Finch v. Wichita, Kansas, City of
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-01018-JWB
District Judge John W. Broomes, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 15, 2021 at 12:16 AM DT (6.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dominica C. Finch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Action Injury Law Group, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlton Odim +1 312 771 2444 +1 312 641 6866 Carlton@actioninjurylawgroup.com
Space Andrew Martin Stroth +1 312 735 4045 astroth@actioninjurylawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bartlitbeck.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hamilton H. Hill +1 312 494 4475 +1 312 494 4440 hamilton.hill@bartlitbeck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rick E. Bailey +1 316 264 3300 +1 316 264 3423 rbailey@fcse.net

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila A Bedi +1 312 503 2492 sheila.bedi@law.northwestern.edu
Space Alexa Anne Van Brunt +1 312 503 1336 a-vanbrunt@law.northwestern.edu
No Logo Lisa G. Finch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hamilton H. Hill +1 312 494 4475 +1 312 494 4440 hamilton.hill@bartlitbeck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Action Injury Law Group, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlton Odim +1 312 771 2444 +1 312 641 6866 Carlton@actioninjurylawgroup.com
Space Andrew Martin Stroth +1 312 735 4045 astroth@actioninjurylawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rick E. Bailey +1 316 264 3300 +1 316 264 3423 rbailey@fcse.net

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Chicago Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila A Bedi +1 312 503 2492 sheila.bedi@law.northwestern.edu
Space Alexa Anne Van Brunt +1 312 503 1336 a-vanbrunt@law.northwestern.edu
v.
No Logo John Does 1-8, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FISHER PATTERSON SAYLER & SMITH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel A. Green +1 785 232 7761 +1 785 232 6604 sgreen@fpsslaw.com
No Logo Justin Rapp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel A. Green +1 785 232 7761 +1 785 232 6604 sgreen@fpsslaw.com
Space J. Steven Pigg +1 785 286 6632 +1 785 232 6604 spigg@fpsslaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
Office Wichita
Filed 1/22/2018
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Sedgwick
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Cases 20-3132[10CCA], 20-3190[10CCA]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,SA,ETT-10D,INTERLOCUTORYAPPEAL,MJLC1,PROTO
  Entries (215) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Notice of Service
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp of Fourth Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Pigg, J.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Letter re: Record Complete.
    LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re [205] Notice of Cross Appeal. (Appeal No. 20-3190) (mam)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/17/2020 Appeal Number Information
      APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 9/17/2020 and assigned Appeal No. 20-3190 re [205] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (mam)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/17/2020 Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent
        PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re [205] Notice of Cross Appeal. (Attachments: # (1) Preliminary Packet) (mam)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: 9/16/2020 Notice of cross-appeal
          NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to [191] Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5260012. (Bailey, Rick)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 judgment
            JUDGMENT. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), final judgment of dismissal is entered in favor of the City of Wichita. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/15/2020. (mam)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 203 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for order of final judgment under Rule 54(b) (Doc. [197]) is GRANTED. The court determines that its ruling granting the City summary judgment is final and that there is no just reason for delaying entry of judgment on the claims against the City. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the clerk is directed to enter a final judgment of dismissal in favor of the City of Wichita. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 9/15/2020. (mam)
                LREF
                Blank 202 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: 9/15/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [199] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Hamilton H. Hill as counsel for Dominica C. Finch, and Lisa G. Finch pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 9/15/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                  REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [197] Motion for Judgment (Bailey, Rick)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 200 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: 8/13/2020 Notice of Cancelled Hearing
                    NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Jury Trial September 29, 2020 cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020, Terminated: 9/15/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                      MOTION for attorney Hamilton H. Hill to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5223118.) by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in support of pro hac vice motion, # (2) ECF Registration Form)(Bailey, Rick)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                        MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [197] MOTION for Judgment (Pigg, J.)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020, Terminated: 9/15/2020 ~Motion for Judgment
                          MOTION for Order of Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b) as to the City of Wichita by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Bailey, Rick) Modified on 7/28/2020 to change motion type(sz).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Letter re: Record Complete.
                            LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Appeal No. 20-3132) (mam)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Transcript Order Form
                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by Justin Rapp re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Pigg, J.)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Appeal Number Information
                                APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 7/7/2020 and assigned Appeal No. 20-3132 re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Justin Rapp. (sz)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent
                                  PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Attachments: # (1) Preliminary Packet) (mam)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                    NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Defendant Justin Rapp. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5188872. (Pigg, J.)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 191 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. [165]) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to Defendants City of Wichita and Benjamin Jonker; the claims against those Defendants are dismissed. The motion is DENIED as to the claims against Defendant Rapp. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of James W. Burden (Doc. [160]) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIED, as stated in this order, as to opinions concerning police reaction time and how that relates to body camera video footage of the incident. The motion is otherwise GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of John J. Ryan (Doc. [162]) and Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Scott DeFoe (Doc. [164]) are GRANTED as stated in this order. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 6/19/2020. (mam)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Sealed Response to Motion
                                        SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Bailey, Rick)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 189 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [188] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 02/25/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020, Terminated: 2/25/2020 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
                                            Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted response)(Bailey, Rick)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants John Does 1-10, John Does 1-8, Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re: [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Exhibit Index SJ Reply, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit U, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit V, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit W, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit X, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit Y)(Green, Samuel)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 186 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [185] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Reply deadline 2/14/2020. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 02/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020, Terminated: 2/14/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [174] Response to Motion,,,,,, for Summary Judgment by Defendants John Does 1-10, John Does 1-8, Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Green, Samuel)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [160] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Borden)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re: [164] MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Scott DeFoe and Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit O - WPD Policy 913)(Pigg, J.)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [162] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan (Bailey, Rick)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                          SEALED CONVENTIONAL EXHIBITS 6, 7 and 15 in SUPPORT of [174] Response to[165] Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. Two DVDs that each contain Exhibits 6, 7 and 15 were received and filed per DE# 179. Chambers copy forwarded to District Judge John W. Broomes. The original will be stored in the Wichita clerk's office. (mam)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply
                                                            SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of [174] Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 13 - Transcript of Preliminary Hearing, # (2) Exhibit 27 - 01/29/18 WPD Finch Incident Report, # (3) Exhibit 32 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-3347, Finch, # (4) Exhibit 34 - WPD PSB Report - #14PSB-0769, Zehring, # (5) Exhibit 35 - WPD PSB Report - #14PSB-1685, Randolph, # (6) Exhibit 37 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-1940, Ortiz, # (7) Exhibit 38 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-0577, Perry, # (8) Exhibit 40 - WPD PSB Report - #15PSB-1272, Smith, # (9) Exhibit 41 - Hardy depo excerpts, # (10) Exhibit 42 WPD PSB Report #15PSB-0020 Quintero, # (11) Exhibit 43 - WPD PSB Report - #15PSB-2620, Garner, # (12) Exhibit 44 - WPD PSB Report - #15PSB-3850, Reed, # (13) Exhibit 45 - WPD PSB Report - #16PSB-2539, Villa, # (14) Exhibit 46 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-0817, Johnston, # (15) Exhibit 47 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-3348, Martinez, # (16) Exhibit 48 - WPD PSB Report - #14PSB-0386, Richard, # (17) Exhibit 50 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-3349, Orme, # (18) Exhibit 51 - WPD PSB Report - #16PSB-2228, Mitchell, # (19) Exhibit 52 - WPD FOP Agreement on Grievance, # (20) Exhibit 55 - List of WPG shootings in past five years)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [176] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 01/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [175] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 01/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Response to motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re [164] MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Scott DeFoe and Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) Index of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - DeFoe CV, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Initial report of DeFoe, # (4) Exhibit 3 - List of prior testimony, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Supplemental report of DeFoe, # (6) Exhibit 5 - DeFoe depo exceprts)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020, Terminated: 1/15/2020 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                    Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal and conventionally by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) Added MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Conventionally on 1/15/2020. (mam)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020, Terminated: 1/15/2020 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                      Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal exhibits in support of Plaintiffs response in opposition to Defendants motion for summary judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Response to motion
                                                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Index of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - DeFoe depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Jonker depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Rapp depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Headings depo excerpts, # (6) Exhibit 5 - Perry depo excerpts, # (7) Exhibit 8 - Stephen-Clark depo excerpts, # (8) Exhibit 9 - Ronen depo excerpts, # (9) Exhibit 10 - Schepis depo excerpts, # (10) Exhibit 11 - Fussell depo excerpts, # (11) Exhibit 12 - 03/04/19 Expert report of DeFoe, # (12) Exhibit 14 - Powell depo excerpts, # (13) Exhibit 16 - WPD Policy 602, # (14) Exhibit 17 - WPD SWAT Standard Operating Procedures, # (15) Exhibit 18 - Kochenderfer depo excerpts, # (16) Exhibit 19 - 07/28/19 Supplemental Expert Report of DeFoe, # (17) Exhibit 20 - Jacobs depo excerpts, # (18) Exhibit 21 - Amy depo excerpts, # (19) Exhibit 22 - Ramsay depo excerpts, # (20) Exhibit 23 - Bennett depo excerpts, # (21) Exhibit 24 - WPD Regulation 4.0, # (22) Exhibit 25 - WPD Policy 901, # (23) Exhibit 26 - WPD Organizational Assessment, # (24) Exhibit 28 - Autopsy Report, # (25) Exhibit 29 - WPD Policy 519, # (26) Exhibit 30 - Abdelhadi depo excerpts, # (27) Exhibit 31 - Report of DA re Finch shooting, # (28) Exhibit 33 - Mumma depo excerpts, # (29) Exhibit 36 - Oldridge depo excerpts, # (30) Exhibit 39 - Do depo excerpts, # (31) Exhibit 49 - Real depo excerpts, # (32) Exhibit 53 - Pichler depo excerpts, # (33) Exhibit 54 - WPD Policy 716)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Response to motion
                                                                          RESPONSE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [160] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Borden Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B - Borden depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit C - Rapp depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit D - DeFoe depo excerpts)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Response to motion
                                                                            RESPONSE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [162] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Excerpts from Ryan's depo, # (2) Exhibit B - Excerpts from DeFoe's depo)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [170] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019, Terminated: 12/16/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Conventionally Filed ExhibitsCourt Filing
                                                                                  CONVENTIONALLY FILED EXHIBIT K IN SUPPORT of [166] Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment (2 CDs total). Exhibit K was filed conventionally per 168. Chambers copy forwarded to District Judge John W. Broomes and the original copy will be stored in the Wichita clerk's office. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File ConventionallyCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [167] Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/04/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019, Terminated: 12/4/2019 Motion for Leave to File Conventionally
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Exhibit K to Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment (Powell's Axon camera video) Conventionally by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Green, Samuel)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - DeFoe depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit B - Jonker depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit C - Rapp depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit D - Fussell depo excerpts, # (6) Exhibit E - Headings depo excerpts, # (7) Exhibit F - Stephens-Clark depo excerpts, # (8) Exhibit G - Perry depo excerpts, # (9) Exhibit H - Ronen depo excerpts, # (10) Exhibit I - Powell depo excerpts, # (11) Exhibit L - Kochenderfer depo excerpts, # (12) Exhibit M - Jacobs depo excerpts, # (13) Exhibit N - Bennett depo excerpts, # (14) Exhibit O - Mumma depo excerpts, # (15) Exhibit P - Mumma Exhibit 80, # (16) Exhibit Q - Mumma Exhibit 76, # (17) Exhibit R - Ramsay depo excerpts, # (18) Exhibit S - Real depo excerpts, # (19) Exhibit T - Jonker Declaration)(Green, Samuel) (Attachment added: # (20) J - Rapp Declaration) (mls)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Green, Samuel)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion to exclude
                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Scott DeFoe and Supporting Memorandum by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - 3/4/19 DeFoe Report, # (3) Exhibit B - Rapp depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit C - Perry depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit D - DeFoe depo excerpts, # (6) Exhibit E - Policy 602.02, # (7) Exhibit F - Jonker depo excerpts, # (8) Exhibit G - Jonker Declaration, # (9) Exhibit H - Policy 904.01, # (10) Exhibit I- Mumma depo excerpts, # (11) Exhibit J - Ramsay depo excerpts, # (12) Exhibit K- 7/28/19 DeFoe Report, # (13) Exhibit L - Pichler depo excerpts, # (14) Exhibit M - Real depo excerpts, # (15) Exhibit N - Rapp Declaration)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: 11/29/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [162] Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan by Plaintiffs Lisa G. Finch, Dominica C. Finch. (Attachments: # (1) Index of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - Expert report of Ryan, # (3) Exhibit B - Supplemental expert report of Ryan, # (4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Ryan deposition)(Bailey, Rick) Modified on 12/2/2019 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: 11/29/2019, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan by Plaintiffs Lisa G. Finch, Dominica C. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) Modified on 12/2/2019 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: 11/29/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [160] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - Expert report of Borden, # (3) Exhibit B - Supplemental expert report of Borden, # (4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Borden deposition, # (5) Exhibit D - Borden CV)(Bailey, Rick) Modified on 1/15/2020 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: 11/29/2019, Terminated: 6/19/2020 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) Modified on 1/15/2020 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 ///Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Estimated trial time 7-10 days. Dispositive motion deadline 11/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom 238 (JWB) before District Judge John W. Broomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/29/19. (msb)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [152] Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/11/2019. (bh)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of James W. Borden on October 15, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Samuel A. Green on behalf of John Does 1-10, John Does 1-8, Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Green, Samuel)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Notice of Courtroom ChangeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM will be held in Topeka Courtroom 470 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019, Terminated: 10/11/2019 Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Request for medical records, # (2) Exhibit B - Ozaki declaration, # (3) Exhibit C - Williams declaration, # (4) Exhibit D - Galbreath depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit E - Pigg declaration)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Ann Jones and Francis Finch on September 19, 2019 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER Following Discovery Conference. The court grants leave for the parties to file two discovery-related motions by September 27, 2019, with responses due by October 4, 2019, and reply briefs due by October 9, 2019. The motions and response briefs are limited to seven pages. The reply briefs are limited to three pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/17/2019. (bh)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 9/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of John Ryan on October 2, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Discovery Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 03:30 PM via Telephone (ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. (ht) 148 Filed & Entered: 09/13/2019 Notice to Take Deposition AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of John Ryan on October 2, 2019 (Bailey, Rick) 149 Filed & Entered: 09/17/2019 Discovery Hearing MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 9/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) 150 Filed & Entered: 09/17/2019 Order ORDER Following Discovery Conference. The court grants leave for the parties to file two discovery-related motions by September 27, 2019, with responses due by October 4, 2019, and reply briefs due by October 9, 2019. The motions and response briefs are limited to seven pages. The reply briefs are limited to three pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/17/2019. (bh) 151 Filed & Entered: 09/18/2019 Notice to Take Deposition NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Ann Jones and Francis Finch on September 19, 2019 (Pigg, J.) 152 Filed & Entered: 09/26/2019Terminated: 10/11/2019 Motion for Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Request for medical records, # (2) Exhibit B - Ozaki declaration, # (3) Exhibit C - Williams declaration, # (4) Exhibit D - Galbreath depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit E - Pigg declaration)(Pigg, J.) 153 Filed & Entered: 10/07/2019 Notice of Courtroom Change NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM will be held in Topeka Courtroom 470 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) 154 Filed & Entered: 10/08/2019 Entry of Appearance ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Samuel A. Green on behalf of John Does 1-10, John Does 1-8, Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Green, Samuel) 155 Filed & Entered: 10/08/2019 Pretrial Conference - Final MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht) 156 Filed & Entered: 10/10/2019 Notice to Take Deposition NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of James W. Borden on October 15, 2019 (Bailey, Rick) 157 Filed & Entered: 10/11/2019 Order on Motion for Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part [152] Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/11/2019. (bh) 158 Filed: 10/29/2019Entered: 10/30/2019 Pretrial Order PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Estimated trial time 7-10 days. Dispositive motion deadline 11/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom 238 (JWB) before District Judge John W. Broomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/29/19. (msb) 159 Filed & Entered: 10/31/2019 Stipulation of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) 160 Filed & Entered: 11/29/2019Terminated: 06/19/2020 Motion to Exclude MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) Modified on 1/15/2020 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam) 161 Filed & Entered: 11/29/2019 Memorandum in Support of Motion MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [160] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - Expert report of Borden, # (3) Exhibit B - Supplemental expert report of Borden, # (4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Borden deposition, # (5) Exhibit D - Borden CV)(Bailey, Rick) Modified on 1/15/2020 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam) 162 Filed & Entered: 11/29/2019Terminated: 06/19/2020 Motion to Exclude MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan by Plaintiffs Lisa G. Finch, Dominica C. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) Modified on 12/2/2019 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam) 163 Filed & Entered: 11/29/2019 Memorandum in Support of Motion MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [162] Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan by Plaintiffs Lisa G. Finch, Dominica C. Finch. (Attachments: # (1) Index of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - Expert report of Ryan, # (3) Exhibit B - Supplemental expert report of Ryan, # (4) Exhibit C - Transcript of Ryan deposition)(Bailey, Rick) Modified on 12/2/2019 to remove Ali Abdelhadi and Adelina Finch as filers. (mam) 164 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2019Terminated: 06/19/2020 Motion to Exclude MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Scott DeFoe and Supporting Memorandum by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - 3/4/19 DeFoe Report, # (3) Exhibit B - Rapp depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit C - Perry depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit D - DeFoe depo excerpts, # (6) Exhibit E - Policy 602.02, # (7) Exhibit F - Jonker depo excerpts, # (8) Exhibit G - Jonker Declaration, # (9) Exhibit H - Policy 904.01, # (10) Exhibit I- Mumma depo excerpts, # (11) Exhibit J - Ramsay depo excerpts, # (12) Exhibit K- 7/28/19 DeFoe Report, # (13) Exhibit L - Pichler depo excerpts, # (14) Exhibit M - Real depo excerpts, # (15) Exhibit N - Rapp Declaration)(Pigg, J.) 165 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2019Terminated: 06/19/2020 Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Green, Samuel) 166 Filed & Entered: 12/02/2019 Memorandum in Support of Motion MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - DeFoe depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit B - Jonker depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit C - Rapp depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit D - Fussell depo excerpts, # (6) Exhibit E - Headings depo excerpts, # (7) Exhibit F - Stephens-Clark depo excerpts, # (8) Exhibit G - Perry depo excerpts, # (9) Exhibit H - Ronen depo excerpts, # (10) Exhibit I - Powell depo excerpts, # (11) Exhibit L - Kochenderfer depo excerpts, # (12) Exhibit M - Jacobs depo excerpts, # (13) Exhibit N - Bennett depo excerpts, # (14) Exhibit O - Mumma depo excerpts, # (15) Exhibit P - Mumma Exhibit 80, # (16) Exhibit Q - Mumma Exhibit 76, # (17) Exhibit R - Ramsay depo excerpts, # (18) Exhibit S - Real depo excerpts, # (19) Exhibit T - Jonker Declaration)(Green, Samuel) (Attachment added: # (20) J - Rapp Declaration) (mls) 167 Filed & Entered: 12/04/2019Terminated: 12/04/2019 Motion for Leave to File Conventionally Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Exhibit K to Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment (Powell's Axon camera video) Conventionally by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Green, Samuel) 168 Filed & Entered: 12/04/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally ORDER granting [167] Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/04/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 169 Filed & Entered: 12/09/2019 Conventionally Filed Exhibits CONVENTIONALLY FILED EXHIBIT K IN SUPPORT of [166] Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment (2 CDs total). Exhibit K was filed conventionally per 168. Chambers copy forwarded to District Judge John W. Broomes and the original copy will be stored in the Wichita clerk's office. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) 170 Filed & Entered: 12/12/2019Terminated: 12/16/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Bailey, Rick) 171 Filed & Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ORDER granting [170] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 172 Filed & Entered: 01/14/2020 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [162] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Excerpts from Ryan's depo, # (2) Exhibit B - Excerpts from DeFoe's depo)(Pigg, J.) 173 Filed & Entered: 01/14/2020 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [160] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Borden Declaration, # (2) Exhibit B - Borden depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit C - Rapp depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit D - DeFoe depo excerpts)(Pigg, J.) 174 Filed & Entered: 01/14/2020 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Index of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - DeFoe depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Jonker depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit 3 - Rapp depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Headings depo excerpts, # (6) Exhibit 5 - Perry depo excerpts, # (7) Exhibit 8 - Stephen-Clark depo excerpts, # (8) Exhibit 9 - Ronen depo excerpts, # (9) Exhibit 10 - Schepis depo excerpts, # (10) Exhibit 11 - Fussell depo excerpts, # (11) Exhibit 12 - 03/04/19 Expert report of DeFoe, # (12) Exhibit 14 - Powell depo excerpts, # (13) Exhibit 16 - WPD Policy 602, # (14) Exhibit 17 - WPD SWAT Standard Operating Procedures, # (15) Exhibit 18 - Kochenderfer depo excerpts, # (16) Exhibit 19 - 07/28/19 Supplemental Expert Report of DeFoe, # (17) Exhibit 20 - Jacobs depo excerpts, # (18) Exhibit 21 - Amy depo excerpts, # (19) Exhibit 22 - Ramsay depo excerpts, # (20) Exhibit 23 - Bennett depo excerpts, # (21) Exhibit 24 - WPD Regulation 4.0, # (22) Exhibit 25 - WPD Policy 901, # (23) Exhibit 26 - WPD Organizational Assessment, # (24) Exhibit 28 - Autopsy Report, # (25) Exhibit 29 - WPD Policy 519, # (26) Exhibit 30 - Abdelhadi depo excerpts, # (27) Exhibit 31 - Report of DA re Finch shooting, # (28) Exhibit 33 - Mumma depo excerpts, # (29) Exhibit 36 - Oldridge depo excerpts, # (30) Exhibit 39 - Do depo excerpts, # (31) Exhibit 49 - Real depo excerpts, # (32) Exhibit 53 - Pichler depo excerpts, # (33) Exhibit 54 - WPD Policy 716)(Bailey, Rick) 175 Filed & Entered: 01/14/2020Terminated: 01/15/2020 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal exhibits in support of Plaintiffs response in opposition to Defendants motion for summary judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Bailey, Rick) 176 Filed & Entered: 01/14/2020Terminated: 01/15/2020 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal and conventionally by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick) Added MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Conventionally on 1/15/2020. (mam) 177 Filed & Entered: 01/14/2020 Response to Motion RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re [164] MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Scott DeFoe and Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) Index of exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - DeFoe CV, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Initial report of DeFoe, # (4) Exhibit 3 - List of prior testimony, # (5) Exhibit 4 - Supplemental report of DeFoe, # (6) Exhibit 5 - DeFoe depo exceprts)(Bailey, Rick) 178 Filed & Entered: 01/15/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal ORDER granting [175] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 01/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 179 Filed & Entered: 01/15/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal ORDER granting [176] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 01/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 180 Filed & Entered: 01/16/2020 SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply SEALED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of [174] Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 13 - Transcript of Preliminary Hearing, # (2) Exhibit 27 - 01/29/18 WPD Finch Incident Report, # (3) Exhibit 32 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-3347, Finch, # (4) Exhibit 34 - WPD PSB Report - #14PSB-0769, Zehring, # (5) Exhibit 35 - WPD PSB Report - #14PSB-1685, Randolph, # (6) Exhibit 37 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-1940, Ortiz, # (7) Exhibit 38 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-0577, Perry, # (8) Exhibit 40 - WPD PSB Report - #15PSB-1272, Smith, # (9) Exhibit 41 - Hardy depo excerpts, # (10) Exhibit 42 WPD PSB Report #15PSB-0020 Quintero, # (11) Exhibit 43 - WPD PSB Report - #15PSB-2620, Garner, # (12) Exhibit 44 - WPD PSB Report - #15PSB-3850, Reed, # (13) Exhibit 45 - WPD PSB Report - #16PSB-2539, Villa, # (14) Exhibit 46 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-0817, Johnston, # (15) Exhibit 47 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-3348, Martinez, # (16) Exhibit 48 - WPD PSB Report - #14PSB-0386, Richard, # (17) Exhibit 50 - WPD PSB Report - #17PSB-3349, Orme, # (18) Exhibit 51 - WPD PSB Report - #16PSB-2228, Mitchell, # (19) Exhibit 52 - WPD FOP Agreement on Grievance, # (20) Exhibit 55 - List of WPG shootings in past five years)(Bailey, Rick) 181 Filed & Entered: 01/17/2020 SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply SEALED CONVENTIONAL EXHIBITS 6, 7 and 15 in SUPPORT of [174] Response to[165] Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. Two DVDs that each contain Exhibits 6, 7 and 15 were received and filed per DE# 179. Chambers copy forwarded to District Judge John W. Broomes. The original will be stored in the Wichita clerk's office. (mam) 182 Filed & Entered: 02/13/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [162] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert John J. Ryan (Bailey, Rick) 183 Filed & Entered: 02/13/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re: [164] MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Scott DeFoe and Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit O - WPD Policy 913)(Pigg, J.) 184 Filed & Entered: 02/13/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [160] MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Expert James W. Borden (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Deposition excerpts of Borden)(Bailey, Rick) 185 Filed & Entered: 02/13/2020Terminated: 02/14/2020 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [174] Response to Motion,,,,,, for Summary Judgment by Defendants John Does 1-10, John Does 1-8, Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Green, Samuel) 186 Filed & Entered: 02/14/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ORDER granting [185] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment . Reply deadline 2/14/2020. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 02/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 187 Filed & Entered: 02/14/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants John Does 1-10, John Does 1-8, Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re: [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List Exhibit Index SJ Reply, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit U, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit V, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit W, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit X, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit Y)(Green, Samuel) 188 Filed & Entered: 02/25/2020Terminated: 02/25/2020 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted response)(Bailey, Rick) 189 Filed & Entered: 02/25/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal ORDER granting [188] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 02/25/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 190 Filed & Entered: 02/26/2020 SEALED Response to Motion SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re [165] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Bailey, Rick) 191 Filed & Entered: 06/19/2020 Order on Motion to Exclude MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. [165]) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to Defendants City of Wichita and Benjamin Jonker; the claims against those Defendants are dismissed. The motion is DENIED as to the claims against Defendant Rapp. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of James W. Burden (Doc. [160]) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIED, as stated in this order, as to opinions concerning police reaction time and how that relates to body camera video footage of the incident. The motion is otherwise GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of John J. Ryan (Doc. [162]) and Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Scott DeFoe (Doc. [164]) are GRANTED as stated in this order. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 6/19/2020. (mam) 192 Filed & Entered: 07/06/2020 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Defendant Justin Rapp. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5188872. (Pigg, J.) 193 Filed & Entered: 07/07/2020 Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Attachments: # (1) Preliminary Packet) (mam) 194 Filed: 07/07/2020Entered: 07/08/2020 Appeal Number Information APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 7/7/2020 and assigned Appeal No. 20-3132 re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Justin Rapp. (sz) 195 Filed & Entered: 07/16/2020 Transcript Order Form TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by Justin Rapp re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Pigg, J.) 196 Filed & Entered: 07/16/2020 Letter re Record Complete LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re [192] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Appeal No. 20-3132) (mam) 197 Filed & Entered: 07/28/2020Terminated: 09/15/2020 Motion for Judgment MOTION for Order of Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b) as to the City of Wichita by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Bailey, Rick) Modified on 7/28/2020 to change motion type(sz). 198 Filed & Entered: 08/10/2020 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [197] MOTION for Judgment (Pigg, J.) 199 Filed & Entered: 08/10/2020Terminated: 09/15/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION for attorney Hamilton H. Hill to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5223118.) by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in support of pro hac vice motion, # (2) ECF Registration Form)(Bailey, Rick) 200 Filed & Entered: 08/13/2020 Notice of Cancelled Hearing NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Jury Trial September 29, 2020 cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr) 201 Filed & Entered: 08/21/2020 Reply to Response to Motion REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [197] Motion for Judgment (Bailey, Rick) 202 Filed & Entered: 09/15/2020 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ORDER granting [199] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Hamilton H. Hill as counsel for Dominica C. Finch, and Lisa G. Finch pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 9/15/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw) 203 Filed & Entered: 09/15/2020 Order on Motion for Judgment MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for order of final judgment under Rule 54(b) (Doc. [197]) is GRANTED. The court determines that its ruling granting the City summary judgment is final and that there is no just reason for delaying entry of judgment on the claims against the City. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the clerk is directed to enter a final judgment of dismissal in favor of the City of Wichita. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 9/15/2020. (mam) 204 Filed & Entered: 09/15/2020 Judgment JUDGMENT. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), final judgment of dismissal is entered in favor of the City of Wichita. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/15/2020. (mam) 205 Filed & Entered: 09/16/2020 Notice of Cross Appeal NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to [191] Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. Filing fee $505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5260012. (Bailey, Rick) 206 Filed & Entered: 09/17/2020 Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re [205] Notice of Cross Appeal. (Attachments: # (1) Preliminary Packet) (mam) 207 Filed & Entered: 09/17/2020 Appeal Number Information APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 9/17/2020 and assigned Appeal No. 20-3190 re [205] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (mam) 208 Filed & Entered: 09/24/2020 Letter re Record Complete LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re [205] Notice of Cross Appeal. (Appeal No. 20-3190) (mam) 209 Filed & Entered: 03/26/2021 Notice of Service NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp of Fourth Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of Defendants' Supplemental Expert Reports (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Robert Jacobs on August 27, 2019 (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena, # (2) Subpoena rider)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Lorrie Hernandez on August 8, 2019 by Personal Service (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Vanessa Galbreath on August 9, 2019 by Personal Service (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Dominica Finch on August 16, 2019 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Galbreath subpoena duces tecum)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Vanessa Galbreath on August 16, 2019 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Lorrie Hernandez on August 16, 2019 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Scott DeFoe on August 13, 2019 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [134] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants have up to and including August 13, 2019, to depose Scott DeFoe, plaintiffs' expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019, Terminated: 8/5/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for extension of time for Deposition of Scott DeFoe by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Disclosure of Experts (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [126] Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Expert Report. Plaintiffs shall serve Mr. DeFoe's supplemental expert report by July 29, 2019. If defendants require a second deposition of Mr. DeFoe, plaintiffs shall make him available for deposition by August 9, 2019. Defendantsare granted leave to serve their own supplemental expert report addressing Mr. DeFoe's supplemental expert report by August 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/16/2019. (bh)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch re: [126] MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - depo excerpts, # (2) Exhibit B - depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit C1 - depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit C2 - depo excerpts)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of James W. Borden on August 19, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of John Ryan on July 18, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: 7/2/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [126] MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 2018.12.20 Van Brunt & Pigg email exchange, # (2) Exhibit B - Response to Second Request for Production, # (3) Exhibit C - 2018.9.5 Van Brunt & Pigg email exchange, # (4) Exhibit D - 2018.11.7 & 14 Van Brunt & Pigg email exchange, # (5) Exhibit E - 2019.3.29 Pigg email, # (6) Exhibit F - 2019.3.22 Bedi & Pigg email exchange, # (7) Exhibit G - 2019.4.3 Bedi email)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Regarding [126] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Disclose Supplemental Expert Report. The court orders expedited briefing on plaintiffs' motion. Defendants' response brief is due by July 2, 2019, and shall be limited to 10 pages. Plaintiffs' reply brief is due by July 9, 2019, and shall be limited to 3 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: 6/21/2019, Terminated: 7/16/2019 Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Expert Report by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - email, # (2) Exhibit B - email, # (3) Exhibit C - email, # (4) Exhibit D - supplemental disclosures, # (5) Exhibit E - email)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Joseph Pichler on June 12, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Marc Bennett on June 12, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Michael Amy on June 11, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Francois Do on June 11, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Scott DeFoe on June 24, 2019 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Chief Gordon Ramsay on May 24, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Detective Kevin Real on May 23, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Detective Dan Hardy on May 23, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Detective Lance T. Oldridge on May 23, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [115] Motion to Amend Scheduling Order - Discovery deadline 9/20/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 11/8/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (Unknown) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 05/17/19. (ctv)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019, Terminated: 5/17/2019 Motion to Amend Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: DISCOVERY CONFERENCE held on 5/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Order setting Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE: The court sets this case for a discovery conference by phone on May 16, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties shall dial into the conference call at 1-888-363-4749, enter access code 3977627, and follow the prompts to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/14/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order denying without prejudice [110] Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The parties are directed to contact the magistrate judge's chambers to request a discovery conference to discuss adjustments to the current scheduling-order deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER. Paragraph 3(f) of the scheduling order is modified to require the parties, after complying with the "meet and confer" requirements under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and D. Kan. Rule 37.2, to arrange a discovery conference with the undersigned magistrate judge to address unresolved issues before filing a disputed discovery-related motion. Parties may arrange a conference by emailing the undersigned's chambers at ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov and providing a brief, nonargumentative explanation of the dispute and stating the approximate amount of time they believe they will need with the court to discuss the issue before filing the anticipated motion. If a motion to compel becomes necessary, the court will impose briefing deadlines and page limits at the discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019, Terminated: 5/10/2019 Motion to Amend Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of Defendants' Designation of Experts (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Designate Experts by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. No later than 5/28/2019, defense counsel must submit the parties' proposed pretrial order as an attachment to an email sent to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. Attorneys who wish to appear at the final pretrial conference by phone may do so by sending an email to chambers seven calendar days prior to the date of the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of Second Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION(S) to Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of of Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of City of Wichita on April 18, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of City of Wichita on April 25, 2019 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [97] Agreed Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosures are deemed timely served on March 5, 2019. The deadline for defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures is extended to April 30, 2019, and the deadline for disclosures by rebuttal experts is extended to May 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/1/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019, Terminated: 4/1/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for extension of time for disclosure of experts by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: 3/25/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Production (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to amend complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [94] Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw [79] Motion to Amend Complaint. The court further finds as moot [79] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019, Terminated: 3/13/2019 Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw [79] MOTION to Amend Complaint re [64] Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of [79] MOTION to Amend Complaint re [64] Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch Exhibit B - Administrative Investigation Report (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [81] Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel is directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Fifth Request for Production of Documents by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 ADR Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR REPORT by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. ADR session held on: January 24, 2019 and conducted by Dennis L. Gillen. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Suggestion of Death
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Adelina Finch by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Conventionally Filed Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED CONVENTIONALLY FILED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of [79] Motion to Amend Complaint. (Original cd to be stored in the Wichita Clerk's Office. Counsel sent copy directly to chambers) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). (hw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: 2/6/2019 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Firth Set of Requests for Production (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of re [79] MOTION to Amend Complaint re [64] Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Jonker depo excerpts, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Abdelhadi depo excerpts, # (3) Exhibit 3 - A. Finch depo excerpts, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Fussell depo excerpts, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Autopsy report, page 3)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [83] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice and the affidavit in support, for good cause shown, the court finds said motion should be granted and Sheila Bedi should be and hereby is admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the District of Kansas for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019, Terminated: 1/25/2019 Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for attorney Sheila Bedi to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4692913.) by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in support of pro hac vice motion, # (2) ECF Registration Form)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [80] Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal and Conventionally. Counsel are directed to conventionally file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019, Terminated: 3/6/2019 Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B - Adminstrative Investigation Report)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019, Terminated: 1/17/2019 Motion for Leave to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal and Conventionally by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Bailey, Rick). Added MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Conventionally on 1/17/2019 (sz).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019, Terminated: 3/13/2019 Motion to amend complaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend Complaint re [64] Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit D - Excerpts of Depo of Abdelhadi, # (3) Exhibit F - Excerpts of Depo of Schepis, # (4) Exhibit G - Excerpts of Depo of Fussell, # (5) Exhibit H - Excerpts of Depo of Ronan)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [77] Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Expert Witness Disclosures. Plaintiffs are granted up to and including February 28, 2019 to submit their expert witness disclosures to defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019, Terminated: 1/16/2019 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for extension of time to designate experts by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch Subpoena to be issued to: Ascension Via Christi Hospital St. Francis (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch Subpoena to be issued to: Timothy S. Gorrill, M.D., Medical Examiner (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Designation of Place of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of - trial to be held in Wichita. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [64] Amended Complaint by Benjamin Jonker, Justin Rapp, Wichita, Kansas, City of.(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Response to Plaintiffs' Fourth Request for Production (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Jamie Schepis on December 27, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Christopher Ronen on December 27, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Request for Production of Documents by Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Order on Motion to amend complaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [67] Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs are granted leave to have filed their [64] amended complaint. Defendants are granted up to and including December 14, 2018 to respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 11/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018, Terminated: 11/28/2018 Motion to amend complaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend Complaint re [1] Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch. (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Attachments: # (1) First Amended Complaint)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Kansas Children's Service League on November 19, 2018, by Certified Mail (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Discovery Responses (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa G. Finch, Dominica C. Finch, Ali Abdelhadi, Adelina Finch.(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of David Headings on November 28, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Kyle Perry on November 28, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Christopher Ronen on November 26, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Jamie Schepis on November 26, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Noah Stephens-Clark on November 28, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Wichita, Kansas, City of (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE by Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for Production (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Vanesa Galbreath on 10-20-2018 by Certified Mail (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Ana Ahrens, Behavioral Health & Addiction Services on 10-18-2018 by Certified Mail (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Business Records Subpoenas by Wichita, Kansas, City of (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Justin Rapp on October 17, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Matthew Powell on October 18, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Benjamin Jonker on October 18, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of taking deposition of Dustin Fussell on October 19, 2018 (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part [44] Motion for Extension of Time to Extend the Deadline to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint. The deadline for adding parties and otherwise amending pleadings is extended to 11/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 10/2/2018. (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 9/27/2018. (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of re [44] MOTION for extension of time to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Final report of DA)(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018, Terminated: 10/2/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for extension of time to Amend Plaintiffs' Complaint by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Discovery Response (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch to Federal Bureau of Investigation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit Rider for Proposed Subpoena)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of Lisa Finch on July 25, 2018 (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Discovery Responses (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [36] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. Defendant City of Wichita is allowed up to and including 7/19/2018 in which to respond to plaintiffs' interrogatories and request for production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 7/10/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' Responses to Discovery Requests (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018, Terminated: 7/10/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Objections
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION(S) to [32] Notice (Other) of Business Records Subpoena by Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Business Records Subpoena to FBI, # (2) Rider to Business Records Subpoena to FBI)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena to Sedgwick County Sheriff's Office, # (2) Rider to Subpoena to Sedgwick County Sheriff's Office)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena to Wichita Citizens Review Board, # (2) Rider to Subpoena to Wichita Citizens Review Board)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena to Sedgwick County District Attorney's Office, # (2) Rider to Subpoena to Sedgwick County District Attorney's Office)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Subpoena to KBI, # (2) Exhibit Rider to subpoena to KBI)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of of taking deposition of A.F., Ali Abdelhadi, Tawny Unruh, and Lisa Finch on July 23rd, 24th, and 25th (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Joint Mediation Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held August 20, 2018 by Wichita, Kansas, City of (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Wichita Police Department on 06-15-2018 by Certified Mail (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Return of Service of Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of executed upon Sedgwick County Sheriff on 06-15-2018 by Certified Mail (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena for the Sedgwick County Sheriff by Wichita, Kansas, City of (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Business Records Subpoena for the Wichita Police Department by Wichita, Kansas, City of (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all further proceedings. District Judge Eric F. Melgren no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/31/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 10 days. Discovery deadline 5/20/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 7/3/2019. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 6/25/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 10:00 AM by Telephone KGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/29/2018. (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/25/2018. (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/25/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures of Plaintiffs (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wichita, Kansas, City of of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures of Defendant (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Order Setting Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2018 at 10:00 AM by Telephone KGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/16/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Order Setting Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2018 at 10:00 AM by Telephone KGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due by 5/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/12/2018. (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Designation of Place of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of - trial to be held in Wichita. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Wichita, Kansas, City of.(Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [10] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexa Van Brunt for Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, and Lisa G. Finch pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 2/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: 2/14/2018, Terminated: 2/20/2018 Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for attorney Alexa A. Van Brunt to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4406371.) by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, Lisa G. Finch (referred to Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius) (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in support of Motion, # (2) ECF Registration Form)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 03/09/2018 for Defendant Wichita, Kansas, City of to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 02/12/2018. (aa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Steven Pigg on behalf of Wichita, Kansas, City of. (Pigg, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wichita, Kansas, City of. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [3] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. Stroth for Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, and Lisa G. Finch pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [2] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carlton Odim for Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C. Finch, and Lisa G. Finch pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (wh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lisa G. Finch. (Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Notice of Deficiency
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018, Terminated: 1/23/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Andrew M. Stroth to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4385851.) by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C Finch, Lisa G Finch (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018, Terminated: 1/23/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for attorney Carlton Odim to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4385850.) by Plaintiffs Ali Abdelhadi, Dominica C Finch, Lisa G Finch (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Complaint (Attorney)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4385848.), filed by Lisa G Finch.(Bailey, Rick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?