Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc v. Moore
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00373

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2020 at 10:34 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jmichaele Keller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vedder Price (CA), LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ayse Kuzucuoglu +1 415 749 9500 +1 415 749 9502 akuzucuoglu@vedderprice.com
, , , Heather Murray Sager +1 415 749 9510 +1 415 749 9502 hsager@vedderprice.com
No Logo Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vedder Price (CA), LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Heather Murray Sager +1 415 749 9510 +1 415 749 9502 hsager@vedderprice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vedder Price, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ayse Kuzucuoglu +1 415 749 9500 +1 415 749 9502 akuzucuoglu@vedderprice.com
v.
No Logo David Harold Moore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Harold Moore +1 702 492 0493 kellerlitigation@gmail.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/25/2019, Entered: None Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/8/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Transcript Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/12/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/10/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Sealed Transcript
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/17/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/6/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE. The Ninth Circuit has affirmed the court's order denying Mr. Moore's anti-SLAPP motion to strike and issued its mandate returning the case to this court. The court unstays this case and returns it to its active calendar.The plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint, ECF No. 44, to which Mr. Moore has not yet responded. The court grants Mr. Moore 21 days (i.e., until January 18, 2019) to respond to the plaintiffs' amended complaint. The court sets an initial case-management conference for February 14, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. The parties must submit a joint case-management statement by February 7, 2019. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Harold Moore (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            USCA Memorandum as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Harold Moore (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 USCA order
                                                                              ORDER of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Auto docketing digital audio upload
                                                                                PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/10/2018 10:19:24 AM ]. File Size [ 4064 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:28 ]. (courtspeak).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 46 Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Appeal. As set forth in the attached order, the court must stay the proceedings while Mr. Moore's appeal of the court's order denying his anti-SL APP motion to strike is pending. The case-management conference scheduled for May 31, 2018 is cancelled. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 letter
                                                                                    Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel pursuant to F.R.C.P. 28(j). (Sager, Heather) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2018 re 46 MOTION to Confirm Appellate Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or, in the Alternative, for Stay Pending Appeal. Mr. Moore is not present. The court tries to call Mr. Moore to no avail. Matter is taken under submission.FTR Time: 10:19-10:28. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Ayse Kuzucuoglu. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 3/8/2018, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 47 Transcript Order, 48 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2018. (Related documents(s) 47, 48 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 4/16/2018 by Tamara Lange. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION to Confirm Appellate Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or, in the Alternative, for Stay Pending Appeal ) filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, April 16, 2018, at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. The plaintiffs filed an amended complaint on March 22, 2018. The defendant filed a motion to stay on March 30. The plaintiffs' response is not due until April 13, and the defendant's reply is not due until April 20. In light of this, the court continues the initial case-management conference currently set for April 19 to May 31, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. The parties' joint case-management statement is due by May 24, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 49 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc filed by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/08/2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by David Harold Moore, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Moore, David) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MOTION to Confirm Appellate Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or, in the Alternative, for Stay Pending Appeal filed by David Harold Moore. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/13/2018. Replies due by 4/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moore, David) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySteep Hill Laboratories, Inc, Jmichaele Keller. (Attachments: # 1 Blackline of First Amended Complaint against original Complaint)(Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 18-15433 9th Circuit for 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Harold Moore. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by David Harold Moore. Appeal of Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, 41 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (Moore, David) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 8 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss ; and denying 31 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.For the reasons set forth in the attached order:The court denies Mr. Moore's anti-SLAPP motion to strike.The court grants Mr. Moore's motion to dismiss (1) Steep Hill's claim for intentional interference with prospective economic relations, (2) both plaintiffs' claims for intentional interference with contractual relations, (3) Mr. Keller's claim for civil stalking, and (4) Mr. Keller's claim for breach of contract. These dismissals are without prejudice, and the plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within fourteen days of the date of this order. The court denies Mr. Moore's motion to dismiss Steep Hill's claim for defamation.The court denies the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motions Hearing held on 3/8/2018. Court will issue an order. FTR Time: 3:15-3:32. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Heather Sager. Pro Se Defendant: David Moore (Phone) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/8/2018) Modified on 3/30/2018: Matter transcribed by Lydia Zinn (Zinn Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re 36 Response ( Non Motion ), Evidence by David Harold Moore. (Moore, David) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to re 34 Order,,, by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 35 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to re 31 Notice (Other), Reply to David H. Moore's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ayse Kuzucuoglu, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Ayse Kuzucuoglu Declaration)(Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by David Harold Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Telephonic Appearance)(Moore, David) (Filed on 2/28/2018) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by David Harold Moore.The court realizes that Exhibit A to the Complaint, as docketed on ECF in the Notice of Removal, ECF No. 1 at 17-26, is semi-illegible. The printed courtesy copy of the exhibit that the court received is legible. A scan of that copy is attached here.If that copy is not an accurate copy of Exhibit A to the Complaint, the plaintiffs should file a notice with an accurate copy of Exhibit A to the Complaint (as originally filed) by March 2, 2018. If the plaintiffs do not do so, the court will proceed on the assumption that the copy attached to this docket entry is an accurate copy of Exhibit A to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on February 28, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) Modified on 3/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). This is a Text Only Docket Entry as it Relates to the Order.
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTIONS HEARING TIME: The court has a trial and thus changes the time for the hearing on Thursday, 3/8/2018, from 9:30 a.m. to 2:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Response re 31 Notice (Other), Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction byDavid Harold Moore. (Moore, David) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc of Intention to Stand on Preliminary Injunction Motion Previously Filed in State Court (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Kuzucuoglu, # 2 Exhibit 1 to A. Kuzucuoglu Dec)(Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER supplementing 25 Order denying Motion to Shorten Time for the Court to Hear (1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Motion for an Order to Hold Defendant in Contempt.The court had understood from the plaintiffs' motion to shorten time and their proposed order that the plaintiffs would be filing a new motion for a preliminary injunction in federal court. See ECF No. 15-1 at 2. It may be, however, that the plaintiffs want to stand on the motion for a preliminary injunction that they filed in state court before the case was removed. See ECF No. 1 at 31-103. If they do, they should file a notice on the docket by tomorrow at noon confirming that position. If that is the case, the court will hear their motion on March 8, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. The defendant may file an opposition to the plaintiffs' motion by February 22, and the plaintiffs may file an optional reply by March 1. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on February 12, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 26 Letter filed by David Harold Moore.Defendant David Harold Moore requests that the court issue a subpoena under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(d)(1), a party may not seek discovery from any source before the parties have conferred as set forth in Rule 26(f). This restriction applies to Rule 45 subpoenas. See, e.g., Duess v. Siso, No. 14-cv-00710-YGR (JSC), 2014 WL 4275715, at *4 (N.D. Cal. Aug. 29, 2014) (citing cases). As it does not appear that the parties have had a Rule 26(f) conferral yet, the subpoena will not issue. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on February 9, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018) Modified on 2/9/2018 (lblc1S, COURT STAFF). (ejkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re 8 MOTION to Strike pursuant to section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure ) in Support of Special Motion to Strike filed byDavid Harold Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Harold Moore in Support of Reply in Support of Special Motion to Strike)(Moore, David) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) ) in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byDavid Harold Moore. (Moore, David) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 2/5/18 to Clerk from David Harold Moore. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 15 Motion to Shorten Time. The plaintiffs have filed a motion to shorten the time for the court to hear a motion for a preliminary injunction and for contempt (a motion that the plaintiffs have not filed yet). Upon a review of the parties' filings, the court denies the plaintiffs' motion to shorten time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Ayse Kuzucuoglu in Opposition to 8 MOTION to Strike pursuant to section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 8 MOTION to Strike pursuant to section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure ) filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Ayse Kuzucuoglu in Opposition to 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 9 ) (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) ) filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the defendant of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, and includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/05/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Pro Se Handbook, # 2 Pro Se Help Desk Flyer, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) Modified on 2/5/2018 (ejkS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to re 18 Reply to Opposition/Response, Evidence by David Harold Moore. (Moore, David) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 15 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear (1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Motion for an Order to Hold Defendant in Contempt of Court for Violating Temporary Restraining Order; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppor ) filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 15 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear (1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Motion for an Order to Hold Defendant in Contempt of Court for Violating Temporary Restraining Order; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppor ) and Request for Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(c)(4) and Declaration filed byDavid Harold Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re: ECF No. 15)(Moore, David) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Ayse Kuzucuoglu in Support of 15 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear (1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Motion for an Order to Hold Defendant in Contempt of Court for Violating Temporary Restraining Order; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Suppor filed byJmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear (1) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Motion for an Order to Hold Defendant in Contempt of Court for Violating Temporary Restraining Order; Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kuzucuoglu, Ayse) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jmichaele Keller, Steep Hill Laboratories, Inc.. (Sager, Heather) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 10 Administrative Motion for relief from Civ. L.R. 5(e)(7) mandating lodging of courtesy copies by paper. The undersigned grants in part and denies in part defendant David Harold Moore's motion to be excused on account of his indigence from Civil Local Rule 5(e)(7)'s requirement to provide chambers with paper copies of his electronic filings. Mr. Moore's motion is granted with respect to filings made while this case is pending before the undersigned. As the undersigned does not want to bind other judges if the case is reassigned, however, Mr. Moore's motion is denied without prejudice with respect to filings made before any other judge (in which case Mr. Moore may refile his motion). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/30/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Civ. L.R. 5(e)(7) Mandating Lodging of Courtesy Copies by Paper CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 7 filed by David Harold Moore. Responses due by 1/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re: Administrative Motion)(Moore, David) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) filed by David Harold Moore. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/6/2018. Replies due by 2/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(Moore, David) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike pursuant to section 425.16 of the California Code of Civil Procedure filed by David Harold Moore. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 2/6/2018. Replies due by 2/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Harold Moore in Support of Special Motion to Strike, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Special Motion to Strike)(Moore, David) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC 10 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief from Civ. L.R. 5(e)(7) Mandating Lodging of Courtesy Copies by Paper filed by David Harold Moore. Responses due by 1/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moore, David) (Filed on 1/23/2018) Modified on 1/23/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Harold Moore.. (Moore, David) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case FilingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 4 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; filed by David Harold Moore. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2018: # 1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; filed by David Harold Moore. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2018 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/17/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION FROM STATE COURT(28 U.S.C. 1332); (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG17886732. Filed byDavid Harold Moore. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2018. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2018: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?