD,Block v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00481-EJD,Canoa de Oliveira v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00735-EJD,Ford v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00760-EJD, Merenstein v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00771-EJD,Bond v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00833-EJD, Hawes v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-01339-EJD,Fung v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-01585-EJD,Yun v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-01632-EJD,Hogue v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00910-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/25/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Case Management Statement
                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Aniledis Batista, Paul Sohayegh. (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Order
                          TRANSFER ORDER that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: 3/15/2018 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                            *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please ignore - should have been posted in the earliest case 17cv7274EJD AND 18cv1632HRL cases.Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:18-cv-01632-HRL and 5:17-cv-07274-EJD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/15/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018) Modified on 3/16/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/21/2018, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (85 in 5:17-cv-07274-EJD) Transcript Order, (84 in 5:17-cv-07274-EJD) Transcript Order, (81 in 5:17-cv-07274-EJD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/21/2018. The parties requested that the ADR deadlines be extended until after the MDL determination, and all deadlines be STAYED including briefing as to 23(d)Motions. The Court GRANTS the requests and ALL deadlines are STAYED. Counsel shall meet and confer and explore possibly having a discovery referee to address battery issues to include evidence preservation. The Court set a further case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Plaintiff Attorney: Please see attached lists. Defendant Attorney: Please see attached lists. Total Time in Court:10:00-11:06am(1Hr.6Min.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER Granting [24] Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Todd Seth Garber, Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/13/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018, Terminated: 2/13/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12106555.) Filing fee previously paid on 2/13/2018 filed by Aniledis Batista, Paul Sohayegh. (Garber, Todd) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2018, Entered: 2/10/2018 Case Management Statement
                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Aniledis Batista, Paul Sohayegh. (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 2/10/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 statement
                                          Statement - Apple Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 by Apple Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                            ORDER RELATING CASE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES. It is hereby ordered that case 5:18-00324-EJD Neumann v. Apple, Inc. is related pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 to 5:17-07274-EJD Harvey v. Apple, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Honorable Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibiity for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) Modified on 1/23/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                ORDER RELATING CASES. The Court finds that the following cases are related pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12: 5:18-cv-00216-HRL; 5:17-cv-07274-EJD; 5:17-cv-07285-EJD; 5:17-cv-07292-EJD; 5:17-cv-7355-BLF; 5:18-cv-00110-BLF; 5:18-cv-00123-HRL; 5:18-cv-0125-EJD; 5:18-cv-00128-HRL; 5:18-cv-00148-NC; 5:18-cv-00179-NC; 5:18-cv-00182-EJD and 5:18-cv-00206-NC. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the cases that are currently assigned to other judges to the undersigned judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/22/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) Modified text on 1/22/2018 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 1/22/18. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 stipulation
                                                        STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Apple Inc.. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr Attorney for Defendant Apple Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Chorba Attorney for Defendant Apple Inc. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy William Loose Attorney for Defendant Apple Inc. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 summons returned executedCourt Filing
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aniledis Batista. Apple Inc. served on 1/9/2018, answer due 1/30/2018. Documents served: Summons in a Civil Action; complaint and civil cover; Standing-Order-12_170210; Standing_Order_All_Judges_1.17.2017; standing order re settlement conference; order setting CMC; notice of magistrate; NC-civil-standing-order_1.6.2016-1; Magistrate consent form; brochure re magistrates; Certification of Interested Entities or Persons; (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                  Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[9] Affidavit of Service,, filed by Aniledis Batista *Re-file as Summons Returned Executed* (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Affidavit of ServiceCourt Filing
                                                                    *Filing Error* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; complaint and civil cover; Standing-Order-12_170210; Standing_Order_All_Judges_1.17.2017; standing order re settlement conference; order setting CMC; notice of magistrate; NC-civil-standing-order_1.6.2016-1; Magistrate consent form; brochure re magistrates; Certification of Interested Entities or Persons; served on Apple Inc. on 1/9/2018, filed by Aniledis Batista. (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 1/16/2018) Modified on 1/17/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018, Terminated: 1/22/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                      ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11 filed by Robert Gilson. Responses due by 1/16/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aniledis Batista, Paul Sohayegh.. (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Aniledis Batista, Paul Sohayegh (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2018 10:00 AM. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Summons issued
                                                                              Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/12/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11984430.). Filed byAniledis Batista, Paul Sohayegh. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Nathan) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?