NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY v. GOOD FORTUNE SUPERMARKET OF NJ, INC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00083

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 7:24 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo GOOD FORTUNE SUPERMARKET OF NJ, INC, Defendant
No Logo HENDERSON 27, LLC, Defendant
No Logo KUAN HE WU, Defendant
No Logo NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Vincent J. Colatriano +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 vcolatriano@cooperkirk.com
, , , , , , , , , , Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
, , , , , , , , , , Howard C. Nielson, Jr. +1 202 220 9600 hnielson@cooperkirk.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
, , , , , , , , , , David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elliott Greenleaf & Siedzikowski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, STUART S. SMITH +1 215 977 1082 +1 215 977 1099 sss@elliottgreenleaf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JOHN CHURCHMAN SMITH & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JOHN CHURCHMAN SMITH, SR +1 610 565 3900 jcs@jcsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KATHLEEN KANE BARKSDALE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KATHLEEN KANE BARKSDALE k.barksdale@jcsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by klrw.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S. Chuven +1 973 957 2553 +1 973 710 1054 Michael.Chuven@klrw.law
, Justin N. Kinney +1 973 957 2551 +1 973 710 1054 Justin.Kinney@klrw.law
No Logo TINA MANAGES, Defendant
No Logo XEQUIN SONG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by STATHIS & LEONARDIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, NICHOLAS J. LEONARDIS +1 732 494 0600 nleonardis@stathisleonardis.com
No Logo XIAO YONG WU, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
      First MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by XEQUIN SONG. Responses due by 3/5/2018 (LEONARDIS, NICHOLAS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. HENDERSON 27, LLC served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. (CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. XEQUIN SONG served on 1/12/2018, answer due 2/2/2018. (CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. XIAO YONG WU served on 1/12/2018, answer due 2/2/2018. (CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. TINA MANAGES served on 1/13/2018, answer due 2/5/2018. (CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. KUAN HE WU served on 1/12/2018, answer due 2/2/2018. (CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. GOOD FORTUNE SUPERMARKET OF NJ, INC served on 1/12/2018, answer due 2/2/2018. (CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to GOOD FORTUNE SUPERMARKET OF NJ, INC, HENDERSON 27, LLC, TINA MANAGES, XEQUIN SONG, KUAN HE WU, XIAO YONG WU Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. (KINNEY, JUSTIN)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN N. KINNEY on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (KINNEY, JUSTIN)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT against GOOD FORTUNE SUPERMARKET OF NJ, INC, HENDERSON 27, LLC, TINA MANAGES, XEQUIN SONG, KUAN HE WU, XIAO YONG WU ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8370580), filed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHUVEN, MICHAEL)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Set Deadlines as to 11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue. Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jjc, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?