Poimboeuf v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2021 at 7:21 PM DT (2.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo D&G Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
No Logo Donna Poimboeuf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
No Logo Robert Poimboeuf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 420

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michelle C Johns +1 214 880 9721 +1 214 880 9741 michelle.c.johns@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Cutler Smith +1 214 880 9734 +1 202 307 0054 curtis.c.smith@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 6103
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Appear
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Cutler Smith on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Smith, Curtis)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 9 Report and Recommendations, denying 5 Motion to Change Venue filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/19/2018. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue or Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/2/18. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2018 re 5 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue or Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue or Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Johns, Michelle)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue or Dismiss filed by D&G Holdings, LLC, Donna Poimboeuf, Robert Poimboeuf. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Jason)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Opposed MOTION to Change Venue or Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johns, Michelle)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/26/2018. (nkl, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) Attorney General of the Untied States, # 2 Summons(es) Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service)(nkl, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint.. (Freeman, Jason)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6616593.), filed by Donna Poimboeuf, D&G Holdings, LLC, Robert Poimboeuf.(Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue or Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?