Brown v. Carmean

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-02759-FAK
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Raymond S. Brown, Plaintiff

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J Kim +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 rkim@mhlawyers.com
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
v.
No Logo Jennifer L. Carmean, Defendant

Represented by Masterman, Culbert & Tully

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Thomas Smith +1 617 227 8010 +1 617 227 2630
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/30/1992
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $150000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County Worcester
Terminated 8/4/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "Entering Judgment for plaintiff with $0.00 damages; "Directing" that the court costs are hereby imposed upon plaintiff pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 (b)( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman )(c/m-8/6/93-df)(Microfilmed-8/6/93) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RE: Lunch for Jury. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "Directing" that physical exhibits be returned to counsel ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "Directing" that all of the trial exhibits that have been admitted into evidence are to be sent to the jury room for use in jury deliberations.( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Voir Dire Questions
Special Voir dire question of Foreperson (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Exhibit
Exhibit list of Court (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Exhibit
Exhibit list by Jennifer L. Carmean (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Exhibit
Exhibit list by Raymond S. Brown (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/10/1993 Terminated Case
Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Special Verdict Form
JURY VERDICT in favor of Raymond S. Brown against defendant for the sum of $0.00 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Remark
Special Jury Questions Form Submitted to the Jury (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Remark
Bailiff sworn: Ronald Teufer (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Remark
Court's charge to the jury (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 Jury Trial Held
Jury trial held before Kaufman, S.J. Day Two. (Reporter: Cook) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/4/1993 OrderCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, "DIRECTING" that the liability issues are concluded in this case, and that the only the damage issues will be presented to the Court. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (c/m 8/4/93, df) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Remark
Case not concluded. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Oral Motion
MOTION in open court by Jennifer L. Carmean for Judgment as a Matter of Law at the conslusion of all the evidence - "DENIED" for reasons stated on the record. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Remark
Opening Statement of Counsel. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Jury Impaneled
Jury impaneled and sworn before Kaufman, S.J. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Description not available
Jurors Sworn and Examined on Voir Dire. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Remark
Defendant orally conceded liability on the record in open Court. Trial proceeding on the issue of damages only. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Jury Trial Held
Jury trial held, Day 1 - before Kaufman, SJ. (Reporter S. Cook) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 7/26/1993 Jury Instructions
Proposed Jury instructions on Collateral Benefits. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 7/26/1993 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM dated 7/26/93 re: Jury instructions and special jury question, as set forth therein; and "Directing" that trial commence 8/3/93 at 10:00 a.m. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (c/m 7/23/93 dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: 7/21/1993 Telephone Conference
Tele-conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (taped in chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: 7/21/1993 Telephone Conference
Tele-conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (taped in chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 6/22/1993, Entered: 6/24/1993 OrderCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, "DIRECTING" that joint proposed jury instructions and voir dire be submitted on or before 7/16/93; "DIRECTING" that trial will commence 8/3/93 at 10:00 a.m. (one day jury trial), and that a pretrial conference will take place on 7/22/93 at 4 p.m. if needed, all as set forth therein. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman , dated 6/21/93) (c/m 6/21/93, dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 5/10/1993, Entered: 5/10/1993 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by Raymond S. Brown, Jennifer L. Carmean, and Exhibits A. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993 Status Report
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Raymond S. Brown, Jennifer L. Carmean, and Exhibit A. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 3/8/1993, Entered: 3/8/1993 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER (signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (c/m 3/5/93, mm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 2/24/1993 Motion for Extension of Time
Cut-Off Date (1 c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 11/6/1992, Entered: 11/9/1992 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by Raymond S. Brown. (c/m 11/6/92, mm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 11/4/1992, Entered: 11/4/1992 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Defendant. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 10/30/1992, Entered: 11/3/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (c/m 10/30/92, mm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 10/27/1992 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by Jennifer L. Carmean (Attorney Kevin Thomas Smith). (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 10/21/1992, Entered: 10/22/1992 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM (dated 10/20/92), "DIRECTING" counsel for Plaintiff to submit a status report on or before 11/4/92. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) (c/m 10/20/92, dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 10/1/1992 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued (20 days) for Jennifer L. Carmean (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 10/1/1992 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 104127 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 50 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?