Payne v. Ivy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00003

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 12:39 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING 8 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Rayon Payne's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees and Costs 7 is denied. Plaintiff Rayon Payne's Amended Complaint 6 is dismissed without leave to amend. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and to subsequently close the case. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 3/1/2018. (SC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Interested persons order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?