Barse v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Dakota District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-04178

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 18, 2020 at 1:11 PM DT (10.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Opinion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Brief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Admission
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?