CARTER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-05842

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 24, 2019 at 10:41 AM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo POLICE OFFICER CRYSTAL CARTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
No Logo POLICE OFFICER KIMBERLY LYONS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
No Logo THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian R Mildenberg +1 215 545 4870 brian@mildenberglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY GARY SCHAFKOPF +1 610 664 5200 gschafkopf@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEISBERG LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/27/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/16/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew B. Weisberg +1 610 690 0801 +1 610 690 0880 mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
v.
No Logo CAPTAIN ANTHONY GINALDI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KIA GHEE +1 215 683 5074 kia.ghee@phila.gov
No Logo CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , LEON A. KING, II +1 215 554 3597 philaking@aol.com
, JOHN F. HANAHAN +1 856 489 9746 rosenbaumfederal@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , COLIN STUART HAVILAND +1 216 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 colin.haviland@pacourts.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer & Greiner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, MICHELE L. DEAN +1 215 963 3300 +1 215 963 9999 mdean@archerlaw.com
Space CARLTON L. JOHNSON +1 215 963 3300 +1 215 963 9999 cjohnson@archerlaw.com
, , , JEFFREY M. SCOTT +1 215 963 3300 jscott@archerlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , SHELLEY R. SMITH +1 215 963 3300 +1 215 963 9999 srsmith@archerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ASSISTANT GENERAL COUNSEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , REGINA ANGELICA LAWRENCE +1 856 343 8855

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ALEXANDRA BAK-BOYCHUK +1 215 864 8123 +1 215 933 3997 bakboychuka@ballardspahr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , SHANNON D. FARMER +1 215 665 8500 +1 215 864 9061 farmers@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett, Bricklin & Saltzburg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY NICHOLAS A. CUMMINS +1 215 561 4300 +1 215 561 6661 cummins@bbs-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARITY C. HYDE +1 215 665 3302 hyde@bbs-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ruthanne Gordon - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 rgordon@bm.net
Space Bart D. Cohen +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 bcohen@bm.net
, H. Laddie Montague, Jr. +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 hlmontague@bm.net
, Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net
Space Sarah Rebecca Schalman-Bergen +1 215 875 3053 +1 215 875 4604 sschalman-bergen@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by CHIEF DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , ANNE BARDEN +1 215 683 5101 anne.barden@phila.gov
, , , , , MARCIA BERMAN + 215 683 5296
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELISE BRUHL +1 215 683 5011 elise.bruhl@phila.gov
, MICHAEL F. EICHERT +1 215 683 5023 michael.eichert@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF PHILA. LAW DEPT.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT D. AVERSA +1 215 683 5020 robert.aversa@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , DANIEL L. GARRY +1 215 683 5024 +1 215 683 5098
Space CRAIG R. GOTTLIEB +TEL 215 683 5015 craig.gottlieb@phila.gov
, , , , , MATTHEW K. HUBBARD +1 215 683 5439 matthew.hubbard@phila.gov
, , , SHANNON G. ZABEL +1 215 683 5114 shannon.zabel@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , BROCK ATKINS +1 215 683 5446 brock.atkins@phila.gov
, , , , NIYA L. BLACKWELL +1 215 683 5445 niya.blackwell@phila.gov
, , , JOSHUA BRAND +1 215 683 5082 joshua.brand@phila.gov
, , , , , ARMANDO BRIGANDI +1 215 683 5444 +1 215 683 5397 armando.brigandi@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , EDWARD D. CHEW, JR. +1 215 683 5420 edward.chew@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , JONATHAN COOPER +1 215 683 5448 jonathan.cooper@phila.gov
, , , JOHN J. COYLE, III +1 215 683 5434 +1 215 683 5397 john.coyle@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , KRISTEN M. DAVIS +1 215 683 5445 kristen.stretz@phila.gov
, STEVEN R. DICKINSON +1 215 683 5077 steven.dickinson@phila.gov
TERMINATED: 12/20/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY FRANK E. WEHR, II +1 215 683 5183 frank.wehr@phila.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BENJAMIN H. FIELD +1 215 683 5024 +1 215 683 5397 benjamin.field@phila.gov
, TARA FUNG +1 215 683 5445 tara.fung@phila.gov
, KIA GHEE +1 215 683 5074 kia.ghee@phila.gov
Space CHRISTIAN KERSTETTER +1 215 683 5082 +1 215 683 5099 christian.kerstetter@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , REGINA LAWRENCE +1 215 683 5448 regina.lawrence@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , CARA E. LEHENY +1 215 683 5080 +1 215 988 1736 cara.leheny@phila.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T DUNCAN M. LLOYD +1 215 683 5078 duncan.lloyd@phila.gov
, DIANE A. LOEBELL +1 215 683 5083 diane.loebell@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , DIMITRIOS MAVROUDIS +1 215 683 5433 dimitrios.mavroudis@phila.gov
, MICHAEL R. MILLER +1 215 683 5433 michael.r.miller@phila.gov
, ALAN C. OSTROW +1 215 683 5390
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BENJAMIN RICHARD PATCHEN +1 215 683 5077 benjamin.patchen@phila.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARCEL S. PRATT +1 215 683 5038 marcel.pratt@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , REBECCA PROSPER +1 215 683 5443 rebecca.prosper@phila.gov
TERMINATED: 07/05/2018, TERMINATED: 07/05/2018, TERMINATED: 07/05/2018, TERMINATED: 07/05/2018 JOSEPH E RANDALL +1 215 683 5080 joseph.randall@phila.gov
Space ANDREW RICHMAN +1 215 683 5114 andrew.richman@phila.gov
, , , , , CHRISTOPHER H. RIDER +1 215 683 5444 +1 215 683 5398 christopher.rider@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA +1 215 683 5080 benjamin.salvina@phila.gov
TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 11/05/2013, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED: 06/25/2015, TERMINATED TOI A. SHIELDS +1 215 683 5083 toi.shields@phila.gov
, , AMANDA C SHOFFEL +1 215 683 5443 amanda.shoffel@phila.gov
, , AARON SHOTLAND +1 215 683 5434 aaron.shotland@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , PATRICIA A. SIEMIONTKOWSKI +1 215 683 5078
, JEFFREY S. SIMONS +1 215 683 5443 jssimons@zarwin.com
Space LYNNE A. SITARSKI +1 215 683 5442
, , , , , , , , , PAUL D. SNITZER +1 215 683 5079 +1 215 683 5099 paul.snitzer@phila.gov
, , , , , , CRAIG M. STRAW +1 215 683 5442 craig.straw@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , LISA A. SWIATEK +1 215 683 5076 lisa.swiatek@phila.gov
, MARGARET THERANGER +1 215 683 5183 margaret.theranger@phila.gov
, , , , , , , , , TRACY TRIPP +1 215 683 5183 tracy.tripp@phila.gov
, MILTON VELEZ +1 215 684 3057 milton.velez@pha.phila.gov
, , , , , SHANT H. ZAKARIAN +1 215 683 5076 shant.zakarian@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA SOLICITOR'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , NICOLE S. MORRIS +1 215 683 5446 +1 215 683 5397 nicole.morris@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by City Solicitor's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JAMES P. COUSOUNIS +1 215 683 5020 +1 215 683 5071 james.cousounis@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , David Henry Bamberger +1 202 799 4500 +1 202 799 5500 david.bamberger@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GOLDBERG, MEANIX & MUTH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, EVAN J. KELLY +1 610 436 6220 ekelly@gmmlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey R. Lessin & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey R. Lessin +1 267 654 0300 +1 267 654 0305 j.lessin@lessinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW DEPT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JANE LOVITCH ISTVAN +1 215 683 5007 jane.istvan@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MARGARET M. FENERTY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , MARGARET M. FENERTY +1 215 947 4848 maggie@mylawyer.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RICHARD A. STOLOFF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, BENJAMIN N. GIALLORETO +1 215 988 9800 bgialloreto@stolofflaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy R Fleishman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 wfleishman@lchb.com
, Rachel Geman , +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 rgeman@lchb.com
, JOHN T. NICOLAOU +1 212 355 9500
, Daniel Seltz +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dseltz@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , GENELLE FRANKLIN +1 215 575 2631 ggfranklin@mdwcg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKissock & Hoffman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JEAN Y. DURBIN +1 215 246 2100 1 +1 +1 +1

Toggle Switch Represented by MONTGOMERY COUNTY SOLICITOR'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , SHARON W. GLOGOWSKI +1 610 278 3033 sglogows@montcopa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Levine deLuca & Horst, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , REID I. HOWELL +1 856 665 8501 rhowell@nldhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , GARY M. SAMMS +1 215 665 3000 +1 215 665 3165 gary.samms@obermayer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , DENISE S. WOLF +1 215 861 8662 +1 215 861 8498 denise.wolf@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PHILADELPHIA OFFICE OF CITY SOLICITOR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , MARK MAGUIRE +1 215 683 5447 mark.maguire@phila.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Schonbrun DeSimone Seplow Harris & Hoffman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ERWIN CHEMERINSKY +1 310 396 0731

Toggle Switch Represented by School District of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , RONAK RAMESH CHOKSHI +1 215 400 5391 +1 215 400 4121 rchokshi@philasd.org
, , , , , , , , , BRIAN J. PIERCE +1 215 400 4120 +1 215 400 4121 bpierce@philasd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by SPECTOR GADON AND ROSEN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JENNIFER MYERS CHALAL +1 215 241 8888 jmyers@lawsgr.com
, , , ALAN B. EPSTEIN +1 215 241 8832 +1 215 241 8844 aepstein@lawsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WEINSTEIN FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT J. HAURIN +1 215 636 0616 +1 215 494 5556 rhaurin@weinsteinfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , DEBORAH WEINSTEIN +1 215 636 0615 +1 215 494 5556 dweinstein@weinsteinfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TRUJILLO RODRIQUEZ & RICHARDS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kenneth Israel Trujillo, n/a +1 215 731 9004 +1 215 731 9044 ktrujillo@trrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ANNE B. TAYLOR +1 856 757 5031 anne.taylor@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ELIZABETH S. MATTIONI +1 215 861 8462 +1 215 861 8618

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , RAHEEMAH F. ABDULALEEM +1 202 307 2034 +1 202 514 1005 raheemah.abdulaleem@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , PAUL A. MARONE +1 215 861 5133 marone.paul@dol.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAM L. KELLER & ASSOC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , JAMES M. DUCKWORTH +1 215 735 8780 +1 215 735 5126 jduckworth@keller-goggin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WISLER PEARLSTINE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , CLAUDIA L. HUOT +1 610 825 8400 chuot@wispearl.com
No Logo JOHN DOES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Madelyn E. Johnson +1 703 379 9289 madelynjohnson@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Jason Vail +1 850 414 3300 ejv@jollylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert C. Divine +1 423 752 4416 +1 423 752 9533 rdivine@bakerdonelson.com
, , , J. David Folds +1 202 508 3441 +1 202 220 2241 dfolds@bakerdonelson.com
, , , James Wylie McBride +1 202 508 3400 +1 202 508 3402 jmcbride@bakerdonelson.com
, Mindy Lynn Rattan +1 202 508 3453 +1 202 220 2253 mrattan@bakerdonelson.com
, , , Craig Rust +1 202 508 3453 +1 202 220 3453 crust@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FROST & ZEFF, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JOSEPHINE M. CARABELLO-PATTI +1 856 429 1700
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , GREGG L. ZEFF +1 856 429 1700 da@fast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by John Does

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Does

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , THOMAS F CONGDON +1 850 414 3635 +1 850 488 4872 thomas.congdon@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PERKINS COIE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 654 6274 +1 202 654 9968 jhenault@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JAMES HENRY FORTE +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 jhf@saiber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Arthur Lazarus, Jr. +1 202 682 0240 +1 202 682 0249 alazarus@sonosky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Lloyd Benton Miller +1 907 258 6377 +1 907 272 8332 lloyd@sonosky.net

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Catherine Hancock Dorsey +1 202 514 3469 catherine.dorsey@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven Platt +1 202 532 4074 +1 202 305 7000 steven.a.platt@usdoj.gov
, , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WADE PALMER & SHOEMAKER PA - PENSACOLA FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , ELIZABETH NICOLE PALMER +1 850 429 0755 +1 850 429 0871 npalmer@wpslawyers.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Interim
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Discovery Plan
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Order
                        ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON FEBRUARY 5, 2019, AT 10:00 AM IN THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, ROOM 8613, PHILADELPHIA, PA. PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, COUNSEL AND ANY UNREPRESENTED PARTY ARE EXPECTED TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 AND 26 ("RULES"), AND LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: A PARTY MUST, WITHOUT AWAITING A DISCOVERY REQUEST, PROVIDE TO OTHER PARTIES THE DISCLOSURES CONTEMPLATED BY RULE 26(A), WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY; AND NO LATER THAN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND AFTER CONFERRING WITH THE ATTORNEYS OF RECORD AND ALL UNREPRESENTED PARTIES, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A WRITTEN REPORT OF THE RULE 26(T) MEETING WITH THE CLERK OF COURT. FAILURE TO SUBMIT THE RULE 26(T) REPORT WILL RESULT IN THIS COURT ESTABLISHING THE APPLICABLE DEADLINES WITHOUT THE INPUT OF COUNSEL AND/OR UNREPRESENTED PARTIES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 11/21/18. 11/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                          ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service.(GHEE, KIA) Modified on 11/19/2018 (md).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                            ORDER THAT THE 14 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: THE CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANT ANTHONY GINALDI IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY ARE DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY OF PHILADELPHIA ARE DISMISSED FROM COUNT I ONLY, WITHOUT PREJDUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA AND ANTHONY GINALDI (IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY ONLY) SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/29/18. 10/29/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Praecipe/Request
                              Request to Substitute Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
                                  STIPULATION re 14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Extension of Time to Respond by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/17/2018 (md).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 13 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/2/18. 5/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO 14 MOTION TO DISMISS BY 5/15/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 4/25/18. 4/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 4/26/2018 (md).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond re 14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/25/2018 (md).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY 4/24/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 4/4/18. 4/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                STIPULATION re 14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 4/5/2018 (md).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs decisions not to file EEOC Charge)(GHEE, KIA)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs decisions not to file EEOC Charge)(GHEE, KIA)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 5 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/19/18. 3/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI, JOHN DOES, filed by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. Jury Demand. Exhibits. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(va, ) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, re First Amended Complaint (original to follow via overnight mail)(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 3/14/2018 (md).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO 5 MOTION TO DISMISS BY 3/13/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/20/18. 2/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: 2/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  STIPULATION re 5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (extending Plaintiff's Response deadline until March 13, 2018) by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)Modified on 2/20/2018 (md).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY 2/27/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/13/18. 2/13/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      STIPULATION re 5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/13/2018 (md).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email to Pl. Counsel, # 2 Exhibit EEOC Response)(GHEE, KIA)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN R. MILDENBERG on behalf of CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS (MILDENBERG, BRIAN)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              2 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS re: Joseph Connelly served Summons and Complaint upon CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI by Personal Service. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA served on 1/9/2018, answer due 1/30/2018; ANTHONY GINALDI served on 1/9/2018, answer due 1/30/2018. (va, ) Modified on 1/22/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI, JOHN DOES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171198.), filed by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS, THE GUARDIAN CIVIC LEAGUE, PHILADELPHIA CHAPTER OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BLACK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS.(rt) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY GINALDI. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on January 2, 2018 (rt)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CRYSTAL CARTER, KIMBERLY LYONS. (rt)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?