Howard v. Whitney
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00004

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 2:28 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None USCA order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Case +
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Seal Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on January 11, 2018. (sfc)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?