Holden v. Triangle Capital Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00010

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 16, 2021 at 9:29 AM EDT (10.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Chi Wai Leung, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Ranchor Harris, III +1 336 500 1834 +1 336 748 9112 ranchorharris@gmail.com
No Logo Elias Dagher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McDaniel & Anderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Bruce McDaniel +1 919 872 3000 +1 919 790 9273 mcdas@mcdas.com
No Logo Gary W. Holden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Alexander Hood, II +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Geraldine Checkman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by sigmonlawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARK R. SIGMON +1 919 451 6311 +1 919 882 9057 mark@sigmonlawfirm.com
No Logo Henry Werdenberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David G. Schiller +1 919 789 4677 +1 919 789 4469 dgschiller@yahoo.com
No Logo Lifewise Family Financial Security, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mason Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Kent Bryson +1 919 600 5000 +1 919 600 5035 dan@whitfieldbyrson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Steven Lynn Koeppel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Ranchor Harris, III +1 336 500 1834 +1 336 748 9112 ranchorharris@gmail.com
No Logo Susan Marie Koeppel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Ranchor Harris, III +1 336 500 1834 +1 336 748 9112 ranchorharris@gmail.com
No Logo Yun Cheng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Ranchor Harris, III +1 336 500 1834 +1 336 748 9112 ranchorharris@gmail.com
v.
No Logo E. Ashton Poole, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Warren Pope +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 wpope@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany Marie Rezek +1 404 572 4600 brezek@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Smith +1 404 572 4824 +1 404 572 5100 mrsmith@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Warren Pope +1 404 572 4897 +1 404 572 5100
No Logo Garland S. Tucker, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Warren Pope +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 wpope@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany Marie Rezek +1 404 572 4600 brezek@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Smith +1 404 572 4824 +1 404 572 5100 mrsmith@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Warren Pope +1 404 572 4897 +1 404 572 5100
No Logo Steven C. Lilly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Warren Pope +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 wpope@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany Marie Rezek +1 404 572 4600 brezek@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Smith +1 404 572 4824 +1 404 572 5100 mrsmith@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Warren Pope +1 404 572 4897 +1 404 572 5100
No Logo Triangle Capital Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chelsea Corey +1 704 503 2575 ccorey@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Israel Dahan +1 212 556 2100 +1 212 556 2222 idahan@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. Warren Pope +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 wpope@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bethany Marie Rezek +1 404 572 4600 brezek@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Smith +1 404 572 4824 +1 404 572 5100 mrsmith@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Warren Pope +1 404 572 4897 +1 404 572 5100
No Logo Julie Serrano, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDaniel & Anderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Bruce McDaniel +1 919 872 3000 +1 919 790 9273 mcdas@mcdas.com
No Logo Lifewise Family Financial Security, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mason Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Kent Bryson +1 919 600 5000 +1 919 600 5035 dan@whitfieldbyrson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Donovan +1 212 545 4600 donovan@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter C. Harrar +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 harrar@whafh.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None USCA Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Opinion from USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Notice-Other
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Notice - other
                                Notice filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III Regarding Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss. (Pope, Benjamin)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Smith, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 84 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/24/2018. (Collins, S.)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 File Excess Pages
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Michael)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LifeWise Family Financial Security Inc.. (Bryson, Daniel)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Certificate of service
                                          Certificate of Service filed by Elias Dagher regarding 80 Notice of Appearance . (McDaniel, L.)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                            Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Elias Dagher (McDaniel, L.) Modified on 5/30/2018 to reflect amended pleading. (Collins, S.).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                              Notice of Appearance filed by L. Bruce McDaniel on behalf of Elias Dagher. (McDaniel, L.)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Declaration
                                                Declaration regarding 78 Declaration,,,,,, Additional Exhibits by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24 - Press release dated Feb. 24, 2016, # 2 Exhibit 25 - Transcript of investor call on Feb. 25, 2016, # 3 Exhibit 26 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q, dated May 4, 2016, # 4 Exhibit 27 - Excerpt - June 23, 2016 Analyst and Investor Meeting presentation, # 5 Exhibit 28 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q, dated Aug. 3, 2016, # 6 Exhibit 29 - Transcript of investor call on Aug. 4, 2016, # 7 Exhibit 30 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated November 2, 2016, # 8 Exhibit 31 - Transcript of investor call Nov. 3, 2016, # 9 Exhibit 32 - Excerpt - Form 10-K dated Feb. 22, 2017, # 10 Exhibit 33 - Transcript of investor call on Feb. 23, 2017, # 11 Exhibit 34 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated May 3, 2017, # 12 Exhibit 35 - Excerpt - June 22, 2017 Annual Analyst and Investor Meeting presentation, # 13 Exhibit 36 - Press release dated Aug. 2, 2017, # 14 Exhibit 37 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated Aug. 2, 2017, # 15 Exhibit 38 - Transcript of investor call on August 3, 2017, # 16 Exhibit 39 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated November 1, 2017, # 17 Exhibit 40 - Press release dated Nov. 1, 2017, # 18 Exhibit 41 - Transcript of investor call on Nov. 2, 2017, # 19 Exhibit 42 - Excerpt - Form 10-K for 2017 dated February 28, 2018, # 20 Exhibit 43 - Press release dated April 4, 2018, # 21 Exhibit 44 - Chart of the Forward-Looking Statements from Year 2014, # 22 Exhibit 45 - Chart of the Forward-Looking Statements from Year 2015, # 23 Exhibit 46 - Chart of the Forward-Looking Statements from Year 2016, # 24 Exhibit 47 - Chart of the Forward-Looking Statements from Year 2017, # 25 Exhibit 48 - Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Exhibit A, # 26 Exhibit 49 - Daily Stock Price Chart) (Smith, Michael)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Declaration
                                                  Declaration regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt - Form 10-K dated February 26, 2014, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt Form 10-Q dated May 7, 2014, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Press release dated May 7, 2014, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of investor call on May 8, 2014, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt Form 10-Q dated Aug. 6, 2014, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Transcript of investor call on Aug. 7, 2014, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated Nov. 5, 2014, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Press release dated Nov. 5, 2014, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Transcript of investor call on Nov. 6, 2014, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt - Form 10-K dated March 2, 2015, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Press release dated March 2, 2015, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Transcript of investor call on March 2, 2015, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated May 6, 2015, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Press release dated May 6, 2015, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Transcript of investor call on May 7, 2015, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated Aug. 5, 2015, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Press release dated Aug. 5, 2015, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Transcript of investor call on Aug. 6, 2015, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Excerpt - Form 10-Q dated Nov. 4, 2015, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Press release dated Nov. 4, 2015, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Transcript of investor call on Nov. 5, 2015, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Excerpt - Form 10-K for 2015, dated Feb. 24, 2016) (Smith, Michael)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                    Memorandum in Support regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Smith, Michael)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Smith, Michael)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                        Financial Disclosure Statement by E. Ashton Poole (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                          Financial Disclosure Statement by Steven C. Lilly (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                            Financial Disclosure Statement by Garland S. Tucker, III (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                                              Financial Disclosure Statement by Triangle Capital Corporation (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                **Disregard - Corrected and refiled at 81 ** Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Elias Dagher (McDaniel, L.) Modified on 5/30/2018 (Collins, S.).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew M. Guiney on behalf of LifeWise Family Financial Security Inc.. (Guiney, Matthew)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LifeWise Family Financial Security Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Bryson, Daniel)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Patrick Donovan on behalf of LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc.. (Donovan, Patrick)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Peter C. Harrar on behalf of LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc.. (Harrar, Peter)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER - LifeWise's motion to appoint as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel [DE34] is GRANTED. LifeWise's same motion pending in case number 5:18-CV-15-FL is GRANTED for reasons articulated here. The other pending motions to appoint as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel are DENIED. [DE27] [DE29], [DE37]. Lead counsel is directed to file and serve consolidated amended complaint by 4/10/18. Defendants shall file and serve their response to the consolidated amended complaint within 45 days. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/12/2018. (Collins, S.)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER - The court GRANTS movants' motions to consolidate and ORDERS that civil action No. 5:18-CV-00015-FL, currently pending in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, is consolidated with the earlier-filed action, No. 5:18-CV-00010-FL. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/5/2018. (Collins, S.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew M. Guiney) (Bryson, Daniel)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 37 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Julie Serrano. (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Yun Cheng, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung. (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Notice of Change of Address filed by Chelsea J. Corey filed by on behalf of Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Notice filed by Geraldine Checkman regarding 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL. (Sigmon, Mark)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Declaration regarding 58 Memorandum in Opposition, by Julie Serrano filed by Julie Serrano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - LifeWise Family Financial Security Inc. Utah business registration, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 11/1/01 Marketwatch article, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 10/31/01 SEC Release, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Press releases) (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition regarding 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, 41 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Counsel, 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel, 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Julie Serrano. (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Declaration regarding 56 Response in Opposition to Motion,, on behalf of Adam Apton by Yun Cheng, Susan Marie Koeppel, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung filed by Yun Cheng, Susan Marie Koeppel, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition regarding 37 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, 41 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Counsel, 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Yun Cheng, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung. (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RESPONSE regarding Motions 27 29 37 41 filed by LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc.. (Bryson, Daniel) Modified on 2/15/2018 to terminate docket entry relationship to 34 and to add docket entry relationship to entries 27 29 37 and 41 per instructions from counsel's office. (Collins, S.).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion regarding 37 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, 41 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Counsel, 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel, 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Financial Disclosure Statement by LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc. (Bryson, Daniel)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Notice filed by Henry Werdenberg regarding 41 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Counsel NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION. (Schiller, David)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Bethany M. Rezek on behalf of Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Rezek, Bethany)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Benjamin W. Pope on behalf of Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Pope, Benjamin)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael R. Smith on behalf of Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Notice filed by Yun Cheng, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung regarding 22 Notice of Appearance, 25 Financial Disclosure Statement, 23 Financial Disclosure Statement, 26 Financial Disclosure Statement, 24 Financial Disclosure Statement re: Certificate of Service. (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Financial Disclosure Statement by Julie Serrano Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-00010-FL, 5:18-cv-00015-FL (McDaniel, L.) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance filed by L. Bruce McDaniel on behalf of Julie Serrano. (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding 1 Complaint, filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance filed by Chelsea J. Corey on behalf of All Defendants. (Corey, Chelsea)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/24/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Financial Disclosure Statement by Geraldine Checkman (Sigmon, Mark)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support regarding 41 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Counsel filed by Henry Werdenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A - PSLRA Notice, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Certifications, # 4 Exhibit EEx. C - Damages Analysis, # 5 Exhibit Ex. D - Pomerantz Resume, # 6 Exhibit Ex. E - Schiller Resume, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schiller, David)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Counsel filed by Henry Werdenberg. (Schiller, David)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Financial Disclosure Statement by Julie Serrano Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-00010-FL, 5:18-cv-00015-FL (McDaniel, L.) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support regarding 37 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Julie Serrano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice and Update, # 2 Exhibit B - Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, # 4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume) (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support regarding 37 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Julie Serrano. (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Julie Serrano. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (McDaniel, L.)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      DISREGARD - Corrected and refiled at 46 Notice of Appearance filed by L. Bruce McDaniel on behalf of Julie Serrano. (McDaniel, L.) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Collins, S.).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support regarding 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew M. Guiney, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Notice, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Certification, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order) (Bryson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by LifeWise Family Financial Security, Inc.. (Bryson, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Notice filed by Yun Cheng, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung regarding 30 Memorandum in Support, 31 Declaration, 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases re: Certificate of Service. (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              DISREGARD - Corrected and refiled at 43 Financial Disclosure Statement by Geraldine Checkman (Sigmon, Mark) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Collins, S.).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Declaration regarding 30 Memorandum in Support, 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Yun Cheng, Susan Marie Koeppel, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung filed by Yun Cheng, Susan Marie Koeppel, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support regarding 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Yun Cheng, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung. (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Yun Cheng, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel, Chi Wai Leung. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support regarding 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Geraldine Checkman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Prongay) (Sigmon, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Geraldine Checkman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sigmon, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Financial Disclosure Statement by Yun Cheng Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-00010-FL, 5:18-cv-00015-FL (Harris, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Financial Disclosure Statement by Chi Wai Leung Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-00010-FL, 5:18-cv-00015-FL (Harris, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Financial Disclosure Statement by Steven Lynn Koeppel Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-00010-FL, 5:18-cv-00015-FL (Harris, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Financial Disclosure Statement by Susan Marie Koeppel Associated Cases: 5:18-cv-00010-FL, 5:18-cv-00015-FL (Harris, Samuel) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel Ranchor Harris, III on behalf of Yun Cheng, Chi Wai Leung, Steven Lynn Koeppel, Susan Marie Koeppel. (Harris, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Parties Regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Case transferred in from District of New York Southern. Case Number 1:17-cv-09311. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a): NOW THEREFORE, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a), the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of transfer this action, immediately and in its entirety, to the Untied States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/12/2018) (ap) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 16 Motion for Michael R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/10/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 15 Motion for Benjamin Warren Pope to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/10/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Michael R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Benjamin Warren Pope to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pope, Benjamin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14552767. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 1/9/2018 (ma). [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Benjamin Warren Pope to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14552702. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pope, Benjamin) Modified on 1/9/2018 (ma). [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Israel Dahan dated January 5, 2018 re: Defendants' Letter Response to the Court's December 28, 2017 Order as to Defendants' positions on transfer and lead plaintiff briefing. Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III.(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application DENIED. The Court intends to address Defendants' outstanding motion to transfer venue and a schedule for applications for appointment as lead counsel at the January 12, 2018 conference. The parties are not required to submit a joint pre-conference letter and proposed case management plan in advance of the conference as is typically required by the Undersigned's individual practices. Rather, each party may, by January 5, 2018, submit a letter of not more than 2 pages setting forth their position as to transfer and a proposed briefing schedule for selection of lead plaintiff and lead plaintiff's counsel. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/28/2017) (kgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference - Request by Defendants and Plaintiff in the Holden action to the Court to (a) adjourn the Initial Pretrial Conferences scheduled for January 12, 2018; (b) reschedule those conferences for a date that is convenient for the Court after the appointment of the lead plaintiff, the filing of a consolidated amended complaint and adjudication of Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint; and, (c) toll the deadline for the parties to submit their joint letters pursuant to Paragraph 2 of the Notices of Initial Pretrial Conferences and Civil Case Management Plans and Scheduling Orders addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Israel Dahan dated 12/26/2017. Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III.(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 8 Letter, regarding Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a) filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will consider whether to transfer this case at the January 12, 2018 initial pre-trial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/14/2017) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Israel Dahan dated December 14, 2017 re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a). Document filed by Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Transfer Action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a))(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on January 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter of no more than five pages byJanuary 4, 2018, addressing the following in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/8/17) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Gary W. Holden. (Hood, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triangle Capital Corporation, E. Ashton Poole, Steven C. Lilly and Garland S. Tucker, III, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Gary W. Holden. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-09102. Document filed by Gary W. Holden.(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Steven C. Lilly, E. Ashton Poole, Triangle Capital Corporation, Garland S. Tucker, III. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14408890)Document filed by Gary W. Holden.(Lieberman, Jeremy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion No Longer Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding 84 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: 80 Notice of Appearance. Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(d)(1) requires a certificate of service. Counsel is directed to file a captioned document titled Certificate of Service using the Certificate of Service event located under the Service of Process category, and linking the appropriate document when prompted. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND Notice to Counsel regarding: 71 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Upon review of the docket it is noted that L. Bruce McDaniel, Samuel H. Rudman, Frank J. Johnson and W. Scott Holleman have not filed a notice of appearance on behalf of Elias Dagher. Counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Counsel regarding: 71 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Upon review of the docket it is noted that L. Bruce McDaniel, Samuel H. Rudman, Frank J. Johnson and W. Scott Holleman have not filed a notice of appearance on behalf of Elias Dagher. Counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, 37 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead Counsel, 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Tripp, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Counsel regarding: 61 Notice of Change of Address. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Edwards, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISREGARD - docket entries changed to reflect correct associations for Response. NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: 55 Response in Support of Motion. Wrong event used. Counsel is directed to refile this document using the event Reply to Response to Motion found in the Responses and Replies category. (Collins, S.) Modified on 2/15/2018 (Collins, S.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 45 . Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint 1 within 21 days of the Court's appointment of a lead plaintiff and counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/26/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding: 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding 1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: 26 Financial Disclosure Statement, 25 Financial Disclosure Statement, 23 Financial Disclosure Statement, 24 Financial Disclosure Statement. A Certificate of Service should accompany these filings. Counsel is directed to file the Certificate of Service using the event code titled as such located under the "Service of Process" category of civil filing events. (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED AT 43 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: 32 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel must refile this document pursuant to Section IV.B. of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual requiring 'flattened' versions of fillable documents and forms to be filed in order to prevent manipulation of the form's data. In addition, this document requires a certificate of service which must be included in the refiled document. (Collins, S.) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Collins, S.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTED AT 46 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: 36 Notice of Appearance. Counsel must refile this document pursuant to Section IV.B. of the court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual requiring 'flattened' versions of fillable documents and forms to be filed in order to prevent manipulation of the form's data. In addition, this document requires a certificate of service which must be included in the refiled document. (Collins, S.) Modified on 1/25/2018 (Collins, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of North Carolina (ap) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 14 MOTION for Michael R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14552767. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 13 MOTION for Benjamin Warren Pope to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14552702. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE INCORRECT CASE NUMBER IS LISTED ON ALL OF THE DOCUMENTS.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 15 MOTION for Benjamin Warren Pope to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 16 MOTION for Michael R. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-09102-VEC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gary W. Holden. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 17cv9102. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?