PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2019 at 3:31 PM EDT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV, Plaintiff

Represented by Linowes and Blocher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony Fitzmichael Cavanaugh +1 301 961 5191 +1 301 654 2801 acavanaugh@linowes-law.com

Represented by Shutts & Bowen LLP (Miami Office)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Dario A. Perez +1 305 358 6300 +1 305 381 9982 dperez@shutts.com
v.
No Logo ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
No Logo SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
No Logo UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
              REPLY to opposition to motion re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL. (Cartier, Nicholas) Modified on 5/15/2018 (ztd).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REPLY to opposition to motion re 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative MOTION to Remand Special License Application to Defendants for De Novo Readjudication filed by PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV. (See Docket Entry 64 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  Memorandum in Opposition re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cavanaugh, Anthony) Modified event title and link on 5/2/2018 (znmw).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavanaugh, Anthony)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE re 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative MOTION to Remand Special License Application to Defendants for De Novo Readjudication filed by ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Remand Special License Application to Defendants for De Novo Readjudication by PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cavanaugh, Anthony)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Revised Motion for Summary Judgment by PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV (Cavanaugh, Anthony)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER: In light of the parties' representations at the status conference held before the Court on February 6, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern future proceedings in this matter: Plaintiff shall file a revised motion for summary judgment on or before February 27, 2018; Defendants shall file a combined cross motion for summary judgment and opposition on or before March 20, 2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before April 3, 2018; and Defendants shall file a reply on or before April 17, 2018. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Dkt. 30, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. 39, and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. 45, are hereby DENIED as moot. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dario A. Perez, :Firm- Shutts and Bowen LLP, :Address- Southeast Financial Center, Suite 4100, 200 S. Biscayne Blvd., Miami, FL 33131. Phone No. - 305-379-9162. Fax No. - 305-347-7862 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavanaugh, Anthony)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Fitzmichael Cavanaugh on behalf of PACIFIC SOLAR ENERGY, SA DE CV (Cavanaugh, Anthony) (Main Document 55 replaced on 1/31/2018) (znmw).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to Dano Antonio Perez; Type of Document Returned: A copy of the 50 Standing Order, and Minute Order, filed on 1/10/2018; Resent at New Address: 200 S. Biscayne Blvd. Suite 4100, Miami, FL 33131, along with the most recent Minute Order, filed on 1/18/2018. (kt)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to Marcela Lozano; Type of Document Returned: A copy of the 50 Standing Order, and Minute Order, filed on 1/10/2018; Resent at New Address: 200 S. Biscayne Blvd. Suite 4100, Miami, FL 33131, along with the most recent Minute Order, filed on 1/18/2018. (kt)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Joint STATUS REPORT by ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Cartier, Nicholas)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas P. Cartier on behalf of ACTING DIRECTOR OF THE OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL, SECRETARY OF THE TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Cartier, Nicholas)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/10/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:16-cv-25324. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAgranting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss; granting 18 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/29/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for a Remand (ECF No. 39) filed by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. (Cartier, Nicholas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Plaintiff's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR REMAND OF SPECIAL LICENSE APPLICATION FOR READJUDICATION AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for a Remand (ECF No. 39) by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. Responses due by 10/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit OFAC Declaration, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury of the Filing of an Addendum to the Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Addendum to Administrative Record) (Cartier, Nicholas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines in 36 Endorsed Order shall be extended by fourteen (14) days and are amended as follows:October 16, 2017: Deadline for Defendants' motion for summary judgment and response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgmentNovember 15, 2017: Deadline for Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment and reply in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgmentDecember 6, 2017: Deadline for Defendants' reply in support of their motion for summary judgment Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/28/2017. (ase) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Clerks Notice to Filer re 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 39 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, MOTION to Remand of Special License Application for Readjudication by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. Responses due by 10/11/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cartier, Nicholas) Modified Relief on 9/28/2017 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Cartier on behalf of Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. Attorney Nicholas Cartier added to party Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Cartier added to party Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Cartier added to party Secretary of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Cartier added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft). (Cartier, Nicholas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative ( Responses due by 9/14/2017), MOTION to Remand of Special License Application for Readjudication and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER denying 37 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order. The Parties have not shown good cause to establish why an additional extension of time is needed to obtain information as to the location of the funds in dispute. The deadlines as set forth in my 36 Endorsed Order shall continue to govern in this case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/15/2017. (ase) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Scheduling Order re 36 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. Responses due by 8/28/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadlines in my 32 Scheduling Order shall be extended by thirty (30) days and are amended as follows:August 31, 2017: Deadline for Plaintiff's motion for summary judgmentOctober 2, 2017: Deadline for Defendants' motion for summary judgment and response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgmentNovember 1, 2017: Deadline for Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment and reply in support of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgmentNovember 22, 2017: Deadline for Defendants' reply in support of their motion for summary judgment Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/28/2017. (ase) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order re 32 Order,,, by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. Responses due by 8/9/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' 33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Remand of Special License Application for Readjudication on or before September 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/15/2017. (ase) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Plaintiffs Motion For Remand re 30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand of Special LIcense Application for Readjudication and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Secretary of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/28/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinkle, James) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER re 31 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV setting the following deadlines: 8/1/17 Deadline to join additional parties and amend the pleadings; 8/1/17 Deadline for Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, setting forth the reasons for relief and including citations to the administrative record and relevant legal authorities; 9/1/17 Deadline for Defendants motion for summary judgment and response to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment; 10/2/17 Deadline for Plaintiffs response to Defendants motion for summary judgment and reply in support of Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment; 10/23/17 Deadline for Defendants reply in support of her motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/6/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand of Special LIcense Application for Readjudication and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury of Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Record) (Wolverton, Caroline) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. (Wolverton, Caroline) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. Replies due by 5/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER striking 25 Joint Scheduling Report. This Matter is before me upon review of the Parties' Joint Scheduling Report, wherein the Parties do not agree on most of the dates in the report. In further clarification of my 22 Endorsed Order granting 21 Motion for Clarification, the parties must file a Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order with agreement on the following:1) By which date Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment, setting forth the reasons for relief and including citations to the administrative record and relevant legal authorities;2) By which date Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and by which date Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment; and3) By which date Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' motion for summary judgment and by which date Plaintiff may reply to Defendants' response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment.The Parties must file their Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order within seven (7) days of Defendants' filing of the Administrative Record. Defendants must file the Administrative Record on or before May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/4/2017. (ase) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order, # 3 Attachment C)(Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or before May 11, 2017. No further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/27/2017. (ase) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 Motion for Clarification. Though the parties agree that this dispute can be resolved based on the administrative record alone, the Court still requires the parties file a Joint Scheduling Report for administrative purposes. Accordingly, the parties are NOT exempt from the normal Joint Scheduling Report requirement. The parties shall file the Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/21/2017. (yli) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for clarification 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. Responses due by 5/2/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss shall be due on or before May 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/12/2017. (yli) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re 18 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue ( Responses due by 4/26/2017), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Change Venue by Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury, United States Department of the Treasury. Attorney Caroline Lewis Wolverton added to party Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline Lewis Wolverton added to party Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline Lewis Wolverton added to party Secretary of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline Lewis Wolverton added to party United States Department of the Treasury(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/17/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Davin J. Blackborow, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolverton, Caroline) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file the Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, including all information previously listed by the Court in its 6 January 10, 2017 Order, on or before April 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/14/2017. (yli) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order re 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. Responses due by 3/28/2017 (Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Compliance Supplemental by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV re 14 Notice of Compliance, filed by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV, 8 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Compliance With Court Order Dated January 9, 2017 by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV re 8 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A, # 2 Composite Exhibit B, # 3 Composite Exhibit C, # 4 Composite Exhibit D) (Lozano, Marcela) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Secretary of the Treasury(yha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Office of Foreign Assets Control(yha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Treasury(yha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control (yha) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Acting Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Secretary of the Treasury. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXPEDITING SERVICE, (Expedited Service Deadline 3/10/2017.) Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/9/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Court Practice re Joint Motions Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/9/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/9/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/9/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9355718, filed by Pacific Solar Energy, SA de CV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez, Dario) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file its Reply and Cross-Opposition on or before 4/30/2018; Defendants shall file their Cross Reply on or before 5/14/2018. (kt)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time 63, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its Reply and Cross-Opposition on or before April 30, 2018, and Defendants shall file their Cross Reply on or before May 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERROR re 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; emailed to nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. The Opposition needs to be entered on the docket. Please file. (ztd, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Extension Motion 59, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due on or before April 6, 2018. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment and its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment is due on or before April 20, 2018. Defendants' reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before May 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/9/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 4/6/2018; Plaintiff's Reply and Cross-Opposition is due by 4/20/2018. Defendants' Cross-Reply is due by 5/4/2018. (jth)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File 58, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its revised motion for summary judgment on or before March 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/26/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file its revised motion for summary judgment on or before 3/13/2018. (kt)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 2/6/2018. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a revised motion for summary judgment on or before 2/27/2018; Defendants shall file a combined cross motion for summary judgment and opposition on or before 3/20/2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition on or before 4/3/2018; Defendants shall file a reply on or before 4/17/2018. (kt)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 56, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Dario A. Perez may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/1/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Filing fee received for 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice: $ 100, receipt number: 0090-5310192. (td)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 1/18/2018. The parties did not appear. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: On January 10, 2018, the Court ordered the parties to appear for a status conference on January 18, 2018. See Minute Order (Jan. 10, 2018). In light of the parties' failure to appear, it is hereby ORDERED that they shall file a joint status report on or before January 29, 2018, explaining their noncompliance with the Court's prior order. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on February 6, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/18/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2018. A Status Conference is set for 2/6/2018, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on January 18, 2018, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/10/18. (lcrdm3, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/18/2018, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Case transferred to District of COLUMBIA electronically (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 1/9/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?