Dvash-Banks v. Tillerson
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00523

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 21, 2021 at 7:09 PM DT (1.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Mason Dvash-Banks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Alexa M Lawson-Remer +1 310 712 6600 +1 310 712 8800 lawsonr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Ethan Jacob Dvash-Banks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Alexa M Lawson-Remer +1 310 712 6600 +1 310 712 8800 lawsonr@sullcrom.com
v.
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of State"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Ann Barcelo +1 212 637 6559 +1 212 637 2730 amy.barcelo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Jean-David Barnea +1 212 637 2679 +1 212 637 2717 jean-david.barnea@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen S Bloom +1 202 514 4964 +1 202 616 8470 karen.s.bloom@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brigham John Bowen +1 202 514 6289 +1 202 616 8470 Brigham.Bowen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Byars +1 212 225 2524 +1 212 225 3999 michael.byars@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
, , , , Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
, , , , David Stuart Jones +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 david.jones6@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Tara Marie La Morte +1 212 637 2746 +1 212 637 2730 tara.lamorte2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean H. Lane +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2717 sean.lane@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter Decklin Leary +1 202 514 3313 +1 202 616 8470 peter.leary@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
, , , , Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
, , , Brian K. Morgan +1 212 637 2699 +1 212 637 2717 brian.morgan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Sheive Normand +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 sarah.normand@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Sol Tinio +1 212 637 2774 +1 212 637 2702 rebecca.tinio@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 11/03/2017, TERMINATED: 11/03/2017, TERMINATED: 11/03/2017, TERMINATED: 11/03/2017 Elizabeth Tulis +1 212 637 2725 +1 212 637 2702 elizabeth.tulis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
Tillerson, Rex W. Tillerson, Rex W., Defendant
Officially listed as "Rex W. Tillerson"
ExxonMobil Corporation Unknown Role, ExxonMobil Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Cantey Hanger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph H Duggins +1 817 877 2800 +1 817 877 2807 rduggins@canteyhanger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nina Cortell +1 214 651 5579 +1 214 200 0411 nina.cortell@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz +1 212 373 3254 +1 212 492 0254 jhurwitz@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Jonathan Kramer +1 212 373 3020 +1 212 492 0020 dkramer@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Frederick Laufer +1 212 373 3000 +1 212 492 0441 glaufer@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel John Toal +1 212 373 3869 +1 212 492 0869 dtoal@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 05/19/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Yamileth G. Davila +1 202 305 0137 yamileth.g.davila@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sean E. Martin +1 503 727 1010 +1 503 727 1117 sean.martin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Gisela Ann Westwater +1 202 532 4174 gisela.westwater@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Costs
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Amended Document (Non-Motion)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Non-Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) 70 (klg)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Report
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Appoint Guardian ad Litem
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Andrew Mason Dvash-Banks, Ethan Jacob Dvash-Banks. (Lawson-Remer, Alexa)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Andrew Mason Dvash-Banks, Ethan Jacob Dvash-Banks. (Lawson-Remer, Alexa) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Andrew Mason Dvash-Banks, Ethan Jacob Dvash-Banks. (Lawson-Remer, Alexa) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21130560 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ethan Jacob Dvash-Banks, Andrew Mason Dvash-Banks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Alexa M Lawson-Remer added to party Andrew Mason Dvash-Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Alexa M Lawson-Remer added to party Ethan Jacob Dvash-Banks(pty:pla))(Lawson-Remer, Alexa) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?