Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. v. ABB Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00178

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2021 at 3:47 PM EDT (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fisher-rosemount Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alan Arthur Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alan Arthur Wright

Toggle Switch Represented by Damon J. Whitaker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Damon J. Whitaker

Toggle Switch Represented by Donald L. Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Donald L. Jackson

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Steven E Holtshouser +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 steve.holtshouser@huschblackwell.com
, Thomas H Watkins +1 512 472 5456 +1 512 479 1155 tom.watkins@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. Scott Davidson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , J. Scott Davidson

Toggle Switch Represented by James D. Berquist

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James D. Berquist

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Greg W. Meyer +1 314 726 7500 +1 314 726 7501 gmeyer@hdp.com
, , , , , TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 314 726 7500 +1 314 726 7501 kfussner@hdp.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Rudy A. Telscher +1 314 726 7500 +1 314 726 7501 rtelscher@hdp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walter D. Davis , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Walter D. Davis, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by William Vance Custer , IV

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , William Vance Custer, IV
ABB Ltd. ABB Ltd., Defendant
Officer/Director, Alchemy Enterprises, Ltd.
ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd. Officer/Director, ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd.
Officer/Director, Power-one, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Brian E. Farnan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Brian E. Farnan
ABB Inc. ABB Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ABB Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , JEFFREY M. YOUNG +1 919 856 2514 +1 919 856 2500 jeff.young@us.abb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert P Nupp +1 440 585 7826 robert.p.nupp@us.abb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HKM Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, R. John Wells +1 651 227 9411 +1 651 223 5199 jwells@hkmlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Parker Ainsworth

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Goots +1 216 586 3939 trgoots@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MALABY & BRADLEY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , David P. Schaffer +1 212 749 5920 +1 212 791 0286 dpschaffer@mblaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael E Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Michael E Jones

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillip Brett Philbin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Phillip Brett Philbin

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeremy William Dutra +1 202 626 6237 +1 202 626 6780 jeremy.dutra@squiresanders.com
, , , , , , , Bryan Joseph Jaketic +1 216 479 8609 +1 216 479 8780 bryan.jaketic@squiresanders.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steven M. Auvil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Steven M. Auvil

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 259 0967 +1 214 259 0910 mark.ziegelbein@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , C Todd Koebele +1 651 227 9411 +1 651 223 5199 ckoebele@hkmlawgroup.com
No Logo Emerson Process Management LLLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Linda E.B. Hansen +1 414 271 2400
, , , , , Kadie M Jelenchick +1 414 271 2400 +1 414 297 4900 kjelenchick@foley.com
, , , , , , Adrienne Hunacek Miller +1 650 856 3700 amiller@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Steven E Holtshouser +1 314 480 1500 +1 314 480 1505 steve.holtshouser@huschblackwell.com
, Thomas H Watkins +1 512 472 5456 +1 512 479 1155 tom.watkins@huschblackwell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa Richards Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Melissa Richards Smith

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan T. Pumpian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Ryan T. Pumpian

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strasburger & Price LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth Bonvillain Kamin +1 713 951 5635 +1 713 951 5660 betsy.kamin@strasburger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Ethan L Shaw +1 512 499 8900 +1 512 320 8906 elshaw@shawcowart.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Greg W. Meyer +1 314 726 7500 +1 314 726 7501 gmeyer@hdp.com
, , , , , TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 314 726 7500 +1 314 726 7501 kfussner@hdp.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Rudy A. Telscher +1 314 726 7500 +1 314 726 7501 rtelscher@hdp.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (379) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Modify
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Modify
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge (FORM, noticing)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Modify
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Amend
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Amend
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Modify
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Protective Order (FORM)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Entry Of Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None referring case to magistrate judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/7/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/17/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Sealed Response or Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued/Not Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Docket Control Order (PATENT CASE ONLY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document (use only if no other applicable option available)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/11/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: Rule 11 Motion and re: 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. (Larsen, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 62 Motion for Paul L. Smelcer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 AO435 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ABB, Inc./Hunt for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 08/.28/2018 before Judge Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Hunt, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY to 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc.. (Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply (ECF No. 60) in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 40) by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Sur-Reply, # 2 Proposed Order)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Paul L. Smelcer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE re: 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. (Larsen, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc.. (Larsen, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; ( Dft ABB Ltd.'s Reply due by 9/14/2018. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc.. (Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seigel, Leah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Proposed Order)(Telscher, Rudolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to 50 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed.(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 AO435 Transcript RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Steven E. Holtshouser for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 8/28/2018 before Judge Keith P. Ellison. 14-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Johnny Sanchez, filed. (Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Felicity Anne Fowler terminated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 8/31/2018.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Felicity A. Fowler to Withdraw as Attorney by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Felicity)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 41 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 filed by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven E. Holtshouser, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Ltr from K. Fussner to P. Hunt, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Email dated June 27, 2018 from Paul Hunt to Kara Fussner, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Email dated July 5, 2018 from Kara Fussner to Paul Hunt, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiffs Preliminary Infringement Contentions, served on July 5, 2018, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Email dated July 16, 2018 from Steve Holtshouser to Paul Hunt, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Email dated July 18, 2018 from Paul Hunt to Steve Holtshouser, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Email meeting calendar entry for the meet and confer between counsel held on July 20, 2018, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Email dated July 20, 2018 from Paul Hunt to Kara Fussner and Steve Holtshouser re '769 Patent chart, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Email dated July 20, 2018 from Paul Hunt to Kara Fussner and Steve Holtshouser re 875 patent chart, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Email dated July 20, 2018 from Paul Hunt to Kara Fussner and Steve Holtshouser re 567 patent chart, # 19 Exhibit 18 - Email dated August 10, 2018 from Steve Holtshouser to Paul Hunt, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Invalidity Contentions served by Defendants on August 16, 2018 together Exs. A-Q, # 21 Exhibit 20 - Pages 129-134 from ECF No. 41-2, # 22 Exhibit 21 - Pages 12-14 from ECF No. 41-2)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Modify the Patent Case Scheduling Order as to 29 Scheduling Order, by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge EllisonCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Setting as to 43 MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 29), 46 Notice of Setting, 41 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 8/28/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. TIME CHANGE ONLY. (arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge EllisonCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Setting as to 43 MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 29), 41 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Concerning Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 42 MOTION for Entry of Order. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 29) by ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Infineon v. Volterra, # 3 Exhibit B - InterTrust v. Microsoft)(Larsen, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Entry Of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Entry of Order re: Entry of Agreed Protective Order and Order Concerning Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Emerson Process Management LLLP, FRSI, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed ESI Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Comparison of Protective Orders)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 by ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit B - July 13 Email, # 4 Exhibit C - July 20 Emails, # 5 Exhibit D - August 2 Email, # 6 Exhibit E - Eon Corp. v. Sensus USA, # 7 Exhibit F - National Oilwell v. Auto-Dril, # 8 Exhibit G - Rapid Completions v. Baker Hughes)(Larsen, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Andrews, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Defendants by 8/6/18.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Plainitiffs' Amended Complaint by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Andrews, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc. filed by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Telscher, Rudolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leah Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leah L. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2018. (Andrews, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Andrews on behalf of ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. (Andrews, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Responses due by 7/12/2018..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 24) re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Over ABB Ltd ; Pltf's Response due by 6/21/2018. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 24) by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Patent Case SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Selection set for 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 22 Motion for Mark A. Hagedorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice for ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 23 Motion for Joshua P. Larsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice for ABB Ltd and ABB, Inc. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 21 Motion for Paul B. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 appendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Over ABB Ltd by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed.(Fowler, Felicity)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Over ABB Ltd by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Felicity)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joshua P. Larsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2018. (Fowler, Felicity)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Mark A. Hagedorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2018. (Fowler, Felicity)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Paul B. Hunt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2018. (Fowler, Felicity)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ABB Ltd. served on 4/24/2018, answer due 7/23/2018, filed.(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/31/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for ABB Ltd. 5/11/2018; ABB, Inc. 5/11/2018.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Agreed Motion for Extension for Defendant ABB, Inc. to Answer Complaint by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Holtshouser, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to ABB, Inc. served on 2/7/2018, answer due 2/28/2018, filed.(Telscher, Rudolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed.(Telscher, Rudolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Designation of Attorney in Charge by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. (Telscher, Rudolph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 9 Motion for Steven E. Holtshouser to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Kara R. Fussner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 7 Motion for Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Steven E. Holtshouser to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Applicant's Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Kara R. Fussner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Applicant's Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Applicant's Certificate of Good Standing)(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Issuance of Summons as to Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed.(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Issuance of Summons as to Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed.(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emerson Process Management LLLP, Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., filed.(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19489545) filed by Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc., Emerson Process Management LLLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 US Patent 8,332,567, # 3 Exhibit 2 US Patent 9,411,769, # 4 Exhibit 3 US Patent 7,684,875, # 5 Exhibit 4 March 14, 2017 ABB Press Release, # 6 Exhibit 5 ABB Ability System 800xA Select I/0, # 7 Exhibit 6 System 800xA Select I/O, # 8 Exhibit 7 Select I/O)(Watkins, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 8/28/2018. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling order is vacated. Argument heard on 41 Motion to Compel. Order to follow. Appearances: Jeffrey A Andrews, Paul B Hunt, Joshua Paul Larsen, Mark A Hagedorn, Steven E. Holtshouser, Thomas H Watkins.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez)(Law Clerk: H. Hughes), filed.(arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DOCKET CONTROL ORDER deadlines. Compliance with PR 3-1 and PR 3-2 due by 7/5/2018 Compliance with PR 3-3 due by 8/16/2018 Compliance with PR 4-1 due by 8/30/2018 Compliance with PR 4-2 due by 9/20/2018 Compliance with PR 4-3 due by 10/18/2018 Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2018. Response to Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2018 Discovery - Claim Construction due by 11/15/2018 Written Tutorials due by 11/21/2018 Compliance with PR 4-5(a) due by 12/13/2018 Compliance with PR 4-5(b) due by 1/10/2019 Claim Construction Chart due by 1/18/2019 Markman Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison Decision on Claim Construction due by 3/7/2019 Final Infringement Contentions due by 4/4/2019 Final Invalidity Contentions due by 4/18/2019 Compliance with PR 3-8 due by 4/18/2019 Pltf Expert Report due by 5/2/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 5/30/2019. Discovery due by 7/25/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/22/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/22/2019. Ruling on Pending Motions due by 10/17/2019 Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/14/2019. Request for Daily Transcript due by 11/14/2019 Video & Deposition Designation due by 11/14/2019 Motions in Limine due by 11/14/2019 Objections due by 11/21/2019 Advisory due by 12/4/2019 Docket Call set for 1/9/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison Mediation due by 10/18/2018. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to ABB Ltd., ABB, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hler, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?