United States v. Miller
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00029

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2019 at 11:13 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary A. Stallings +1 202 616 2604 +1 202 514 5238 mary.a.stallings@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo A K Enterprise, Defendant
No Logo Aden S. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Holmes County, Ohio Treasurer, Defendant
No Logo Kathryn B. Miller, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio Department of Taxation, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to attend by telephone
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    Complaint against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Warranty Deed, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stallings, Mary)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,TL)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?