Adams v. Trump
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-10133

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 12:48 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bryan Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerome S. Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jerome S. Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome S. Adams +1 313 293 8398
No Logo John Anderson, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo William Lewis, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Aaron Judge, Defendant
No Logo Adam Gase, Defendant
No Logo Adam Silver, Defendant
No Logo Adidas, Defendant
No Logo Al Avila, Defendant
No Logo Alonzo Ball, Defendant
No Logo Amtrak of Detroit, Defendant
No Logo Amy Andrews, Defendant
No Logo Andre Drummond, Defendant
No Logo Andre Young, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Hinch, Defendant
No Logo Angelina Jolie Pitt, Defendant
No Logo Apple, Defendant
No Logo Aroldis Chapman, Defendant
No Logo Arturo Moreno, Defendant
No Logo Austin Rivers, Defendant
No Logo Avery Bradley, Defendant
No Logo Beats, Defendant
No Logo Ben Kohn, Defendant
Carson, Sr., Ben S. Carson, Sr., Ben S., Defendant
Officially listed as "Benjamin Carson"
No Logo Berkshire Hathaway, Defendant
No Logo Bernstein Law Firm, Defendant
No Logo Beyonce' Carter, Defendant
No Logo Bill Belichick, Defendant
Clinton, William Jefferson Clinton, William Jefferson, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill Clinton"
Gates, William Henry Gates, William Henry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill Gates, III"
Officer/Director, Republic Services, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cascade Investment, L.l.c.
Microsoft Corporation Officer/Director, Microsoft Corporation
Officer/Director, First Priority Group Inc
Officer/Director, Icos Corp / De
Officer/Director, Alpha G Inc
Officer/Director, Nbh Inc
Officer/Director, Ecolab Inc.
Officer/Director, DEERE & CO
Officer/Director, Planetout Inc.
Officer/Director, Kior, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gates Ventures, LLC
Officer/Director, Max-1 Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, D8 Holdings Corp.
No Logo Billy Donovan, Defendant
No Logo Billy Eppler, Defendant
No Logo Blake Griffin, Defendant
No Logo Bob Meyers, Defendant
No Logo Bob Quinn, Defendant
No Logo Bradley Pitt, Defendant
No Logo Bradley Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Brandon Ingram, Defendant
No Logo Brett Gardner, Defendant
No Logo Brian Cashman, Defendant
No Logo Bryce Harper, Defendant
No Logo Caitlyn Jenner, Defendant
No Logo Cameron Newton, Defendant
No Logo Cameron Wake, Defendant
No Logo Carmelo Anthony, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Clifford, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Middleton, Defendant
No Logo Cauley Ferrari of Detroit, Defendant
No Logo Charles Metropoulos, Defendant
No Logo Chris Grier, Defendant
No Logo Chris Paul, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Ilitch, Defendant
No Logo Christopher J. Nassetta, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Wray, Defendant
No Logo Clay Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Clayton Keshaw, Defendant
No Logo Clifford Harris, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Coachella Music Festival, Defendant
No Logo CSL Plasma, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Gilbert, Defendant
No Logo Danny Ainge, Defendant
No Logo Daren Metropoulos, Defendant
No Logo Darius Slay, Defendant
No Logo Daryl Morey, Defendant
No Logo Dave Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Dave Roberts, Defendant
No Logo David Wohl, Defendant
No Logo De Andre Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Denzel Washington, Defendant
No Logo Derek Jeter, Defendant
No Logo Desmond Bryant, Jr., Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."
No Logo Draymond Green, Defendant
No Logo Dte Energy Company, Defendant
No Logo Dwayne Carter, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Dwayne Wade, Defendant
No Logo Dwight Howard, Defendant
No Logo Dylan Larkin, Defendant
No Logo Earl Smith, III, Defendant
No Logo Earvin Johnson, III, Defendant
No Logo Eldrick Woods, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Eric, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"
No Logo Evgeni Malkin, Defendant
No Logo Ezekiel Ansah, Defendant
No Logo Ezekiel Elliott, Defendant
No Logo Farhan Zaidi, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari and Maserati Fort Lauderdale, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari and Maserati of San Diego, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari and Maserati Silicon Valley, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari Beverly Hills, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari Beverly Hills Service and Collision Center, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari of Central Florida, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari of New Port Beach, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari of Palm Beach, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari of San Diego, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari of San Francisco, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari of South Bay, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari Store Aventura, Defendant
No Logo Ferrari Westlake, Defendant
No Logo Fieger Law Firm, Defendant
No Logo Frans Nielsen, Defendant
No Logo Garry Bettman, Defendant
No Logo Giancarlo Stanton, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Rivers, Defendant
No Logo Golden Tate, III, Defendant
No Logo Gordon Hayward, Defendant
No Logo Greg Olson, Defendant
No Logo Guggenheim Baseball Management, Defendant
No Logo Hank Steinbrenner, Defendant
No Logo Hannah Storm, Defendant
No Logo Henrik Zetterberg, Defendant
No Logo Henry Ford Hosptial, Defendant
No Logo Hillary Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Hilton Hotels and Resorts, Defendant
No Logo James Harden, Defendant
No Logo Jarvis Laundry, Defendant
No Logo Jason Garrett, Defendant
No Logo Jay Cutler, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Bower, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Luhnow, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Jones, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Richardson, Defendant
No Logo Jim Buss, Defendant
No Logo Jim Caldwell, Defendant
No Logo Jim Crane, Defendant
No Logo John McCain, III, Defendant
No Logo John Skipper, Defendant
No Logo Jose' Alcantara, Defendant
No Logo Jose' Altuve, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Girardi, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Lacob, Defendant
No Logo Justin Bieber, Defendant
No Logo Justin Verlander, Defendant
No Logo Kanye West, Defendant
No Logo Kasper Rorsted, Defendant
No Logo Kate Upton Verlander, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Ripa, Defendant
No Logo Kemba Walker, Defendant
No Logo Ken Holland, Defendant
No Logo Kendall Jenner, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Durant, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Love, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Plank, Defendant
No Logo Khloe' Kardashian, Defendant
No Logo Kim Kardashian West, Defendant
No Logo Klay Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Kobe Bryant, Defendant
No Logo Koby Altman, Defendant
No Logo Kourtney Kardashian, Defendant
No Logo Kristen Jenner, Defendant
No Logo Kylie Jenner, Defendant
No Logo Kymberli Worthy, Defendant
No Logo Kyrie Irving, Defendant
No Logo LeBron James, Defendant
No Logo Lester Holt, Defendant
No Logo Luke Kuechly, Defendant
No Logo Luke Walton, Defendant
No Logo Marcus Morris, Defendant
No Logo Mariah Carey, Defendant
No Logo Mario Lemieux, Defendant
No Logo Marla Tanenbaum, Defendant
No Logo Martha Ford, Defendant
No Logo Marty Hurney, Defendant
No Logo Marvin Jones, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Matthew Lauder, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Stafford, Defendant
No Logo Max Kellerman, Defendant
No Logo Maxwell Scherzer, Defendant
No Logo Megyn Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Melania Trump, Defendant
No Logo Michael Irving, Defendant
No Logo Michael Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Michael Strahan, Defendant
No Logo Michael Trout, Defendant
No Logo Microsoft, Defendant
No Logo Miguel Cabrera, Defendant
No Logo Mike D'Antoni, Defendant
No Logo Mike Morse Law Firm, Defendant
No Logo Mike Rizzo, Defendant
No Logo Mike Scioscia, Defendant
No Logo Mike Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Molly Qerim, Defendant
No Logo NBC Universal, Defendant
No Logo Ndamukong Suh, Defendant
No Logo Newton Gingrich, Defendant
No Logo Nicole Marrow, Defendant
No Logo Nike, Defendant
No Logo O'Shea Jackson, Sr., Defendant
No Logo Paris Hilton, Defendant
No Logo Paul George, Defendant
No Logo Peter Guber, Defendant
No Logo Philip Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Philip Knight, Defendant
No Logo Playboy Enterprise, Defendant
No Logo Queen Elizabeth, II, Defendant
No Logo Rayne Prescott, Defendant
No Logo Reggie Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Richard Cho, Defendant
No Logo Rob Gronkowski, Defendant
No Logo Robert Kardashian, Defendant
No Logo Robert Kraft, Defendant
No Logo Robert Manfred, Defendant
No Logo Roger Goodell, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Burke, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Gardenhire, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Rivera, Defendant
No Logo Russell Westbrook, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Friedlinghaus, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Seacrest, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Tannehill, Defendant
No Logo Sam Presti, Defendant
No Logo Scarlett Johansson, Defendant
No Logo Scott Disick, Defendant
No Logo Sergio Marchionne, Defendant
No Logo Shaquille O'Neal, Defendant
No Logo Shawn Carter, Defendant
No Logo Sidney Crosby, Defendant
No Logo Sport Center, Defendant
No Logo Stan Van Gundy, Defendant
No Logo Stephen A. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Burke, Defendant
No Logo Stephen M. Ross, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Strasburg, Defendant
No Logo Steve Ballmer, Defendant
No Logo Steve Clifford, Defendant
No Logo Steve Jobs, Defendant
No Logo Steve Kerr, Defendant
No Logo Steve Paglicua, Defendant
No Logo Tiffany Trump, Defendant
No Logo Tilman Fertitta, Defendant
No Logo Time Magazine, Defendant
No Logo Tobias Harris, Defendant
No Logo Tom Brady, Defendant
No Logo Tom Gores, Defendant
No Logo Tracy Marrow, Defendant
No Logo Trevor Ariza, Defendant
No Logo Tyrone Lue, Defendant
No Logo Under Armour, Defendant
No Logo Victor Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Vladimir Putin, Defendant
No Logo Walmart, Defendant
No Logo Wardell Curry, II, Defendant
No Logo Warren Buffett, Defendant
No Logo West Coast Customs, Defendant
No Logo Williard Romney, Defendant
No Logo Yasiel Puig, Defendant
No Logo Bank of America, Garnishee
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ANDDISMISSING COMPLAINT AND ENJOINING PLAINTIFF FROM FILING FURTHER COMPLAINTS WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT BY THE PRESIDING JUDGE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
      APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jerome S. Adams. (DPer) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
          COMPLAINT filed by Jerome S. Adams against defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation) (DPer) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 4 Order Dismissing Case on Jerome S. Adams (MVer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Space Space

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 28 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?