Vaxcel International Co,. LTD. v. Good Earth Lighting, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00340

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 2:54 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Vaxcel International Co,. LTD., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lehrer Patent Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Mark Halligan +1 312 607 0102 rmark.halligan@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan D Pollard +1 214 984 7153 +1 214 279 7192 bpollard@fisherbroyles.com
v.
No Logo Good Earth Lighting, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 3/21/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vaxcel International Co,. LTD. by Robert Mark Halligan (Halligan, Robert) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (aee, ) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vaxcel International Co,. LTD. by Bryan D. Pollard for Bryan D. Pollard (Pollard, Bryan) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vaxcel International Co,. LTD. by Bryan D. Pollard for Robert Mark Haligan (Pollard, Bryan) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pollard, Bryan) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT by Vaxcel International Co,. LTD. against Good Earth Lighting, Inc., COMPLAINT filed by Vaxcel International Co,. LTD.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14014206. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pollard, Bryan)(Docket Text modified by Clerks Office) Modified on 1/18/2018 (aee, ).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (jjr, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?