Greco v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-02733-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sundi A. Greco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JACK H. OLENDER & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Harvey Olender +1 202 879 7777 +1 202 393 2245 JHOPC@olender.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Bennett +1 901 861 4660

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna C Sanger +1 301 344 4433
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/29/1992
Jury Demand None
Demand $30000000
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Prince George's
Terminated 7/9/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION "DISMISSING" the action as SETTLED with prejudice. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/27/96 c/m 3/28/96-pj micro 4/1/96) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting plaintiff's [19-1] motion for approval of minor's compromise settlement ( signed by magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein 3/8/96 c/m -hsg) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996, Terminated: 3/8/1996 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION by Sundi A. Greco for approval of minor's compromise settlement filed with exhibits 1-5. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein Jr. BY CONSENT for all further proceedings including trial and entry of final judgment. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 3/8/96 c/m 3/11/696-hgs) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Telephone Conference
          Tele-conference held before Klein, USMJ. (jas, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Settlement Conference
            Settlement conference held before Klein, USMJ (jas, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of change of address for counsel by Sundi A. Greco (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995 Settlement Conference
                Settlement conference set on 2:00 6/6/95 before, Klein- USM-J. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/27/1995
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER issued in accordance with the proceedings held in this matter on 4/13/95; "DIRECTING" that Judge Young or a Magistrate Judge, not already invovled shall conduct settlement proceedings after 6/15/95; If no settlement before 7/30/95, plaintiff's counsel shall arrnage a telephone conference to schedule trial. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 4/13/95 c/m 4/13/95-jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/13/1993, Entered: 8/18/1993 Remark
                    Order from the Supreme Court of Nevada "DIRECTING" parties to file briefs within prescribed time; "INFORMING" parties that oral argument shall be calendered; "DIRECTING" parties to equally split the $100.00 filing fee all purusant to NRAP. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 7/23/1993 Remark
                      Notification from the Supreme Court of Nevada "INFORMING" this Court that they are in receipt of the certification of questions of law. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/14/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER "STAYING" this case pending the interlocutory appeal to the Supreme Court of Nevada; "ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING" this case for possible reopening pursuant to further order of Court on or before 12/21/94; administatively clsoing this case does not prevent parties from consented proceeding with discovery or the taking of testimony for use at trail while appeal is pending. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/8/93 c/m 7/9/93-jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/14/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER "CERTIFYING" Questions of Law to the Supreme court of Nevada. (signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 7/8/93 cc/m 7/14/93-lew to NV; c/m 7/9/93-jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: 7/14/1993 Terminated Case
                            Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: 6/24/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, to counsel of record, "DIRECTING" that a proposed Certification Order is enclosed; "DIRECTING" that if either side wishes to discuss the matter further, please arrange a telephone conference prior to 6/18/93, if not, then just let my secretary know how that the enclosed is acceptable. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis, dated 6/14/93 ) (c/m 6/14/93, jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/10/1993, Entered: 6/14/1993 Response
                                RESPONSE by Sundi A. Greco to Defendant's [8-1] petition to Certify questions of law to the supreme court of Nevada. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/1993, Entered: 5/3/1993 Miscellaneous Document
                                  PETITION of the United States of America to certify questions of law to the Supreme Court of Nevada filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 4/7/1993 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER in accordance with the proceedings held in this matter on 3/31/93 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 3/31/93jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/07/1993
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/29/1993, Entered: 4/7/1993 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                      MOTION by USA to Substitute Attorney (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993, Terminated: 3/3/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion for Jeffery S. Getty to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Jeffrey Schuyler Getty for USA granting [5-2] motion to Substitute Attorney terminated attorney Jeffrey Schuyler Getty for USA Added Donna C. Sanger ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 3/2/93 c/m 3/2/93-pj) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/2/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993, Terminated: 3/3/1993 Motion to Withdraw
                                          MOTION by Sundi A. Greco for Jeffery S. Getty to Withdraw as Attorney , and to Substitute Attorney (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/1992, Entered: 12/11/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER issued. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/02/92 c/m 12/3/92-jw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/1/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA (Attorney Jeffrey Schuyler Getty, Richard D. Bennett), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 10/1/1992 Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS (60 days) issued for USA. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/1992, Entered: 10/1/1992 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 104108 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?